Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB65 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 24RS-189	ENGROSSED
2024 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 65
BY SENATOR HENSGENS 
SUNSET LAW. Recreates Dept. of Energy and Natural Resources. (6/30/24)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 49:191(2)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(12)(c), relative to the Department of
3 Energy and Natural Resources, including provisions to provide for the recreation of
4 the Department of Energy and Natural Resources and the statutory entities made a
5 part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all
6 statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for
7 related matters.
8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Energy and Natural Resources
10 and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be recreated effective
11 June 30, 2024, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the
12 provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Energy and
14 Natural Resources and the statutory entities made a part of the department as recreated by
15 Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2029 pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However the
16 Department of Energy and Natural Resources may be recreated prior to such date in
17 accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 65
SLS 24RS-189	ENGROSSED
1 Statutes of 1950.
2 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
3 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
4 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(2)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
5 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;
6	phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates
7	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
8 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
9 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
10 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
11 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
12	*          *          *
13	(2) July 1, 2028:
14	*          *          *
15	(b) The Department of Energy and Natural Resources and all statutory
16 entities made a part of the department by law.
17	*          *          *
18 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(12)(c) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
19 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2024; if vetoed by the
20 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
21 June 30, 2024, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jacob K. Wilson.
DIGEST
SB 65 Engrossed 2024 Regular Session	Hensgens
Present law provides that the Department of Energy and Natural Resources (DENR) and all
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2025 unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the recreation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of DENR and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2024, for a four-year period, in accordance with the "Sunset" law.
Supersedes that provision of the "Sunset" law which requires a separate bill to recreate each
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 65
SLS 24RS-189	ENGROSSED
statutory entity within the department.
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(c))
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.