Louisiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB653 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 25RS-1338	ORIGINAL
2025 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 653
BY REPRESENTATIVE DAVIS
TAX CREDITS:  Extends the duration of the sound recording investor tax credit program
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6023(I), relative to tax credits; to provide with respect to the
3 sound recording investor tax credit; to extend the period in which investors may
4 apply for the tax credit; to provide for applicability; to provide for an effective date;
5 and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 47:6023(I) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
8 ยง6023.  Sound recording investor tax credit
9	*          *          *
10	I.  Termination.  No credits shall be granted pursuant to the provisions of this
11 Section for applications received on or after July 1, 2025 2030.
12 Section 2.  The provisions of this Act shall apply to taxable periods beginning on or
13after January 1, 2025.
14 Section 3.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
15signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
16by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If
17vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
18effective on the day following such approval.
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 25RS-1338	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 653
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 653 Original 2025 Regular Session	Davis
Abstract:  Extends the application deadline for tax credits available through the sound
recording investor tax credit program from June 30, 2025, to June 30, 2030.
Present law establishes the sound recording investor tax credit.  Authorizes investors to
apply for and, if approved, be granted income tax credits for investments made in state-
certified sound recording productions that meet the applicable requirements of present law.
Present law provides that no credits shall be granted for applications received on or after July
1, 2025.  Proposed law extends the period in which investors may apply for credits by
providing that no credits shall be granted for applications received on or after July 1, 2030. 
Otherwise, proposed law retains present law.
Proposed law applies to taxable periods beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2025.
Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 47:6023(I))
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.