DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 653 Original 2025 Regular Session Davis Abstract: Extends the application deadline for tax credits available through the sound recording investor tax credit program from June 30, 2025, to June 30, 2030. Present law establishes the sound recording investor tax credit. Authorizes investors to apply for and, if approved, be granted income tax credits for investments made in state-certified sound recording productions that meet the applicable requirements of present law. Present law provides that no credits shall be granted for applications received on or after July 1, 2025. Proposed law extends the period in which investors may apply for credits by providing that no credits shall be granted for applications received on or after July 1, 2030. Otherwise, proposed law retains present law. Proposed law applies to taxable periods beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2025. Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 47:6023(I))