Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR281

Caption

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution serves to honor the contributions of Matagorda County and its citizens to the state's history and culture. It celebrates the area's transition from agriculture to a more diverse economy that includes significant contributions from the petrochemical and fishing industries. By formally recognizing this day, the resolution promotes local pride and fosters community engagement within the county and beyond.

Summary

House Resolution 281 recognizes February 7, 2017, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol. The resolution highlights the rich history and heritage of Matagorda County, a region that has played an essential role in Texas since it was part of Stephen F. Austin's first colony in the early 19th century. The bill underscores Matagorda County's development, including its prominence as a significant seaport, the diversification of its economy through the establishment of the oil and gas industry, and the ongoing importance of ranching and farming in the region.

Sentiment

The general sentiment surrounding HR281 is highly positive, serving as a unifying recognition of the cultural significance of Matagorda County. Lawmakers and local citizens view the resolution as an opportunity to celebrate their heritage and boost local morale. The atmosphere is one of appreciation, reflecting a broader commitment to recognizing local histories within the context of state pride.

Contention

Although the bill was passed unanimously and was well-received by those present, it does highlight the ongoing discussions about the importance of local identities in the larger narrative of Texas history. Such resolutions can sometimes provoke debate over resource allocation and representation, particularly among varied communities that may feel overshadowed in state narratives. However, there were no significant points of contention noted in the discussions regarding this specific resolution.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR554

Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR322

Recognizing February 10, 2015, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR684

Recognizing March 5, 2013, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR364

Recognizing February 19, 2019, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.