Massachusetts 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H4022 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/27/2023

                    1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 4498       FILED ON: 7/27/2023
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 4022
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
COMMONWEALTH 	OF MASSACHUSETTS
STATE HOUSE · , MA 
(617) 725-4000
MAURA T. HEALEY
GOVERNOR
KIMBERLEY DRISCOLL
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
July 27, 2023
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives,
I am filing for your prompt consideration a bill entitled “An Act Making Certain 
Appropriations for Fiscal Year 2024 Before Final Action on the General Appropriation Bill.”
Section 1 provides the spending authorization to maintain necessary services through 
August 31, 2023, pending the passage of the General Appropriation Act. This authorization is in 
addition to that contained in Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2023, the Fiscal Year 2024 interim 
budget, which was signed into law on June 26, 2023. 	All actions taken under this section will 
apply to the General Appropriation Act. 
In order to ensure that the Commonwealth will be able to meet its payment obligations 
without delays, I urge your favorable action on this bill no later than July 31, 2023.
Respectfully Submitted
Maura T. Healey,
Governor 1 of 1
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 4022
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court
(2023-2024)
_______________
An Act making certain appropriations for fiscal year 2024 before final action on the General 
Appropriation Bill.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, the amount of 
2$6,000,000,000 is hereby appropriated for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, to meet 
3necessary obligations before the enactment of the general appropriation act for that fiscal year, 
4for the maintenance and operations of the various departments, boards, commissions and 
5institutions, including federal grant and Intragovernmental Service Fund expenditures, for other 
6necessary services and for meeting certain requirements of law. This appropriation shall cease to 
7be operative on the effective date of the general appropriation act and all actions taken under this 
8section shall apply against that general appropriation act. All expenditures made under this 
9section shall be consistent with appropriations made in the general appropriation act.
10 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on July 31, 2023.