Massachusetts 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H2574 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2025

                    1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 480       FILED ON: 1/9/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2574
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Antonio F. D. Cabral
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act to require seat belts on school buses.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Antonio F. D. Cabral13th Bristol1/9/2025Carmine Lawrence Gentile13th Middlesex2/24/2025 1 of 3
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 480       FILED ON: 1/9/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2574
By Representative Cabral of New Bedford, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 2574) of 
Antonio F. D. Cabral and Carmine Lawrence Gentile for legislation to require seat belts on 
school buses.  Public Safety and Homeland Security.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE HOUSE, NO. 2295 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act to require seat belts on school buses.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Section 7B of Chapter 90 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 
2Official Edition, is hereby amended by inserting the following clauses: 
3 (19) as of September 1, 2027, every school bus transporting students to or from a public, 
4charter or vocational school shall be equipped with a lap-shoulder belt for each permanent 
5seating accommodation designed and installed in compliance with United States motor vehicle 
6D.O.T. safety standards, which seat belt shall be always fastened about each passenger during 
7vehicle operation. 
8 (20) as of September 1, 2027, every school bus transporting students to or from a private 
9or parochial school shall be equipped with a lap-shoulder belt for each permanent seating  2 of 3
10accommodation designed and installed in compliance with United States motor vehicle D.O.T. 
11safety standards, which seat belt shall be fastened about each passenger at all times during 
12vehicle operation. 
13 SECTION 2. Section 7B of said chapter 90, as so appearing, is hereby further amended 
14by inserting after the word “practices”, in line 120, the following words: 
15 “, which shall include instruction in the use of lap-shoulder belts,” 
16 SECTION 3. Section 7L of said chapter 90, as so appearing, is hereby amended by 
17inserting after the word “seated”, in line 6, the following words: - 
18 “And, if traveling in a bus required by this chapter to have lap-shoulder belts, wearing a 
19lap-shoulder belt which is properly adjusted and fastened according to the manufacturer’s 
20instructions”. 
21 SECTION 4. Section 7AA of said chapter 90, as so appearing, is hereby amended by 
22inserting after the word “bus”, in line 12, the following words: - 
23 “, prior to September 1, 2026, unless such school bus is equipped with a lap-shoulder belt 
24system”. 
25 SECTION 5. Section 4 of chapter 175E, as so appearing, is hereby amended, by adding 
26the following subsection: 
27 (f) For motor vehicle insurance rates for school buses, the commissioner shall develop 
28and promulgate a schedule of appropriate reductions in premium charges to account for the 
29decreased risk of injury associated with the installation of a lap-shoulder belt system approved by 
30the National Highway Transportation Safety Administration in any such bus so equipped. The  3 of 3
31schedule shall be promulgated prior to September 1, 2025, provided that an owner of any school 
32bus so equipped prior to the promulgation of said schedule may apply to the commissioner and 
33receive an appropriate reduction in the premium charge.