1 of 1 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1326 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3145 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _________________ PRESENTED BY: Bradley H. Jones, Jr. _________________ To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General Court assembled: The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: An Act relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax. _______________ PETITION OF: NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/14/2025Kimberly N. Ferguson1st Worcester1/14/2025Paul K. Frost7th Worcester1/31/2025Todd M. Smola1st Hampden3/10/2025David F. DeCoste5th Plymouth1/28/2025David K. Muradian, Jr.9th Worcester1/29/2025Hannah Kane11th Worcester1/30/2025 1 of 2 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1326 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3145 By Representative Jones of North Reading, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3145) of Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax. Revenue. [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION SEE HOUSE, NO. 2844 OF 2023-2024.] The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _______________ In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court (2025-2026) _______________ An Act relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority of the same, as follows: 1 SECTION 1. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as appearing 2in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$2.60” and 3inserting in place thereof the following figure:- $2.00. 4 SECTION 2. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 5appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$2.00” and inserting in place 6thereof the following figure:- $1.50. 7 SECTION 3. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 8appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$1.50” and inserting in place 9thereof the following figure:- $1.00. 2 of 2 10 SECTION 4. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 11appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$1.00” and inserting in place 12thereof the following figure:- $.50. 13 SECTION 5. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 14appearing, is hereby amended by striking clause (1) and (2) and inserting in place thereof the 15following:- 16 “(1)(i) For tax years beginning before January 1, 2020, 9.5 per cent of its net income 17determined to be taxable in accordance with this chapter; (ii) for tax years beginning on or after 18January 1, 2010, but before January 1, 2021, 8.75 per cent of its net income determined to be 19taxable in accordance with this chapter; (iii) for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, 20but before January 1, 2022, 8.25 per cent of its net income determined to be taxable in 21accordance with this chapter; or (iv) for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, 8.0 per 22cent of its net income determined to be taxable in accordance with this chapter. 23 SECTION 6. Section 1 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2026. 24 SECTION 7. Section 2 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2027. 25 SECTION 8. Section 3 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2028. 26 SECTION 9. Section 4 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2029. 27 SECTION 10. Section 5 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2030.