1 of 1 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1347 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3147 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _________________ PRESENTED BY: Bradley H. Jones, Jr. _________________ To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General Court assembled: The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: An Act relative to the conservation land tax credit. _______________ PETITION OF: NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/14/2025Kimberly N. Ferguson1st Worcester1/14/2025Paul K. Frost7th Worcester1/31/2025Todd M. Smola1st Hampden3/10/2025Hannah Kane11th Worcester1/28/2025David F. DeCoste5th Plymouth1/28/2025David K. Muradian, Jr.9th Worcester1/29/2025Steven George Xiarhos5th Barnstable1/30/2025James B. EldridgeMiddlesex and Worcester2/11/2025David T. Vieira3rd Barnstable2/24/2025Rodney M. Elliott16th Middlesex2/27/2025Mary S. Keefe15th Worcester3/4/2025 1 of 3 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1347 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3147 By Representative Jones of North Reading, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3147) of Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others relative to the conservation land tax credit. Revenue. [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION SEE HOUSE, NO. 2839 OF 2023-2024.] The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _______________ In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court (2025-2026) _______________ An Act relative to the conservation land tax credit. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority of the same, as follows: 1 SECTION 1. Section 6 of chapter 62 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 2Official Edition, is hereby amended by inserting after the word “amended”, in line 769, the 3following words:- , or a private nonprofit trust established pursuant to chapter 203 organized for 4the purposes of land conservation, which is authorized to do business in the commonwealth, and 5which has tax-exempt status as a nonprofit charitable organization as described in section 6501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended.. 7 SECTION 2. Said section 6 of said chapter 62, as so appearing, is hereby further 8amended by striking out, in line 835, the figure “$2,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the 9following figure:- $3,000,000. 2 of 3 10 SECTION 3. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out 11the figure “$3,000,000”, inserted by section 40B, and inserting in place thereof the following 12figure:- $4,000,000. 13 SECTION 4. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out, 14in line 835, the figure “$4,000,000”, inserted by section 40C, and inserting in place thereof the 15following figure:- $5,000,000. 16 SECTION 5. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out 17the figure “$5,000,000”, inserted by section 40D, and inserting in place thereof the following 18figure:- $2,000,000. 19 SECTION 6. Section 38AA of chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended by 20inserting after the word “amended”, in line 29, the following words:- , or a private nonprofit trust 21established pursuant to chapter 203 organized for the purposes of land conservation, which is 22authorized to do business in the commonwealth, and which has tax-exempt status as a nonprofit 23charitable organization as described in section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, 24as amended. 25 SECTION 7. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended 26by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$2,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the following 27figure:- $3,000,000. 28 SECTION 8. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended 29by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$3,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the following 30figure:- $4,000,000. 3 of 3 31 SECTION 9. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended 32by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$4,000,000.” and inserting in place thereof the following 33figure:- “$5,000,000” 34 SECTION 10. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63 is hereby further amended by 35striking out the figure “$5,000,000”, inserted by section 41D, and inserting in place thereof the 36following figure:- $2,000,000. 37 SECTION 11. Sections 1, 2, 6 and 7 shall take effect on January 1, 2026. 38 SECTION 12. Sections 3 and 8 shall take effect on January 1, 2027. 39 SECTION 13. Sections 4 and 9 shall take effect on January 1, 2028. 40 SECTION 14. Sections 5 and 10 of this act shall take effect on December 31, 2035.