Massachusetts 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S394 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2025

                    1 of 1
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237       FILED ON: 1/15/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Jason M. Lewis
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Jason M. LewisFifth MiddlesexJoanne M. ComerfordHampshire, Franklin and Worcester2/4/2025Leigh Davis3rd Berkshire2/27/2025 1 of 3
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237       FILED ON: 1/15/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394
By Mr. Lewis, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 394) of Jason M. Lewis, Joanne M. 
Comerford and Leigh Davis for legislation to increase the Commonwealth's share of the 
education foundation budget. Education.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE SENATE, NO. 303 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 
2the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 
3following:- 
4 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 
5which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 
6specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 58 per cent.
7 SECTION 2. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 
8the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 
9following:-  2 of 3
10 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 
11which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 
12specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 57 per cent.
13 SECTION 3. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 
14the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 
15following:- 
16 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 
17which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 
18specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 56 per cent.
19 SECTION 4. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 
20the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 
21following:- 
22 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 
23which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 
24specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 55 per cent.
25 SECTION 5. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 
26the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 
27following:- 
28 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 
29which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 
30specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 54 per cent. 3 of 3
31 SECTION 6. Section 2 shall take effect on January 1, 2026.
32 SECTION 7. Section 3 shall take effect on January 1, 2027.
33 SECTION 8. Section 4 shall take effect on January 1, 2028.
34 SECTION 9. Section 5 shall take effect on January 1, 2029.