Massachusetts 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S574 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2025

                    1 of 1
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1864       FILED ON: 1/16/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 574
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
William J. Driscoll, Jr.
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act establishing memorial markers in the towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain 
law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :William J. Driscoll, Jr.Norfolk, Plymouth and Bristol 1 of 2
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1864       FILED ON: 1/16/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 574
By Mr. Driscoll, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 574) of William J. Driscoll, Jr. that 
the Department of Conservation and Recreation erect and maintain memorial markers in the 
towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain law enforcement officers killed in the line of 
duty. Environment and Natural Resources.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE HOUSE, NO. 786 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act establishing memorial markers in the towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain 
law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 The department of conservation and recreation shall erect and maintain 4 suitable 
2markers in memory of 4 law enforcement officers who were killed in the line of duty. The 
3markers shall be similar in form to street signs, shall be placed on sidewalk land islands at the 
4locations near where each officer was killed, and shall each include the name of the officer and 
5the circumstances of their death, as follows:
6 (i) to be placed on 158 Blue Hills Parkway, northbound, in the Town of Milton in 
7memory of Patrolman Robert Dana, noting “On March 25, 1984, while conducting a traffic stop 
8in the Town of Milton on Blue Hills Parkway, Patrolman Dana was shot and fatally wounded.”; 2 of 2
9 (ii) to be placed on Blue Hills Parkway, northbound, at Parkway Crescent in the Town of 
10Milton in memory of Patrolman Robert Edmonds, noting “On December 23, 1936, while on 
11pursuit of a stolen vehicle on Blue Hills Parkway in the Town of Milton, Patrolman Edmonds 
12collided with a tree and subsequently succumbed to his injuries.”;
13 (iii) to be placed on Hillside street at Chickatawbut road in the Town of Milton in 
14memory of Patrolman Robert Stewart, noting “On February 8, 1913, while on mounted patrol, 
15Patrolman Stewart was thrown from his horse on Hillside Street in the Town of Milton. 
16Patrolman Stewart subsequently succumbed to his injuries.”;
17 (iv) to be placed near Fisherman’s Beach at Ponkapoag pond in the Town of Canton, in 
18memory of Patrolman William Mateer, noting “On January 10, 1909, while attempting to rescue 
19a fisherman who had fallen through the ice on Ponkapoag Pond in the Town of Canton, both 
20Patrolman Mateer and the fisherman drowned.”