Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB28 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/22/2021

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0028*  
  
HOUSE BILL 28 
J2, J1   	2lr1062 
HB 1594/20 – HRU 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 2lr1060 
By: Delegates Bhandari and R. Lewis 
Requested: October 29, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Pharmacists – Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use 2 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of regulations 3 
adopted by the State Board of Pharmacy to prescribe and dispense nicotine 4 
replacement therapy medications approved by the U.S. Food and Drug 5 
Administration as aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; and generally 6 
relating to the prescribing and dispensing of aids for the cessation of the use of 7 
tobacco products. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 
 Article – Health Occupations 10 
Section 12–101(a) and (b) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Health Occupations 15 
Section 12–101(x) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 18 
 
BY adding to 19 
 Article – Health Occupations 20 
Section 12–514 21 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 22 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 23 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 24 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 25 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 28  
 
 
Article – Health Occupations 1 
 
12–101. 2 
 
 (a) In this title the following words have the meanings indicated. 3 
 
 (b) “Authorized prescriber” means any licensed dentist, licensed dental hygienist 4 
with prescriptive authority under § 4–206.4 of this article, licensed physician, licensed 5 
podiatrist, licensed veterinarian, advanced practice nurse with prescriptive authority 6 
under § 8–508 of this article, or other individual authorized by law to prescribe prescription 7 
or nonprescription drugs or devices. 8 
 
 (x) (1) “Practice pharmacy” means to engage in any of the following activities: 9 
 
 (i) Providing pharmaceutical care; 10 
 
 (ii) Compounding, dispensing, or distributing prescription drugs or 11 
devices; 12 
 
 (iii) Compounding or dispensing nonprescription drugs or devices; 13 
 
 (iv) Monitoring prescriptions for prescription and nonprescription 14 
drugs or devices; 15 
 
 (v) Providing information, explanation, or recommendations to 16 
patients and health care practitioners about the safe and effective use of prescription or 17 
nonprescription drugs or devices; 18 
 
 (vi) Identifying and appraising problems concerning the use or 19 
monitoring of therapy with drugs or devices; 20 
 
 (vii) Acting within the parameters of a therapy management contract, 21 
as provided under Subtitle 6A of this title; 22 
 
 (viii) Administering vaccinations in accordance with § 12–508 of this 23 
title or self–administered drugs or maintenance injectable medications in accordance with 24 
§ 12–509 of this title; 25 
 
 (ix) Delegating a pharmacy act to a registered pharmacy technician, 26 
pharmacy student, or an individual engaged in a Board approved pharmacy technician 27 
training program; 28 
 
 (x) Supervising a delegated pharmacy act performed by a registered 29 
pharmacy technician, pharmacy student, or an individual engaged in a Board approved 30 
pharmacy technician training program; 31 
 
 (xi) Providing drug therapy management in accordance with 32   	HOUSE BILL 28 	3 
 
 
§ 19–713.6 of the Health – General Article; [or] 1 
 
 (xii) Prescribing and dispensing contraceptive medications and  2 
self–administered contraceptive devices approved by the U.S. Food and Drug 3 
Administration; OR 4 
 
 (XIII) PRESCRIBING AND DISPE NSING NICOTIN E REPLACEMENT 5 
THERAPY MEDICATIONS APPROVED BY THE U.S. FOOD AND DRUG 6 
ADMINISTRATION AS AN AID FOR THE CESSATIO N OF THE USE OF TOBA CCO 7 
PRODUCTS. 8 
 
 (2) “Practice pharmacy” does not include the operations of a person who 9 
holds a permit issued under § 12–6C–03 of this title. 10 
 
12–514. 11 
 
 (A) A PHARMACIST WHO MEETS THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE REGULATIONS 12 
ADOPTED UNDER THIS S ECTION MAY PRESCRIBE AND DISPENSE NICOTIN E 13 
REPLACEMENT THERAPY MEDICATIONS APPROVED BY THE U.S. FOOD AND DRUG 14 
ADMINISTRATION AS AN AID FOR THE CE SSATION OF THE USE O F TOBACCO 15 
PRODUCTS. 16 
 
 (B) (1) ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2023, THE BOARD SHALL ADOPT 17 
REGULATIONS ESTABLIS HING: 18 
 
 (I) STANDARD PROCEDURES T HAT A PHARMACIST SHA LL USE 19 
TO: 20 
 
 1. PRESCRIBE AND DISPENS E TO A PATIENT THE 21 
APPROPRIATE AID FOR THE CESSATION OF THE USE OF TOBACCO P RODUCTS BY THE 22 
PATIENT; AND 23 
 
 2. REFER THE PATIENT TO 	A PRIMARY CARE 24 
PRACTITIONER FOR TRE ATMENT; AND 25 
 
 (II) THE CONDITIONS UNDER WHICH A PHARMACIST M AY 26 
PRESCRIBE AND DISPEN SE AN AID FOR THE CE SSATION OF THE USE OF TOBACCO 27 
PRODUCTS. 28 
 
 (2) THE REGULATIONS SHALL REQUIRE A PHARMACIST TO: 29 
 
 (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (3) OF THIS 30 
SUBSECTION, COMPLETE A TRAINING PROGRAM APPROVED BY THE BOARD FOR 31 
PRESCRIBING AND DISP ENSING AIDS FOR THE CESSATION OF THE USE OF TOBACCO 32 
PRODUCTS; 33  4 	HOUSE BILL 28  
 
 
 
 (II) FOLLOW THE STANDARD P ROCEDURES ESTABLISHE D BY 1 
THE BOARD; AND 2 
 
 (III) AFTER PRESCRIBING AND DISPENSING TO A PATI ENT AN 3 
AID FOR THE CESSATIO N OF THE USE OF TOBA CCO PRODUCTS : 4 
 
 1. REFER THE PATIENT FOR ANY ADDITIONAL CARE TO 5 
THE PATIENT’S PRIMARY CARE PRACT ITIONER; 6 
 
 2. PROVIDE THE PATIENT W ITH: 7 
 
 A. A WRITTEN RECORD OF TH	E MEDICATION 8 
DISPENSED; AND 9 
 
 B. INFORMATION ON THE IM PORTANCE OF THE PATI ENT 10 
SEEING THE PATIENT ’S PRIMARY CARE PRACT ITIONER; AND 11 
 
 3. RECORD THE PRESCRIBING AND DISP ENSING OF THE 12 
AID FOR THE CESSATIO N OF THE USE OF TOBA CCO PRODUCTS IN ANY ELECTRONIC 13 
HEALTH RECORD MAINTA INED FOR THE PATIENT BY THE PHARMACIST . 14 
 
 (3) THE REGULATIONS SHALL WAIVE THE REQUIREMEN T TO 15 
COMPLETE THE TRAININ G PROGRAM UNDER PARAGRAPH (2)(I) OF THIS 16 
SUBSECTION FOR A PHA RMACIST WHO ALREADY HAS UNDERGONE THE TR AINING AS 17 
PART OF THE PHARMACI ST’S FORMAL EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM. 18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 19 
October 1, 2022. 20