Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB665 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/17/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0665*  
  
HOUSE BILL 665 
F1   	2lr1661 
    	CF SB 576 
By: Delegates Jackson, Belcastro, Bhandari, Boteler, C. Branch, Brooks, 
Charkoudian, Charles, Ebersole, Forbes, Guyton, Henson, R. Jones, Kipke, 
Korman, Landis, Love, Proctor, Ruth, Watson, Williams, and P. Young 
Introduced and read first time: January 31, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 9, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Schools – Air Quality Testing – Posting Online 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to adopt 3 
regulations to set minimal standards for air quality standards; requiring each county 4 
board of education to retain utilize the services of a qualified indoor air quality 5 
investigator to conduct any indoor air quality tests the board chooses to have 6 
conducted in a public school in the county; requiring a county board and the State 7 
Department of Education, on receipt of a request by a member of the public for the 8 
results of an indoor air quality test, to post the results on its website provide the 9 
results in a certain manner; requiring county boards of education to report to the 10 
Interagency Commission certain information on air quality standards on or before a 11 
certain date; requiring the Interagency Commission to compile and report certain 12 
information to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before a certain date; 13 
and generally relating to indoor air quality testing in public schools. 14 
 
BY adding to 15 
 Article – Education 16 
Section 7–447.2 5–327 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 19 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 20 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 665  
 
 
 
Article – Education 1 
 
7–447.2. 5–327. 2 
 
 (A) EACH COUNTY BOARD SHA LL RETAIN UTILIZE THE SERVICES OF A 3 
QUALIFIED INDOOR AIR QUALITY INVESTIGATOR TO CONDUCT ANY INDOO R AIR 4 
QUALITY TESTING THE BOARD CH OOSES TO HAVE CONDUC TED IN A PUBLIC SCHO OL 5 
IN THE COUNTY. 6 
 
 (B) (1) ON RECEIPT OF THE RES ULTS OF AN INDOOR AI R QUALITY TEST, 7 
A COUNTY BOARD SHALL : 8 
 
 (I) POST THE RESULTS ON I TS WEBSITE; AND 9 
 
 (II) SUBMIT SUBMIT THE RESULTS TO THE DEPARTMENT AND 10 
THE INTERAGENCY COMMISSION. 11 
 
 (2) ON RECEIPT OF A REQUEST BY A MEMBE R OF THE PUBLIC TO V IEW 12 
THE RESULTS OF AN IN DOOR AIR QUALITY TES T, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL POST 13 
THE RESULTS ON ITS W EBSITE COUNTY BOARD SHALL P ROVIDE THE RE SULTS TO A 14 
MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC . 15 
 
 (3) THE RESULTS POSTED UNDER PARAGRA PHS (1)(I) AND PROVIDED 16 
UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL BE:  17 
 
 (I) WRITTEN IN A MANNER T HAT IS CLEAR AND EAS Y FOR THE 18 
PUBLIC TO UNDERSTAND ; AND 19 
 
 (II) POSTED IN A CONSPICUOUS LOCATION THAT IS EASY FOR 20 
THE PUBLIC TO FIND A ND ACCESS PROVIDED IN A TIMELY MANNER. 21 
 
 (C) THE INTERAGENCY COMMISSION SHALL ADOP T REGULATIONS 22 
ESTABLISHING MINIMAL AIR QUALITY STANDARD S IN PUBLIC SCHOOLS . 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 24 
 
 (a) On or before August 1, 2023, the Interagency Commission on School 25 
Construction shall adopt regulations establishing minimal air quality standards in schools. 26 
 
 (b) On or before December 1, 2023, each county board of education, including 27 
Baltimore City, shall report to the Interagency Commission on School Construction: 28 
   	HOUSE BILL 665 	3 
 
 
 (1) each county board of education’s own air quality standards and where 1 
they exceed the Interagency Commission’s minimal standards, adopted under subsection 2 
(a) of this section; 3 
 
 (2) how each county board of education plans to implement its air quality 4 
standards; and 5 
 
 (3) the schedule each county board of education proposes to bring each 6 
public school within the county board’s jurisdiction in compliance with the county board’s 7 
air quality standards. 8 
 
 (c) The Interagency Commission on School Construction shall:  9 
 
 (1) compile the reports received under subsection (b) of this section; and  10 
 
 (2) report to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 11 
Government Article, the General Assembly, the information compiled under item (1) of this 12 
subsection.  13 
 
 SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 14 
July 1, 2022.  15 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.