Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB69 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/15/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0069*  
  
HOUSE BILL 69 
Q1   	2lr0862 
HB 1290/21 – W&M 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 247 
By: Delegate Amprey 
Requested: October 20, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 15, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments 2 
and Appeals 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to 4 
publish on the Department’s website certain information relating to the assessment 5 
process and methodology used by the Department in determining the value of real 6 
property; allowing certain authorities authorized to hear property tax appeals to 7 
consider certain criteria when hearing an appeal that relates to the valuation of real 8 
property; and generally relating to the State Department of Assessments and 9 
Taxation, property assessments, and appeals. 10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Tax – Property 12 
Section 2–218.2 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 
 Article – Tax – Property 17 
Section 14–516 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 20 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 69  
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Tax – Property 3 
 
2–218.2. 4 
 
 THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PUBL ISH ON THE DEPARTMENT ’S WEBSITE A PLAIN 5 
LANGUAGE DESCRIPTION OF THE FOLLOWING : 6 
 
 (1) THE METHODOLOGY APPL IED IN THE VALUATION AND 7 
ASSESSMENT PROCESS ; 8 
 
 (2) ANY ADJUSTMENTS IN V ALUE THAT AN ASSESSO R IS AUTHORIZED 9 
TO MAKE;  10 
 
 (3) THE CRITERIA USED TO DETERMINE THE D EPRECIATION VALUE 11 
OF REAL PROPERTY ;  12 
 
 (4) THE CIRCUMSTANCES UN DER WHICH THE DEPARTMENT IS 13 
REQUIRED TO REVALUE REAL PROPERTY IN ANY YEAR OF A 3–YEAR CYCLE; AND 14 
 
 (5) ANY OTHER FACTORS RE LEVANT TO THE VALUAT ION OF REAL 15 
PROPERTY BY THE DEPARTMENT . 16 
 
14–516. 17 
 
 (a) In this section, “appeal authority” includes: 18 
 
 (1) a supervisor; 19 
 
 (2) the Department; 20 
 
 (3) a property tax assessment appeal board; 21 
 
 (4) the Maryland Tax Court; and 22 
 
 (5) any other court authorized to hear property tax appeals under this 23 
subtitle. 24 
 
 (B) IN HEARING AN APPEAL UNDER THIS SUBTITLE THAT RELATES TO THE 25 
VALUE OF REAL PROPER TY, AN APPEAL AUTHORITY MAY CONSIDER THE FOL LOWING 26 
CRITERIA IN MAKING I TS FINAL DECISION : 27 
 
 (1) THE FAIR MARKET VALU E OF THE REAL PROPER TY; 28 
   	HOUSE BILL 69 	3 
 
 
 (2) THE VALUATI ON AND ASSESSMENT ME THODOLOGY EMPLOYED B Y 1 
THE ASSESSOR; 2 
 
 (3) DEPRECIATION FACTORS ; OR 3 
 
 (4) THE ASSESSMENT VALUE OF COMPARABLE PROPER TIES; OR 4 
 
 (5) ANY OTHER CRITERIA R ELATED TO THE VALUAT ION AND 5 
ASSESSMENT OF REAL P ROPERTY. 6 
 
 [(b)] (C) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, within 30 days after 7 
the Department provides notice to a tax collector to whom property tax was paid that an 8 
appeal authority has issued a decision that reduces the assessed value of property, the tax 9 
collector shall pay to the taxpayer a full refund of the excess tax paid. 10 
 
 (2) The notice required under paragraph (1) of this subsection shall include 11 
a list of all properties for which an appeal authority has calculated that a taxpayer is due 12 
a refund as a result of a decision by the appeal authority to reduce the assessed value of 13 
the property. 14 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 15 
October 1, 2022. 16 
 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.