Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB716 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/08/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0716*  
  
HOUSE BILL 716 
M3   	2lr2040 
    	CF SB 367 
By: Delegates Lehman, Pena–Melnyk, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Bhandari, 
Brooks, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Forbes, Fraser –Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, 
Holmes, R. Jones, Love, Moon, Ruth, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, Watson, and 
Williams Williams, Boyce, Clark, Foley, Gilchrist, Jalisi, Lierman, Stein, 
Stewart, and Wells 
Introduced and read first time: January 31, 2022 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 2, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Patuxent River Commission – Membership 2 
 
FOR the purpose of adding the Patuxent Riverkeeper as a voting member altering the 3 
membership of the Patuxent River Commission; and generally relating to the 4 
Patuxent River Commission. 5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 6 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 7 
Section 5–812 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 12 
Section 5–814 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 716  
 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 1 
 
5–812. 2 
 
 There is a Patuxent River Commission in the Department. 3 
 
5–814. 4 
 
 (a) The Commission consists of the following [34] 35 voting members [appointed 5 
by the Governor]: 6 
 
 (1) 7 individuals, 1 from each of the following 7 counties, APPOINTED BY 7 
THE GOVERNOR on the recommendation of the governing body of that county: 8 
 
 (i) Anne Arundel County; 9 
 
 (ii) Calvert County; 10 
 
 (iii) Charles County; 11 
 
 (iv) Howard County; 12 
 
 (v) Montgomery County; 13 
 
 (vi) Prince George’s County; and 14 
 
 (vii) St. Mary’s County; 15 
 
 (2) 1 individual representing the Washington Suburban Sanitary 16 
Commission, APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR; 17 
 
 (3) 1 individual from each of the following regional planning agencies, 18 
APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR: 19 
 
 (i) the Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission, 20 
Montgomery County; 21 
 
 (ii) the Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission, 22 
Prince George’s County; and 23 
 
 (iii) the Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland; 24 
 
 (4) 1 individual, representing a municipality in the watershed, 25 
APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR on the recommendation of the corresponding governing 26 
body of that municipality; 27 
   	HOUSE BILL 716 	3 
 
 
 (5) 1 individual representing a large federal facility in the watershed, 1 
APPOINTED BY TH E GOVERNOR; 2 
 
 (6) as far as possible, the following individuals appointed by the Governor 3 
with the advice and consent of the Senate, shall be selected to represent broad geographic, 4 
economic, and social interests within the watershed: 5 
 
 (i) 2 individuals representing farming interests; 6 
 
 (ii) 1 individual representing business interests; 7 
 
 (iii) 4 individuals representing environmental and citizen interests; 8 
 
 (iv) 2 individuals representing developer interests; 9 
 
 (v) 2 individuals 1 INDIVIDUAL representing academic interests; 10 
 
 (vi) 2 individuals, 1 each, representing 2 soil conservation districts; 11 
 
 (vii) 1 individual representing the University of Maryland 12 
Cooperative Extension Service; and 13 
 
 (viii) 1 individual representing watermen interests; [and] 14 
 
 (7) THE PATUXENT RIVERKEEPER; AND 15 
 
 (8) as ex officio members: 16 
 
 (i) the Secretary of Agriculture or a designee; 17 
 
 (ii) the Secretary of the Environment or a designee; 18 
 
 (iii) the Secretary of Natural Resources or a designee; 19 
 
 (iv) the Secretary of Planning or a designee; 20 
 
 (v) the Secretary of Transportation or a designee; and 21 
 
 (vi) the Chief of the Planning Division, U.S. Army Corps of 22 
Engineers, Baltimore District or a designee; AND 23 
 
 (VII) THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND 24 
CENTER FOR ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE OR A DESIGNEE . 25 
 
 (b) (1) The term of a member appointed under subsection (a)(1) through (6) of 26 
this section is 4 years. 27  4 	HOUSE BILL 716  
 
 
 
 (2) At the end of a term, a member appointed under subsection (a)(1) 1 
through (6) of this section continues to serve until a successor is appointed and qualifies. 2 
 
 (3) A member who is appointed under subsection (a)(1) through (6) of this 3 
section after a term has begun serves only for the rest of the term and until a successor is 4 
appointed and qualifies. 5 
 
 (4) The terms of the members are staggered as required by the terms 6 
provided for members of the Commission on October 1, 1995. 7 
 
 (c) (1) The Commission may establish and abolish nonvoting memberships. 8 
 
 (2) A nonvoting member shall be appointed by the Commission for a term 9 
set by the Commission. 10 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Patuxent Riverkeeper 11 
shall become a full voting member of the Patuxent River Commission on June 1, 2022.  12 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 13 
1, 2022. 14 
 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.