LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 499 – 1 – Chapter 499 (House Bill 725) AN ACT concerning Children – Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program – Funding Establishment FOR the purpose of establishing the Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program to provide specialized child care and early childhood education by funding to educators, early intervention providers, mental health providers, and health care providers to certain grants to certain providers that provide specialized child care and early education to children under a certain age who have delays in development, physical disabilities, or delays in social, emotional, or behavioral functioning; requiring certain providers who received certain grants to report certain information to the State Department of Education on or before certain dates; requiring the Department to compile certain information and provide reports to certain committees on or before certain dates; and generally relating to the Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program. BY adding to Article – Education Section 8–420 Annotated Code of Maryland (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: Article – Education 8–420. (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS INDICATED. (2) “DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL , OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONING ” MEANS (2) “ELIGIBLE CHILD” MEANS A CHILD UNDER THE AGE OF 6 YEARS WITH DEVELOPMENTAL D ELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING THAT NECESSITA TE SPECIALIZED CHILD CARE AND EARLY EDUCATION SERVI CES INCLUDING : (I) A SIGNIFICANT DEVELOPM ENTAL DELAY OR ATYPI CAL DEVELOPMENT , AS IDENTIFIED BY A H EALTH PROFESSIONAL , IN: Ch. 499 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 2 – 1. COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT ; 2. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT ; 3. LANGUAGE AND SPEECH D EVELOPMENT ; 4. PSYCHOSOCIAL DEVELOPMENT ; OR 5. SELF–HELP SKILLS; (II) PSYCHOLOGICAL TRAUMA , AS IDENTIFIED THROUG H AN EVALUATION BY A MENT AL HEALTH PROFESSION AL; OR (III) A DIAGNOSED PHYSICAL , DEVELOPMENTAL , OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITION THA T IMPACTS DAILY LIVI NG AND LIMITS PARTICIPATION IN TYPICAL EARLY CHILDH OOD EDUCATION OR CHI LD CARE SETTINGS . (3) “ELIGIBLE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROVIDER ” MEANS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CA RE PROVIDER DESIGNAT ED BY THE DEPARTMENT FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE PROGRAM UNDER SUBSECT ION (C)(3) OF THIS SECTION. (4) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM. (5) “THERAPEUTIC CHILD CAR E PROVIDER” INCLUDES EDUCATORS , EARLY INTERVENTION P ROVIDERS, MENTAL HEALTH PROVID ERS, AND HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS WHOSE MISSION IS TO PROVID E SPECIALIZED C HILD CARE AND EARLY EDUCATION SERV ICES TO ELIGIBLE CHI LDREN. (B) THERE IS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM IN THE STATE. (C) (1) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE SPECIALIZED CHILD CARE AND EARLY CHILD HOOD EDUCATION BY ED UCATORS, EARLY INTERVENTION PROVIDERS, MENTAL HEALTH PROVID ERS, AND HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS TO CHILDREN UNDER THE A GE OF 6 YEARS WHO HAVE : (1) DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS ; (2) PHYSICAL DISABILITIES ; OR (3) DELAYS IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING FUNDING TO ELIGIBLE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROVIDERS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ELIGIBL E CHILDREN. (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ADMI NISTER THE PROGRAM. LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 499 – 3 – (3) ON MAY 1 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL DESI GNATE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CA RE PROVIDERS FOR PAR TICIPATION IN THE PROGRAM. (4) ON MAY 1 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COUN T ALL ELIGIBLE CHILDREN AT EACH ELIGIBLE THERAP EUTIC CHILD CARE PRO VIDER. (D) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDGET BILL AN APPROPRIATION TO THE PROGRAM IN AN AMOUNT NOT LESS THAN THE PE R PUPIL FUNDING AMOUNT OF $45,000 FOR EACH CHILD SERVE D WHO HAS DEVELOPMEN TAL DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONI NG. (2) (I) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN ON OR BEFORE MARCH 5, 2020, THE PER PUPIL FUNDING AM OUNT SHALL BE CALCUL ATED USING THE HIGHE R OF: 1. THE JANUARY 1, 2019, ENROLLMENT ; OR 2. THE JANUARY 1, 2023, ENROLLMENT . (II) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN AFT ER MARCH 5, 2020, THE PER PUPIL FUNDING AMOUNT SHALL BE CALCULATED USING THE JANUARY 1, 2023, ENROLLMENT . (3) BEGINNING IN FISCAL Y EAR 2025 AND EACH FISCAL YEAR THEREAFTER , THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCREA SE THE PER PUPIL FUN DING AMOUNT UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION B Y THE LESSER OF : (I) THE CONSUMER PRICE INDEX FOR ALL URBAN CONSUMERS FOR THE WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA, OR ANY SUCCESSOR INDEX; OR (II) 1.5%. (4) THE PROGRAM MAY BE FUNDED FROM: (I) THE GENERAL FUND OF THE STATE; AND (II) ANY OTHER SOURCES . Ch. 499 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 4 – (D) (1) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024 AND EACH FISCAL YEAR THEREAFTER , THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN APPROPRIATIO N OF $3,750,000 TO THE PROGRAM. (2) USING THE COUNT OF EL IGIBLE CHILDREN AT E ACH ELIGIBLE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CA RE PROVIDER ON MAY 1 OF THE PREVIOUS FISC AL YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL DIST RIBUTE THE FULL APPR OPRIATION LISTED UND ER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION T O EACH ELIGIBLE THER APEUTIC CHILD CARE PROVIDER IN AN AMOUNT PROPORTIONATE TO THE NUMBER OF ELI GIBLE CHILDREN SERVED BY T HE ELIGIBLE PROVIDER OUT OF THE TOTAL NUM BER OF ELIGIBLE CHILDREN SE RVED BY ALL ELIGIBLE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROVIDERS. (2) “DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING” MEANS: (I) A SIGNIFICANT DEVELOPM ENTAL DELAY OR ATYPI CAL DEVELOPMENT , AS IDENTIFIED BY A H EALTH PROFESSIONAL , IN: 1. COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT ; 2. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT ; 3. LANGUAGE AND SPEECH D EVELOPMENT ; 4. PSYCHOSOCIAL DEVELOPM ENT; OR 5. SELF–HELP SKILLS; (II) PSYCHOLOGICAL TRAUMA , AS IDENTIFIED THROUG H AN EVALUATION BY A MENT AL HEALTH PROFESSI ONAL; OR (III) A DIAGNOSED PHYSICAL , DEVELOPMENTAL , OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITION THA T IMPACTS DAILY LIVI NG AND LIMITS PARTIC IPATION IN TYPICAL EARLY CHILDH OOD EDUCATION OR CHI LD CARE SETTINGS . (3) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE GRANT PROGRAM. (B) THERE IS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE GRANT PROGRAM IN THE STATE. LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 499 – 5 – (C) (1) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO PROVIDERS THAT SPECI ALIZE IN PROVIDING C HILD CARE AND EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION TO CHILDRE N UNDER THE AGE OF 6 YEARS WHO HAVE DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONI NG. (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ADMI NISTER THE PROGRAM. (3) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 15 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL AWARD GRANTS UNDER T HIS SECTION. (D) (1) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YE ARS 2023 THROUGH 2025, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN APPROPRIA TION OF $3,700,000 TO THE PROGRAM. (2) IN AWARDING GRANTS UN DER THE PROGRAM, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL DISTRIBUTE : (I) $1,283,000 TO EXISTING PROVIDERS IN THE SAME AMOUNT AS WAS PROVIDED IN F ISCAL YEAR 2022; (II) $1,917,000 TO EXISTING PROVIDER S IN THE SAME PROPORTION AS WAS PR OVIDED IN FISCAL YEA R 2022 TO PROVIDE ADDITIONA L SERVICES; AND (III) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (3) OF THIS SUBSECTION, $500,000 TO NEW PROVIDERS OR EXISTING PROVIDERS T O ENROLL ADDITIONAL CHILDREN . (3) IF FUNDS ARE REMAININ G AFTER THE DISTRIBU TION REQUIRED UNDER PARAGRAPH (2)(III) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THEN THE REMAINDER S HALL BE DISTRIBUTED AS PROVI DED UNDER PARAGRAPH (2)(II) OF THIS SUBSECTION . (E) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2022, AND DECEMBER 1, 2023, THE PROVIDERS WHO RECEIV ED A GRANT UNDER THI S SECTION SHALL REPO RT TO THE DEPARTMENT THE COST O F PROVIDING SERVICES TO A CHILD WITH DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING AND THE SOURCE S OF FUNDING RECEIVED BY THE PROV IDER. (2) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 30, 2022, AND DECEMBER 30, 2023, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COMP ILE THE INFORMATION PROVIDED UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND SHALL REPORT THE COMPILED INFORMATION TO THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE AND THE Ch. 499 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 6 – HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. (F) THE DEPARTMENT MAY ADOPT REGULATIONS NECESSAR Y TO CARRY OUT THIS SECTION . SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1, 2022. Enacted under Article II, § 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution, May 29, 2022.