Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB97 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/22/2021

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0097*  
  
HOUSE BILL 97 
J2   	2lr0857 
HB 915/21 – HGO 	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Delegate Amprey 
Requested: October 20, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other 2 
Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific 4 
Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals; and 5 
generally relating to the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific 6 
Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals.  7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and 10 
Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals. 11 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 12 
 
 (1) the President of Bowie State University, or the President’s designee; 13 
 
 (2) the President of Coppin State University, or the President’s designee; 14 
 
 (3) the President of Morgan State University, or the President’s designee; 15 
 
 (4) the President of University of Maryland Eastern Shore, or the 16 
President’s designee; and 17 
 
 (5) the following members, appointed by the Secretary of Health: 18 
 
 (i) one representative each from at least three different hospital 19 
networks in the State that primarily serve Black, Latino, or Asian American Pacific 20 
Islander communities; 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 97  
 
 
 
 (ii) three representatives from the behavioral health profession in 1 
the State;  2 
 
 (iii) three individuals who provide social services in the State; and 3 
 
 (iv) at least two but not more than four representatives of 4 
organizations, networks, or associations of behavioral health professionals that: 5 
 
 1. are composed of a majority of Black, Latino, Asian 6 
American Pacific Islander, or other underrepresented behavioral health professionals; and 7 
 
 2. primarily work to represent and support Black, Latino, 8 
Asian American Pacific Islander, or other underrepresented behavioral health 9 
professionals. 10 
 
 (c) The Secretary of Health shall designate the chair of the Workgroup. 11 
 
 (d) The University System of Maryland and the Maryland Department of Health 12 
jointly shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 13 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup or any subgroup established under subsection (g) 14 
of this section: 15 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup or 16 
subgroup; but 17 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 18 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 19 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall: 20 
 
 (1) identify and study the shortage of behavioral health professionals in 21 
the State who are Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, or otherwise 22 
underrepresented in the behavioral health profession; and 23 
 
 (2) assess and make recommendations on incentives or other methods to 24 
increase the number of: 25 
 
 (i) students who are Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, 26 
or otherwise underrepresented in the behavioral health profession who study at an 27 
institution of higher education in the State to be behavioral health professionals; and 28 
 
 (ii) behavioral health professionals who are Black, Latino, Asian 29 
American Pacific Islander, or otherwise underrepresented in the behavioral health 30 
profession who provide behavioral health services in the State, especially in underserved 31 
communities. 32   	HOUSE BILL 97 	3 
 
 
 
 (g) (1) The Workgroup may establish a subgroup within the Workgroup to 1 
assist the Workgroup in carrying out its duties, including by conducting research and 2 
producing reports. 3 
 
 (2) A subgroup established under paragraph (1) of this subsection may 4 
include an individual who is not a member of the Workgroup, including a representative of 5 
an insurance carrier or any other relevant expert.  6 
 
 (h) On or before July 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 7 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 8 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 9 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 10 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 11 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 12 
of no further force and effect.  13