Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB97 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/15/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0097*  
  
HOUSE BILL 97 
J2   	2lr0857 
HB 915/21 – HGO 	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Delegate Amprey 
Requested: October 20, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 15, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other 2 
Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific 4 
Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals; and 5 
generally relating to the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific 6 
Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals.  7 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 
That: 9 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and 10 
Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals. 11 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 12 
 
 (1) the President of Bowie State University, or the President’s designee; 13 
 
 (2) the President of Coppin State University, or the President’s designee; 14 
 
 (3) the President of Morgan State University, or the President’s designee; 15 
 
 (4) the President of University of Maryland Eastern Shore, or the 16 
President’s designee; and 17  2 	HOUSE BILL 97  
 
 
 
 (5) the following members, appointed by the Secretary of Health: 1 
 
 (i) one representative each from at least three different hospital 2 
networks in the State that primarily serve Black, Latino, or Asian American Pacific 3 
Islander communities; 4 
 
 (ii) three representatives from the behavioral health profession in 5 
the State;  6 
 
 (iii) three individuals who provide social services in the State; and 7 
 
 (iv) at least two but not more than four representatives of 8 
organizations, networks, or associations of behavioral health professionals that: 9 
 
 1. are composed of a majority of Black, Latino, Asian 10 
American Pacific Islander, or other underrepresented behavioral health professionals; and 11 
 
 2. primarily work to represent and support Black, Latino, 12 
Asian American Pacific Islander, or other underrepresented behavioral health 13 
professionals. 14 
 
 (c) The Secretary of Health shall designate the chair of the Workgroup. 15 
 
 (d) The University System of Maryland and the Maryland Department of Health 16 
jointly shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 17 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup or any subgroup established under subsection (g) 18 
of this section: 19 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup or 20 
subgroup; but 21 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 22 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 23 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall: 24 
 
 (1) identify and study the shortage of behavioral health professionals in 25 
the State who are Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, or otherwise 26 
underrepresented in the behavioral health profession; and 27 
 
 (2) assess and make recommendations on incentives or other methods to 28 
increase the number of: 29 
 
 (i) students who are Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, 30 
or otherwise underrepresented in the behavioral health profession who study at an 31   	HOUSE BILL 97 	3 
 
 
institution of higher education in the State to be behavioral health professionals; and 1 
 
 (ii) behavioral health professionals who are Black, Latino, Asian 2 
American Pacific Islander, or otherwise underrepresented in the behavioral health 3 
profession who provide behavioral health services in the State, especially in underserved 4 
communities. 5 
 
 (g) (1) The Workgroup may establish a subgroup within the Workgroup to 6 
assist the Workgroup in carrying out its duties, including by conducting research and 7 
producing reports. 8 
 
 (2) A subgroup established under paragraph (1) of this subsection may 9 
include an individual who is not a member of the Workgroup, including a representative of 10 
an insurance carrier or any other relevant expert.  11 
 
 (h) On or before July 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 12 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 13 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 14 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 15 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 16 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 17 
of no further force and effect.  18 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.