Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HJ3 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/24/2022

                     
 
          *hj0003*  
  
HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 3 
D1   	2lr2018 
    	CF SJ 4 
By: The Speaker (By Request) 
Introduced and read first time: January 19, 2022 
Assigned to: Appropriations 
 
HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 
 
A House Joint Resolution concerning 1 
 
Judicial Compensation Commission – Recommendations 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the compensation of the members of the Judiciary in this 3 
State in accordance with Section 1–708 of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings 4 
Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland. 5 
 
 WHEREAS, Section 1–708(b)(2) of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings Article of the 6 
Annotated Code of Maryland establishes a seven –member Judicial Compensation 7 
Commission appointed by the Governor with two members appointed on nomination of the 8 
President of the Senate, two members appointed on nomination of the Speaker of the House 9 
of Delegates, one member appointed on nomination of the Maryland State Bar Association, 10 
and two members appointed at large. The Judicial Compensation Commission is 11 
constituted as follows: appointments made on the nomination of the President of the 12 
Senate: Meghan Casey and Carlos Williams; appointments made on the nomination of the 13 
Speaker of the House of Delegates: Victoria Fretwell and John Wasilisin; appointment 14 
made on the nomination of the Maryland State Bar Association: Edward Gilliss; and 15 
appointments at large: John Suit II and Alice Pinderhughes. The Commission members 16 
elected Edward Gilliss to serve as the chair of the Commission. The Commission is charged 17 
with reviewing the salaries and pensions of the judges of the Judiciary of Maryland and 18 
making written recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or after 19 
September 1, 2011, September 1, 2013, and every 4 years thereafter; and 20 
 
 WHEREAS, Section 1–708(d) of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings Article of the 21 
Annotated Code of Maryland provides as follows: the General Assembly may amend this 22 
Joint Resolution to decrease any of the Commission’s salary recommendations, but no 23 
reduction may diminish the salary of a judge during the judge’s continuance in office. The 24 
General Assembly may not amend this Joint Resolution to increase these recommended 25 
salaries. Should the General Assembly not adopt or amend this Joint Resolution within 50 26 
days after its introduction, the salaries recommended herein shall apply during fiscal years 27 
2023 through 2026. Should the General Assembly reject any or all of the salaries herein 28 
recommended, the salaries of the judges so affected shall remain unchanged during fiscal 29 
years 2023 through 2026 unless modified under other provisions of the law; and 30  2 	HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 3 
 
 
 
 WHEREAS, The Judicial Compensation Commission held two meetings in 2021 and 1 
considered many aspects and facets of judicial compensation. The Commission, by a vote of 2 
five or more of its members as required by § 1–708(b)(7) of the Courts and Judicial 3 
Proceedings Article, has recommended an increase in judicial salaries for fiscal years 2023 4 
through 2026; now, therefore, be it 5 
 
 RESOLVED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That after 6 
considering the recommendations of the Judicial Compensation Commission, beginning 7 
July 1, 2022, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 8 
 
 9 
 
 10 
 11 
 12 
 13 
 14 
 15 
 16 
 17 
 18 
 19 
 20 
 21 
 
and be it further 22 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2023, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 23 
 
 24 
 
 25 
 26 
 27 
 28 
 29 
 30 
 31 
 32 
 33 
 34 
 35 
 36 
 
and be it further 37 
 
Position Current Salary Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals   
Chief Judge 	215,433 225,433 
Associate Judge 196,433 206,433 
Court of Special   
Appeals   
Chief Judge 	186,633 196,633 
Associate Judge 183,633 193,633 
Circuit Courts   
Judge 	174,433 184,433 
District Court   
Chief Judge 	183,633 193,633 
Associate Judge 161,333 171,333; 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	235,433 
Associate Judge 216,433 
Court of Special  
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	206,633 
Associate Judge 203,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	194,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	203,633 
Associate Judge 181,333;   	HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 3 	3 
 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2024, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 1 
 
 2 
 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
 8 
 9 
 10 
 11 
 12 
 13 
 14 
 
and be it further 15 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2025, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 16 
 
 17 
 
 18 
 19 
 20 
 21 
 22 
 23 
 24 
 25 
 26 
 27 
 28 
 29 
 
and be it further 30 
 
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be forwarded by the Department of 31 
Legislative Services to the Honorable Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr., Governor of Maryland; the 32 
Honorable William C. Ferguson, IV, President of the Senate of Maryland; and the 33 
Honorable Adrienne A. Jones, Speaker of the House of Delegates. 34 
 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	245,433 
Associate Judge 226,433 
Court of Special  
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	216,633 
Associate Judge 213,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	204,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	213,633 
Associate Judge 191,333; 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	255,433 
Associate Judge 236,433 
Court of Special  
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	226,633 
Associate Judge 223,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	214,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	223,633 
Associate Judge 201,333;