Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB122 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/03/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0122*  
  
SENATE BILL 122 
Q3   	2lr0446 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Jackson 
Requested: September 8, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and 2 
Emergency Medical Services 3 
 
FOR the purpose of increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the 4 
Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency 5 
medical services members beginning in a certain taxable year; and generally relating 6 
to a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for qualifying volunteer 7 
fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 
 Article – Tax – General 10 
Section 10–208(a) and (i–1)(1) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Tax – General 15 
Section 10–208(i–1)(3) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
 
Article – Tax – General 21 
 
10–208. 22 
 
 (a) In addition to the modification under § 10–207 of this, the amounts under this 23 
section are subtracted from the federal adjusted gross income of a resident to determine 24  2 	SENATE BILL 122  
 
 
Maryland adjusted gross income. 1 
 
 (i–1) (1) The subtraction under subsection (a) of this section includes an amount 2 
equal to the amount specified in paragraph (3) of this subsection if an individual is a 3 
qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services member for the taxable 4 
year, as determined under paragraph (2) of this subsection. 5 
 
 (3) The amount of the subtraction under paragraph (1) of this subsection is 6 
equal to: 7 
 
 (i) $4,750 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2017, but 8 
before January 1, 2019; 9 
 
 (ii) $5,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2018, but 10 
before January 1, 2020; 11 
 
 (iii) $6,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2019, but 12 
before January 1, 2021; 13 
 
 (iv) $6,500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2020, but 14 
before January 1, 2022; [and] 15 
 
 (v) $7,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, 16 
BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023; AND 17 
 
 (VI) $10,000 FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B	EGINNING AFTER 18 
DECEMBER 31, 2022. 19 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 20 
1, 2022. 21