EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0122* SENATE BILL 122 Q3 2lr0446 (PRE–FILED) CF HB 1472 By: Senator Jackson Senators Jackson, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker Requested: September 8, 2021 Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation Committee Report: Favorable with amendments Senate action: Adopted Read second time: March 16, 2022 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and 2 Emergency Medical Services 3 FOR the purpose of increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the 4 Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency 5 medical services members beginning in a certain taxable year; and generally relating 6 to a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for qualifying volunteer 7 fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members. 8 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 Article – Tax – General 10 Section 10–208(a) and (i–1)(1) 11 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 Article – Tax – General 15 Section 10–208(i–1)(3) 16 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 2 SENATE BILL 122 Article – Tax – General 1 10–208. 2 (a) In addition to the modification under § 10–207 of this, the amounts under this 3 section are subtracted from the federal adjusted gross income of a resident to determine 4 Maryland adjusted gross income. 5 (i–1) (1) The subtraction under subsection (a) of this section includes an amount 6 equal to the amount specified in paragraph (3) of this subsection if an individual is a 7 qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services member for the taxable 8 year, as determined under paragraph (2) of this subsection. 9 (3) The amount of the subtraction under paragraph (1) of this subsection is 10 equal to: 11 (i) $4,750 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2017, but 12 before January 1, 2019; 13 (ii) $5,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2018, but 14 before January 1, 2020; 15 (iii) $6,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2019, but 16 before January 1, 2021; 17 (iv) $6,500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2020, but 18 before January 1, 2022; [and] 19 (v) $7,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, 20 BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023; AND 21 (VI) $10,000 FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B EGINNING AFTER 22 DECEMBER 31, 2022. 23 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 24 1, 2022. 25