Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB144 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/23/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0144*  
  
SENATE BILL 144 
J1   	2lr0533 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Feldman 
Requested: September 22, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 17, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Health – Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin – Repeal 2 
 
FOR the purpose of repealing certain provisions of law relating to the prescription, 3 
administration, and regulation of amygdalin; and generally relating to amygdalin. 4 
 
BY repealing 5 
 Article – Health – General 6 
Section 18–302 7 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 
 
Article – Health – General 12 
 
[18–302. 13 
 
 (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, a physician may prescribe 14 
or administer amygdalin to treat cancer. 15 
 
 (b) (1) A hospital or health facility may not restrict or prohibit the use of 16 
amygdalin that a physician, with the consent of a patient, prescribes for or administers to 17 
the patient. 18  2 	SENATE BILL 144  
 
 
 
 (2) (i) The Department may restrict or prohibit the use of amygdalin in 1 
the treatment of a patient if, after a hearing, the Department finds that the manner in 2 
which the amygdalin is prescribed or administered is harmful to the patient. 3 
 
 (ii) The Department shall adopt rules and regulations for hearings 4 
under this paragraph. 5 
 
 (c) The Department and the State Board of Pharmacy shall regulate the 6 
manufacture, distribution, and sale of amygdalin for use in this State, but only to ensure 7 
that the amygdalin is not adulterated, contaminated by microorganisms, or misbranded.] 8 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 9 
October 1, 2022. 10 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.