Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB215 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/02/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0215*  
  
SENATE BILL 215 
Q3, M3   	2lr0101 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request – Departmental – 
Maryland Energy Administration) 
Requested: October 5, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 2, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension 2 
 
FOR the purpose of increasing the total amount of tax credit certificates that the Maryland 3 
Energy Administration may issue in a taxable year for the costs of installing an 4 
energy storage system; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a taxpayer to claim 5 
a refund of the credit; altering the date by which an energy storage system is 6 
required to be installed for purposes of eligibility for the credit; and generally 7 
relating to the energy storage tax credit. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments,  9 
 Article – Tax – General 10 
 Section 10–719(a) and (b) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Tax – General 15 
 Section 10–719(d), (f), and (g) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20  2 	SENATE BILL 215  
 
 
 
Article – Tax – General 1 
 
10–719. 2 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 3 
 
 (2) “Administration” means the Maryland Energy Administration. 4 
 
 (3) “Energy storage system” means a system used to store electrical energy, 5 
or mechanical, chemical, or thermal energy that was once electrical energy, for use as 6 
electrical energy at a later date or in a process that offsets electricity use at peak times. 7 
 
 (4) “Taxpayer” means: 8 
 
 (i) the owner of a residential property who purchases and installs 9 
an energy storage system on the residential property; 10 
 
 (ii) the owner of a commercial property who purchases and installs 11 
an energy storage system on the commercial property; or 12 
 
 (iii) an individual or a corporation that owns or pays for the 13 
installation of an energy storage system that supplies electrical energy intended for use on 14 
the residential or commercial property on which the energy storage system is installed. 15 
 
 (b) Subject to the limitations of this section, a taxpayer that receives a tax credit 16 
certificate may claim a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of an 17 
energy storage system installed on residential or commercial property during the taxable 18 
year. 19 
 
 (d) The Administration may not issue an aggregate amount of tax cred it 20 
certificates exceeding [$750,000] $1,000,000 for a taxable year. 21 
 
 (f) (1) (I) [The] EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 22 
SUBSECTION AND SUBJE CT TO SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS PARAGRAPH , THE total 23 
amount of the credit allowed under this section for any taxable year may not exceed the 24 
State income tax for that taxable year, calculated before the application of the credits under 25 
this section and §§ 10–701 and 10–701.1 of this subtitle, but after the application of other 26 
credits allowable under this subtitle. 27 
 
 [(2)] (II) The unused amount of credit for any taxable year may not be 28 
carried over to any other taxable year. 29 
 
 (2) (I) THIS PARAGRAPH APPLIE S ONLY TO A TAXPAYER WHO IS AN 30 
INDIVIDUAL WHO OWNS AND PAYS FOR THE INSTALL ATION OF AN ENERGY S TORAGE 31   	SENATE BILL 215 	3 
 
 
SYSTEM THAT SUPPLIES ELECTRICAL ENERGY IN TENDED FOR USE ON TH E PRIMARY 1 
RESIDENCE OF THE TAX PAYER. 2 
 
 (II) FOR ANY TAXABLE YEAR BEGINNING AFTER DECEMBER 31, 3 
2022, IF THE TAX CREDIT ALL OWED UNDER THIS SECT ION EXCEEDS THE TOTAL TA X 4 
OTHERWISE PAYABLE BY THE TAXPAYER FOR THA T TAXABLE YEAR , THE TAXPAYER 5 
MAY CLAIM A REFUND I N THE AMOUNT OF THE EXCESS.  6 
 
 (g) The credit under this section may not be claimed for an energy storage system 7 
installed before January 1, 2018, or after December 31, [2022] 2024. 8 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 9 
1, 2022, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021. 10 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.