EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0264* SENATE BILL 264 Q1, Q7 2lr1398 CF HB 76 By: Senators Elfreth, McCray, Hershey, Kramer, Augustine, and Feldman Introduced and read first time: January 14, 2022 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation Committee Report: Favorable with amendments Senate action: Adopted Read second time: February 28, 2022 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Community Solar Energy Generating Systems – Exemption From Energy and 2 Property Taxes 3 FOR the purpose of exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from 4 local energy taxes and personal property taxes; prohibiting the supervisor of a county 5 or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after a 6 certain date; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to report 7 annually certain information to certain committees of the General Assembly; and 8 generally relating to tax exemptions an exemption from the personal property tax 9 for community solar energy generating systems. 10 BY adding to 11 Article – Local Government 12 Section 20–203 to be under the amended subtitle “Subtitle 2. Limitations on 13 Authority to Tax” 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2013 Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 17 Article – Tax – Property 18 Section 7–237 19 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 21 2 SENATE BILL 264 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 Article – Local Government 3 Subtitle 2. Limitations on Authority to Tax [Advertising]. 4 20–203. 5 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 6 INDICATED. 7 (2) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 8 (I) A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE IDENTIFIED 9 BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR POLLUTED ; 10 (II) A CLOSED MUNICIPAL O R RUBBLE LANDFILL RE GULATED 11 UNDER A REFUSE DISPO SAL PERMIT BY THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF THE 12 ENVIRONMENT ; OR 13 (III) MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01. 14 (3) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS THE 15 MEANING STATED IN § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 16 (4) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 1–101 OF 17 THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 18 (B) NOTWITHSTANDING ANY OTHER LAW , A TAX IMPOSED BY A P OLITICAL 19 SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE ON THE SALE , USE, DELIVERY, DISTRIBUTION, 20 PRODUCTION , OR CONSUMPTION OF EN ERGY DOES NOT APPLY TO ENERGY 21 PRODUCED BY A COMMUN ITY SOLAR ENERGY GEN ERATING SYSTEM THAT : 22 (1) PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT PRO DUCES TO 23 LOW– OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN REGULA TIONS OF THE 24 PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 20% LESS THAN THE 25 AMOUNT CHARGED BY TH E ELECTRIC COMPANY T HAT SERVES THE AREA WHERE 26 THE COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERGY GENERATING SY STEM IS LOCATED ; AND 27 (2) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, OR 28 BROWNFIELD . 29 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 30 as follows: 31 SENATE BILL 264 3 Article – Tax – Property 1 7–237. 2 (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, personal property is 3 exempt from property tax if the property is machinery or equipment used to generate: 4 (1) electricity or steam for sale; or 5 (2) hot or chilled water for sale that is used to heat or cool a building. 6 (b) Subject to § 7–514 of this title, AND EXCEPT AS PROVID ED IN SUBSECTION 7 (C) OF THIS SECTION , personal property that is machinery or equipment described in 8 subsection (a) of this section is subject to county or municipal corporation property tax on: 9 (1) 75% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2000; and 10 (2) 50% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2001 and each 11 subsequent taxable year. 12 (C) (1) (I) IN THIS SUBSECTION TH E FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE 13 MEANINGS INDICATED . 14 (II) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 15 1. A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE 16 IDENTIFIED BY FEDERA L OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR 17 POLLUTED; OR 18 2. A CLOSED MUNICIPAL O R RUBBLE LANDFILL 19 REGULATED UNDER A REFUSE DISPOSAL PERM IT BY THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT 20 OF THE ENVIRONMENT ; OR. 21 3. MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01. 22 (III) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS 23 THE MEANING STATED I N § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 24 (IV) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 25 1–101 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 26 (2) PERSONAL PROPERTY IS EXEMPT FROM COUNTY O R MUNICIPAL 27 CORPORATION PROPERTY TAX IF THE PROPERTY IS MACHINERY OR EQUI PMENT 28 THAT: 29 4 SENATE BILL 264 (I) AS DEFINED IN REGULA TION OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE 1 COMMISSION, IS PART OF A COMMUNI TY SOLAR ENERGY GENE RATING SYSTEM 2 THAT: 3 1. HAS A GENERATING CAP ACITY THAT DOES NOT 4 EXCEED 2 MEGAWATTS AS MEASURE D BY THE ALTERNATING CURRENT RATING OF 5 THE SYSTEM’S INVERTER; AND 6 2. PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT 7 PRODUCES TO LOW – OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN 8 REGULATIONS OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 9 20% LESS THAN THE AMOUNT CHARGED BY THE ELECT RIC COMPANY THAT SER VES 10 THE AREA WHERE THE C OMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM IS 11 LOCATED; AND 12 (II) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, 13 OR BROWNFIELD . 14 (3) PERSONAL PROPERTY THA T RECEIVES AN EXEMPT ION UNDER 15 THIS SUBSECTION IS E XEMPT FROM COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N 16 PROPERTY TAX FOR EAC H TAXABLE YEAR IN WH ICH THE PROPERTY CON TINUES TO 17 MEET THE REQUIREMENT S FOR THE EXEMPTION UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 18 SUBSECTION. 19 (4) THE SUPERVISOR OF A C OUNTY OR A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION 20 MAY NOT ACCEPT AN AP PLICATION FROM A PRO PERTY OWNER FOR THE EXEMPTION 21 UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N AFTER DECEMBER 31, 2024. 22 (5) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL 23 REPORT TO THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE AND THE HOUSE 24 WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE 25 GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, ON THE NUMBER AND LO CATION OF PROJECTS T HAT, IN 26 THE IMMEDIATELY PREC EDING TAXABLE YEAR , HAVE RECEIVED THE EX EMPTION 27 UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N. 28 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall be 29 applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022. 30 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 31 effect July 1, 2022. 32 SECTION 5. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , except as provided in 33 Section 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2022, and shall be applicable to all 34 taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022. 35