Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB32 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/08/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0032*  
  
SENATE BILL 32 
E4, L2, M4   	2lr0695 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 12 
By: Senator Carozza 
Requested: October 7, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 8, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism 2 
 
FOR the purpose of adding Worcester County to the list of counties where an existing 3 
agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy 4 
that requires a building permit under certain circumstances; and generally relating 5 
to buildings used for agritourism in Worcester County. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Public Safety 8 
Section 12–508 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 
 
Article – Public Safety 14 
 
12–508. 15 
 
 (a) (1) In this section, “agricultural building” means a structure designed and 16 
constructed to house farm implements, hay, grain, poultry, livestock, or other horticultural 17 
products. 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 32  
 
 
 (2) “Agricultural building” does not include a place of human residence. 1 
 
 (b) This section applies only to: 2 
 
 (1) Allegany County, Anne Arundel County, Baltimore County, Calvert 3 
County, Carroll County, Cecil County, Charles County, Dorchester County, Frederick 4 
County, Garrett County, Harford County, Howard County, Kent County, Montgomery 5 
County, Prince George’s County, St. Mary’s County, Somerset County, and Talbot County; 6 
or 7 
 
 (2) a county where the local legislative body has approved the application 8 
of this section to the county. 9 
 
 (c) The Standards do not apply to the construction, alteration, or modification of 10 
an agricultural building for which agritourism is an intended subordinate use. 11 
 
 (d) Except as provided in subsection (e) and (f) of this section, an existing 12 
agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that 13 
requires a building permit if the subordinate use of agritourism: 14 
 
 (1) is in accordance with limitations set forth in regulations adopted by the 15 
Department; 16 
 
 (2) occupies only levels of the building on which a ground level exit is 17 
located; and 18 
 
 (3) does not require more than 50 people to occupy an individual building 19 
at any one time. 20 
 
 (e) In Allegany County, Anne Arundel County, Baltimore County, Calvert 21 
County, Carroll County, Cecil County, Garrett County, Howard County, Kent County, 22 
Prince George’s County, [and] St. Mary’s County, AND WORCESTER COUNTY, an existing 23 
agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that 24 
requires a building permit if: 25 
 
 (1) the subordinate use of agritourism does not require more than 200 26 
people to occupy an individual building at any one time; and 27 
 
 (2) the total width of means of egress meets or exceeds the International 28 
Building Code standard that applies to egress components other than stairways in a 29 
building without a sprinkler system. 30 
 
 (f) (1) In Montgomery County, an existing agricultural building used for 31 
agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that requires a building permit as 32 
provided in this subsection. 33 
   	SENATE BILL 32 	3 
 
 
 (2) Except as provided in paragraph (3) of this subsection, if the 1 
subordinate use of agritourism does not require more than 50 people to occupy an individual 2 
building at any one time, then that use must be: 3 
 
 (i) in accordance with limitations established by the Department; 4 
and 5 
 
 (ii) limited to levels of the building on which a ground level exit is 6 
located. 7 
 
 (3) If the subordinate use of agritourism requires more than 50 people but 8 
fewer than 100 people to occupy an individual building at any one time, then that use must 9 
be: 10 
 
 (i) in accordance with the requirements in paragraph (2) of this 11 
subsection; and 12 
 
 (ii) the total width and number of means of egress must meet or 13 
exceed the International Building Code standard that applies to egress components other 14 
than stairways in a building without a sprinkler system. 15 
 
 (g) An agricultural building used for agritourism: 16 
 
 (1) shall be structurally sound and in good repair; but 17 
 
 (2) need not comply with: 18 
 
 (i) requirements for bathrooms, sprinkler systems, and elevators set 19 
forth in the Standards; or 20 
 
 (ii) any other requirements of the Standards or other building codes 21 
as set forth in regulations adopted by the Department. 22 
 
 (h) The Department shall adopt regulations to implement this section. 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 24 
October June 1, 2022.  25