Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB492 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/27/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0492*  
  
SENATE BILL 492 
M3   	2lr1566 
    	CF 2lr1564 
By: Senators Pinsky, Guzzone, Elfreth, Lam, Patterson, Rosapepe, and 
Washington 
Introduced and read first time: January 27, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Environment – Discharge Permits – Inspections and Administrative 2 
Continuations 3 
 
FOR the purpose of limiting the period of time for which the Department of the 4 
Environment may administratively continue certain water pollution discharge 5 
permits; establishing inspection and reporting requirements for certain permit 6 
holders; establishing administrative penalties for certain permit holders determined 7 
to be in significant noncompliance of certain State or federal water quality 8 
standards, effluent limitations, or other requirements; requiring the Department to 9 
clear a certain backlog of administratively continued permits on or before a certain 10 
date; and generally relating to water pollution discharge permits.  11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 
 Article – Environment 13 
Section 9–328 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2014 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Environment 18 
Section 9–328.1 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2014 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 21 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 22 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 23 
 
Article – Environment 24 
 
9–328. 25  2 	SENATE BILL 492  
 
 
 
 (a) (1) Unless it is renewed for another term, a discharge permit expires on 1 
the expiration date the Department sets at issuance or renewal. 2 
 
 (2) The Department may not issue a discharge permit for a term longer 3 
than 5 years. 4 
 
 (b) Before a discharge permit expires, the Department may renew the discharge 5 
permit for another term: 6 
 
 (1) After administrative review in accordance with the rules and 7 
regulations that the Department adopts; 8 
 
 (2) After notice and opportunity for public hearing on the subject; 9 
 
 (3) On the condition that the discharge meets or will meet: 10 
 
 (i) Any applicable State or federal water quality standards or 11 
effluent limitations; and 12 
 
 (ii) Any applicable requirement of this subtitle; and 13 
 
 (4) If the permit holder pays all application and permit fees assessed by the 14 
Department under this subtitle. 15 
 
 (c) (1) ON OR AFTER JULY 1, 2022, THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT 16 
ADMINISTRATIVELY CON TINUE A DISCHARGE PE RMIT FOR A PERIOD LO NGER THAN 17 
3 YEARS.  18 
 
 (2) ON OR AFTER JANUARY 1, 2027, THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT 19 
ADMINISTRATIVELY CON TINUE A DISCHARGE PE RMIT FOR A PERIOD LO NGER THAN 20 
1 YEAR.  21 
 
 (D) Administrative review proceedings under this section shall be completed at 22 
least 60 days before the expiration date of the permit. 23 
 
9–328.1.  24 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “ADMINISTRATIVELY CON TINUED PERMIT ” MEANS A 25 
DISCHARGE PERMIT THA T HAS BEEN ADMINISTR ATIVELY CONTINUED UN DER 26 
DEPARTMENT REGULATION S IN ACCORDANCE WITH 40 C.F.R. § 122.6(D).  27 
 
 (B) TO ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH THE TERMS OF A DI SCHARGE PERMIT , 28 
AT LEAST ONCE PER MO NTH THE DEPARTMENT SHALL INSP ECT THE OPERATIONS 29 
OF: 30   	SENATE BILL 492 	3 
 
 
 
 (1) EACH PERMIT HOLDER OP	ERATING UNDER AN 1 
ADMINISTRATIVELY CON TINUED PERMIT ; AND  2 
 
 (2) EACH PERMIT HOLDER TH	AT THE DEPARTMENT HAS 3 
DETERMINED TO BE IN SIGNIFICANT NO NCOMPLIANCE OF AN AP PLICABLE STATE 4 
OR FEDERAL WATER QUA LITY STANDARD , EFFLUENT LIMITATION , OR OTHER 5 
APPLICABLE REQUIREME NT OF THE DEPARTMENT OR THE U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL 6 
PROTECTION AGENCY.  7 
 
 (C) (1) THIS SUBSECTION APPLI ES TO A PERMIT HO LDER THAT: 8 
 
 (I) IS DETERMINED BY THE DEPARTMENT TO BE IN 9 
SIGNIFICANT NONCOMPL IANCE OF AN APPLICAB LE STATE OR FEDERAL WATE R 10 
QUALITY STANDARD , EFFLUENT LIMITATION , OR OTHER APPLICABLE 11 
REQUIREMENT OF THE DEPARTMENT OR THE U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION 12 
AGENCY TWO OR MORE TI MES IN A YEAR; 13 
 
 (II) REPORTS EXCEEDING EFF LUENT LIMITATIONS FO R TWO OR 14 
MORE PARAMETERS REQU IRED TO BE MONITORED UNDER THE DISCHARGE PERMIT; 15 
OR 16 
 
 (III) REPORTS EXCEEDING , BY 200% OR MORE, EFFLUENT 17 
LIMITATIONS FOR ANY SINGLE PARAMET ER REQUIRED TO BE MO NITORED UNDER 18 
THE DISCHARGE PERMIT .  19 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REQU IRE A PERMIT HOLDER 20 
SPECIFIED UNDER PARA GRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION T O SUBMIT A WRITTEN 21 
REPORT TO THE DEPARTMENT DETAILING : 22 
 
 (I) HOW VIOLATIONS REPORT ED BY THE PERMIT HOLDER OR 23 
NOTED BY THE DEPARTMENT WILL BE AD DRESSED; AND 24 
 
 (II) THE TIMELINE FOR ADDR ESSING THE VIOLATION S.  25 
 
 (D) (1) IF A PERMIT HOLDER RE MAINS IN SIGNIFICANT NONCOMPLIANCE 26 
FOR THE SAME UNDERLY ING CONDITION AFTER 2 CONSECUTIVE MONTHS O F 27 
INSPECTIONS CONDUCTED UNDER SUBSECTION (B)(2) OF THIS SECTION , THE 28 
PERMIT HOLDER SHALL BE SUBJECT TO AN ADM INISTRATIVE PENALTY OF: 29 
 
 (I) FOR A PERMIT HOLDER C LASSIFIED BY THE DEPARTMENT 30 
AS A MINOR FACILITY : 31 
  4 	SENATE BILL 492  
 
 
 1. $250 WHEN THE CONDITION I S OBSERVED ON THE 1 
THIRD CONSECUTIVE INSPEC TION; 2 
 
 2. $500 WHEN THE CONDITION I S OBSERVED ON THE 3 
FOURTH CONSECUTIVE I NSPECTION; AND  4 
 
 3. $2,500 WHEN THE CONDITION I S OBSERVED ON THE 5 
FIFTH CONSECUTIVE IN SPECTION OR ANY SUBS EQUENT CONSECUTIVE I NSPECTION; 6 
AND 7 
 
 (II) FOR A PERMIT HOLDER CLASSI FIED BY THE DEPARTMENT 8 
AS A MAJOR FACILITY : 9 
 
 1. $1,000 WHEN THE CONDITION I S OBSERVED ON THE 10 
THIRD CONSECUTIVE IN SPECTION; 11 
 
 2. $5,000 WHEN THE CONDITION I S OBSERVED ON THE 12 
FOURTH CONSECUTIVE I NSPECTION; AND  13 
 
 3. $10,000 WHEN THE CONDITION IS OBS ERVED ON THE 14 
FIFTH CONSECUTIVE IN SPECTION OR ANY SUBS EQUENT CONSECUTIVE I NSPECTION. 15 
 
 (2) THE PENALTIES PROVIDE D UNDER THIS SUBSECT ION ARE IN 16 
ADDITION TO ANY OTHE R CIVIL OR CRIMINAL PENALTIES PROVIDED U NDER THIS 17 
SUBTITLE.  18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 19 
 
 (a) In this section, “Department” means the Department of the Environment. 20 
 
 (b) Subject to subsection (c) of this section, this Act shall be interpreted to apply 21 
only prospectively to discharge permits issued, renewed, or administratively continued on 22 
or after the effective date of this Act.  23 
 
 (c) On or before December 31, 2026, the Department shall clear the backlog of 24 
administratively continued discharge permits existing on the effective date of this Act.  25 
 
 (d) (1) On or before December 31, 2023, the Department shall report to the 26 
Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General 27 
Assembly on the number of additional employees necessary to:  28 
 
 (i) clear the backlog of administratively continued discharge 29 
permits, as required by subsection (c) of this section; and 30 
   	SENATE BILL 492 	5 
 
 
 (ii) process discharge permit renewals in a timely manner, as 1 
required by § 9–328(c) of the Environment Article, as enacted by Section 1 of this Act. 2 
 
 (2) The Department shall request: 3 
 
 (i) on or before December 31, 2024, Position Identification Numbers 4 
(PINs) for at least half of the additional employees identified in the report required under 5 
paragraph (1) of this subsection; and 6 
 
 (ii) on or before December 31, 2025, PINs for the full number of 7 
additional employees identified in the report required under paragraph (1) of this 8 
subsection. 9 
 
 (e) On or before December 31, 2025, the Department shall report to the Governor 10 
and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly 11 
on the progress toward meeting the requirements of this section.  12 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 13 
1, 2022. 14