Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB506 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/13/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
         Italics indicate opposite chamber/conference committee amendments. 
          *sb0506*  
  
SENATE BILL 506 
O4, F5   	(2lr0903) 
ENROLLED BILL 
— Budget and Taxation/Ways and Means — 
Introduced by Senator King 
 
Read and Examined by Proofreaders: 
 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
 
Sealed with the Great Seal and presented to the Governor, for his approval this 
  
_______ day of _______________ at _________________ _______ o’clock, ________M. 
  
______________________________________________ 
President.  
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program – Funding Establishment 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program to provide 3 
specialized child care and early childhood education by educators, early intervention 4 
providers, mental health providers, and health care providers to certain grants to 5 
certain providers that provide specialized child care and early education to children 6 
under a certain age who have delays in development, physical disabilities, or delays 7 
in social, emotional, or behavioral functioning; requiring certain providers who 8 
received certain grants to report certain information to the State Department of 9 
Education on or before certain dates; requiring the Department to compile certain 10 
information and provide reports to certain committees on or before certain dates; and 11 
generally relating to the Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program. 12 
 
BY adding to 13 
 Article – Education 14  2 	SENATE BILL 506  
 
 
Section 8–420 1 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 2 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 3 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 4 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 5 
 
Article – Education 6 
 
8–420. 7 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 8 
INDICATED.  9 
 
 (2) “DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS 10 
IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING” MEANS: 11 
 
 (I) A SIGNIFICANT DEVELOPM ENTAL DELAY OR ATYPI CAL 12 
DEVELOPMENT , AS IDENTIFIED BY A H EALTH PROFESSIONAL , IN: 13 
 
 1. COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT ; 14 
 
 2. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT ; 15 
 
 3. LANGUAGE AND SPEECH D EVELOPMENT ; 16 
 
 4. PSYCHOSOCIAL DEVELOPM ENT; OR 17 
 
 5. SELF–HELP SKILLS; 18 
 
 (II) PSYCHOLOGICAL TRAUMA , AS IDENTIFIED THROUG H AN 19 
EVALUATION BY A MENT AL HEALTH PROFESSION AL; OR 20 
 
 (III) A DIAGNOSED PHYSICAL , DEVELOPMENTAL , OR MENTAL 21 
HEALTH CONDITION THA T IMPACTS DAILY LIVI NG AND LIMITS PARTIC IPATION IN 22 
TYPICAL EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUC ATION OR CHILD CARE SETTINGS. 23 
 
 (3) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM. 24 
 
 (B) THERE IS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM IN THE STATE. 25 
 
 (C) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE SPECIALIZED CHILD 26 
CARE AND EARLY CHIL DHOOD EDUCATION BY E DUCATORS, EARLY INTERVENTION 27 
PROVIDERS, MENTAL HEALTH PROVID ERS, AND HEALTH CARE PROV IDERS TO 28 
CHILDREN UNDER THE A GE OF 6 YEARS WHO HAVE : 29   	SENATE BILL 506 	3 
 
 
 
 (1) DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS ; 1 
 
 (2) PHYSICAL DISABILITIES ; OR 2 
 
 (3) DELAYS IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING. 3 
 
 (D) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , FOR FISCAL 4 
YEAR 2024, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN 5 
APPROPRIATION TO THE PROGRAM IN AN AMOUNT NOT LESS THAN THE PE R PUPIL 6 
FUNDING AMOUNT OF $45,000 FOR EACH CHILD SERVE D WHO HAS DEVELOPMEN TAL 7 
DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR 8 
BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONI NG. 9 
 
 (2) (I) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM 10 
THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN ON OR BEFORE MARCH 5, 2020, THE 11 
PER PUPIL FUNDING AM OUNT SHALL BE CALCUL ATED USING THE HIGHE R OF: 12 
 
 1. THE JANUARY 1, 2019, ENROLLMENT ; OR 13 
 
 2. THE JANUARY 1, 2023, ENROLLMENT . 14 
 
 (II) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM 15 
THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN AFTER MARCH 5, 2020, THE PER PUPIL 16 
FUNDING AMOUNT SHALL BE CALCULATED USING THE JANUARY 1, 2023, 17 
ENROLLMENT .  18 
 
 (3) BEGINNING IN FISCAL Y EAR 2025 AND EACH FISCAL YEAR 19 
THEREAFTER , THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCREA SE THE PER PUPIL FUN DING AMOUNT 20 
UNDER PARA GRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION B Y THE LESSER OF: 21 
 
 (I) THE CONSUMER PRICE INDEX FOR ALL URBAN 22 
CONSUMERS FOR THE WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA, OR ANY SUCCESSOR 23 
INDEX; OR 24 
 
 (II) 1.5%. 25 
 
 (4) THE PROGRAM MAY BE FUNDED FROM: 26 
 
 (I) THE GENERAL FUND OF THE STATE; AND 27 
 
 (II) ANY OTHER SOURCES . 28 
  4 	SENATE BILL 506  
 
 
 (2) “DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS 1 
IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING” MEANS: 2 
 
 (I) A SIGNIFICANT DEVELOPM ENTAL DELAY OR ATYPI CAL 3 
DEVELOPMENT , AS IDENTIFIED BY A H EALTH PROFESSIONAL , IN: 4 
 
 1. COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT ; 5 
 
 2. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT ; 6 
 
 3. LANGUAGE AND SPEECH D EVELOPMENT ; 7 
 
 4. PSYCHOSOCIAL DEVELOPM ENT; OR 8 
 
 5. SELF–HELP SKILLS; 9 
 
 (II) PSYCHOLOGICAL TRAUMA , AS IDENTIFIED THROUG H AN 10 
EVALUATION BY A M ENTAL HEALTH PROFESS IONAL; OR 11 
 
 (III) A DIAGNOSED PHYSICAL , DEVELOPMENTAL , OR MENTAL 12 
HEALTH CONDITION THA T IMPACTS DAILY LIVI NG AND LIMITS PARTIC IPATION IN 13 
TYPICAL EARLY CHILDH OOD EDUCATION OR CHI LD CARE SETTINGS . 14 
 
 (3) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE GRANT 15 
PROGRAM. 16 
 
 (B) THERE IS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE GRANT PROGRAM IN THE 17 
STATE.  18 
 
 (C) (1) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO 19 
PROVIDERS THAT SPECI ALIZE IN PROVIDING C HILD CARE AND EARLY CHILDHOOD 20 
EDUCATION TO CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 6 YEARS WHO HAVE DEVEL OPMENTAL 21 
DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR 22 
BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONI NG. 23 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ADMI NISTER THE PROGRAM. 24 
 
 (3) BY AUGUST 15 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL AWARD 25 
GRANTS UNDER THIS SE CTION. 26 
 
 (D) (1) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YE ARS 2023 THROUGH 2025, THE 27 
GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN APPROPRIA TION OF 28 
$3,700,000 TO THE PROGRAM.  29 
   	SENATE BILL 506 	5 
 
 
 (2) IN AWARDING GRANTS UN DER THE PROGRAM, THE DEPARTMENT 1 
SHALL DISTRIBUTE: 2 
 
 (I) $1,283,000 TO EXISTING PROVIDER S IN THE SAME AMOUNT 3 
AS WAS PROVIDED IN F ISCAL YEAR 2022; 4 
 
 (II) $1,917,000 TO EXISTING PROVIDER S IN THE SAME 5 
PROPORTION AS WAS PR OVIDED IN FISCAL YEA R 2022 TO PROVIDE ADDITIONA L 6 
SERVICES; AND  7 
 
 (III) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (3) OF THIS 8 
SUBSECTION, $500,000 TO NEW PROVIDERS OR EXISTING PROVIDERS T O ENROLL 9 
ADDITIONAL CHILDREN . 10 
 
 (3) IF FUNDS ARE REMAININ G AFTER THE DISTRIBU TION REQUIRED 11 
UNDER PARAGRAPH (2)(III) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THEN THE REMA INDER SHALL BE 12 
DISTRIBUTED AS PROVI DED UNDER PARAGRAPH (2)(II) OF THIS SUBSECTION . 13 
 
 (E) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2022, AND DECEMBER 1, 2023, THE 14 
PROVIDERS WHO RECEIV ED A GRANT UNDER THI S SECTION SHALL REPO RT TO THE 15 
DEPARTMENT THE COST O	F PROVIDING SER VICES TO A CHILD WIT H 16 
DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , 17 
EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING AND THE SOURCE S OF FUNDING 18 
RECEIVED BY THE PROV IDER. 19 
 
 (2) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 30, 2022, AND DECEMBER 30, 2023, 20 
THE DEPARTMENT S HALL COMPILE THE INF ORMATION PROVIDED UN DER 21 
PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND SHALL REPORT THE COMPILED 22 
INFORMATION TO THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE AND THE 23 
HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE 24 
STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE.  25 
 
 (F) THE DEPARTMENT MAY ADOPT REGULATIONS NECESSAR Y TO CARRY 26 
OUT THIS SECTION .  27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 28 
1, 2022. 29