Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB61 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/02/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0061*  
  
SENATE BILL 61 
R2   	2lr1256 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 10 
By: Senator Zucker 
Requested: November 1, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 22, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses  2 
(Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions) 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide certain 4 
safety and workforce development training for its operations training workforce and 5 
its maintenance workforce; requiring the Administration’s annual report on the 6 
implementation of the conversion of the State’s transit bus fleet to zero–emission 7 
buses to include a plan that ensures certain employee protections and a certification 8 
that the Administration is adhering to the plan; and generally relating to converting 9 
the State’s transit bus fleet to zero–emission buses.  10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 
 Article – Transportation 12 
Section 7–406 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
 
Article – Transportation 18 
 
7–406. 19 
  2 	SENATE BILL 61  
 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 1 
 
 (2) “Alternative–fuel bus” means a motor vehicle that:  2 
 
 (i) Is designed to carry more than 10 passengers and is used to carry 3 
passengers for compensation; 4 
 
 (ii) Is not powered by diesel or gasoline; 5 
 
 (iii) Provides greenhouse gas emissions reductions in comparison to 6 
an equivalent diesel–powered vehicle; and 7 
 
 (iv) Is not a taxicab. 8 
 
 (3) “Bus” has the meaning stated in § 11–105 of this article. 9 
 
 (4) “Zero–emission bus” means a motor vehicle that is: 10 
 
 (i) Designed to carry more than 10 passengers and is used to carry 11 
passengers for compensation; 12 
 
 (ii) A zero–emission vehicle; and 13 
 
 (iii) Not a taxicab. 14 
 
 (5) “Zero–emission vehicle” means: 15 
 
 (i) A fuel cell electric vehicle that: 16 
 
 1. Is a motor vehicle; 17 
 
 2. Is made by a manufacturer; 18 
 
 3. Is manufactured primarily for use on public streets, roads, 19 
and highways; 20 
 
 4. Has a maximum speed capability of at least 55 miles per 21 
hour; 22 
 
 5. Is powered entirely by electricity, produced by combining 23 
hydrogen and oxygen, that runs the motor; 24 
 
 6. Has an operating range of at least 100 miles; and 25 
 
 7. Produces only water vapor and heat as by–products; or 26 
 
 (ii) A plug–in electric drive vehicle that: 27   	SENATE BILL 61 	3 
 
 
 
 1. Is a motor vehicle; 1 
 
 2. Is made by a manufacturer; 2 
 
 3. Has a maximum speed capability of at least 55 miles per 3 
hour; and 4 
 
 4. Is propelled by an electric motor that draws electricity 5 
from a battery that: 6 
 
 A. Has a capacity of not less than 4 kilowatt–hours; and 7 
 
 B. Is capable of being recharged from an external source of 8 
electricity. 9 
 
 (b) (1) This section applies to the Administration’s State transit bus fleet. 10 
 
 (2) This section does not apply to a bus that is part of a locally operated 11 
transit system. 12 
 
 (c) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2) of this subsection, beginning in 13 
fiscal year 2023, the Administration may not enter into a contract to purchase buses for the 14 
Administration’s State transit bus fleet that are not zero–emission buses. 15 
 
 (2) If the Administration determines that no available zero–emission bus 16 
meets the performance requirements for a particular use, the Administration may purchase 17 
an alternative–fuel bus for that use. 18 
 
 (3) The full cost of zero–emission and alternative–fuel buses purchased 19 
under this subsection shall be paid from the Transportation Trust Fund. 20 
 
 (d) (1) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL PROVIDE SAFETY AND W ORKFORCE 21 
DEVELOPMENT TRAINING FOR ITS: 22 
 
 (I) OPERATIONS TRAINING W ORKFORCE; AND  23 
 
 (II) MAINTENANCE WORKFORCE IN A MANNER THAT ENA BLES 24 
THE MAINTENANCE WORKFORCE TO SAFELY REPAIR AND MAINTAIN : 25 
 
 1. THE ADMINISTRATION ’S ZERO–EMISSION BUSES AND 26 
ALL THEIR COMPONENTS ; AND  27 
 
 2. THE CHARGING INFRASTR UCTURE FOR THE 28 
ZERO–EMISSION BUSES . 29 
  4 	SENATE BILL 61  
 
 
 (2) THE TRAINING REQUIRED UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS 1 
SUBSECTION S HALL INCLUDE REGISTE RED APPRENTICESHIPS AND OTHER 2 
LABOR–MANAGEMENT TRAINING PROGRAMS TO ADDRESS THE IMPACT OF THE 3 
TRANSITION TO ZERO –EMISSION BUSES ON TH E ADMINISTRATION ’S WORKFORCE .  4 
 
 (E) The Administration shall ensure the development of charging infrastructure 5 
to support the operation of zero–emission buses in the State transit bus fleet. 6 
 
 [(e)] (F) (1) On or before January 1, 2022, and each January 1 thereafter, the 7 
Administration shall, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, submit 8 
a report to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the Senate Education, Health, and 9 
Environmental Affairs Committee, the House Appropriations Committee, and the House 10 
Environment and Transportation Committee on the implementation of this section. 11 
 
 (2) The annual report shall include: 12 
 
 (i) A schedule for converting the Administration’s State transit bus 13 
fleet to zero–emission buses; 14 
 
 (ii) An evaluation of the charging infrastructure needed for the 15 
Administration to create and maintain a State transit bus fleet of zero–emission buses; 16 
 
 (iii) A plan for [transitioning]: 17 
 
 1. TRANSITIONING any State employees adversely affected 18 
by the conversion from a diesel–powered State transit bus fleet to a zero–emission State 19 
transit bus fleet to similar or other employment within the Administration or Department 20 
that has commensurate seniority, pay, and benefits; 21 
 
 2. ENSURING THAT NO DUTI ES OR FUNCTIONS OF STATE 22 
EMPLOYEES ARE TRANSF ERRED TO A CONTRACTI NG ENTITY AS A RESUL T OF THE 23 
CONVERSION FRO M A DIESEL –POWERED STATE TRANSIT BUS FLE ET TO A  24 
ZERO–EMISSION STATE TRANSIT BUS FLE ET; AND 25 
 
 3. ENSURING THAT ANY ENT ITY OTHER THAN THE 26 
ADMINISTRATION THAT O PERATES OR MAINTAINS ZERO–EMISSION BUSES ON 27 
BEHALF OF THE ADMINISTRATION PROVID ES EMPLOYEE PROT ECTIONS 28 
EQUIVALENT TO THE PR OTECTIONS REQUIRED B Y THE PLAN; 29 
 
 (IV) A CERTIFICATION THAT T HE ADMINISTRATION IS 30 
ADHERING TO THE PLAN REQUIRED UNDER ITEM (III) OF THIS PARAGRAPH ;  31 
 
 [(iv)] (V) In coordination with other appropriate State agencies, an 32 
estimate of the reduction in the amount of carbon dioxide emissions, measured in pounds, 33 
that will be obtained through the use of zero–emission buses each year until the State 34   	SENATE BILL 61 	5 
 
 
transit bus fleet is converted to zero–emission buses; and 1 
 
 [(v)] (VI) A financial analysis: 2 
 
 1. Of the projected cost of purchasing, maintaining, and 3 
providing charging infrastructure for the zero–emission State transit bus fleet each year 4 
until the fleet is converted to zero–emission buses; and 5 
 
 2. Comparing the projected cost under item 1 of this item to 6 
the projected cost of continuing to operate a diesel–powered State transit bus fleet. 7 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 8 
1, 2022. 9 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.