EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0752* SENATE BILL 752 E4 2lr2891 CF 2lr3090 By: Senator Jackson Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports 2 FOR the purpose of altering a reporting requirement applicable to a law enforcement officer 3 or police officer involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty; requiring a local 4 law enforcement agency to publish certain information on its public website; and 5 generally relating to use of force incident reports. 6 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 Article – Public Safety 8 Section 3–514 9 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 Article – Public Safety 13 Section 3–514 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 (As enacted by Chapter 59 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021) 17 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 18 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 19 Article – Public Safety 20 3–514. 21 (A) (1) Each law enforcement agency shall require a law enforcement officer 22 who was involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty to file an incident report 23 regarding the use of force by the end of the officer’s shift unless the officer is disabled. 24 2 SENATE BILL 752 (2) THE INCIDENT REPORT S HALL INCLUDE : 1 (I) THE TYPE OF ENCOUNTE R; 2 (II) THE TYPE OF FORCE US ED; 3 (III) THE LOCATION AT WHIC H FORCE WAS USED ; 4 (IV) THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER’S JUSTIFICATION FOR 5 THE USE OF FORCE ; 6 (V) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 7 USED WAS ARRESTED ; 8 (VI) WHAT CHARGES THE INDIVIDUAL AGAINST W HOM FORCE 9 WAS USED WAS ARRESTE D FOR, IF ANY; 10 (VII) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 11 USED REQUESTED MEDIC AL CARE; 12 (VIII) WHETHER THE LAW ENFO RCEMENT OFFICER REQU ESTED 13 MEDICAL CARE ; AND 14 (IX) THE DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION ABOUT AN Y LAW 15 ENFORCEMENT OFFICER INVOLVED IN AND INDI VIDUALS SUBJECT TO T HE USE OF 16 FORCE, INCLUDING: 17 1. RACE; 18 2. ETHNICITY; 19 3. GENDER; 20 4. AGE; AND 21 5. DISABILITY. 22 (B) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, AND ANNUALLY THEREA FTER, EACH 23 LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMEN T AGENCY SHALL PUBLI SH ON ITS PUBLIC WEB SITE THE 24 AGGREGATE DATA OF PO LICE OFFICERS ’ USE OF FORCE REPORTE D UNDER 25 SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 26 SENATE BILL 752 3 (2) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023, AND EVERY 3 MONTHS 1 THEREAFTER , EACH LOCAL LA W ENFORCEMENT AGENCY SHALL PUBLISH ON ITS 2 PUBLIC WEBSITE THE T OTAL NUMBER OF USE O F FORCE INCIDENTS RE PORTED 3 UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR THE PRECEDING 3 MONTHS IN WHICH 4 THE LOCAL LAW ENFORC EMENT AGENCY DETERMI NED THAT: 5 (I) THE USE OF FORCE WAS CONSISTENT WITH ITS POLICIES 6 AND APPLICABLE LAWS ; AND 7 (II) THE USE OF FORCE WAS NOT CONSISTENT WITH ITS 8 POLICIES AND APPLICA BLE LAWS. 9 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 10 as follows: 11 Article – Public Safety 12 3–514. 13 (a) (1) Each law enforcement agency shall require a police officer who was 14 involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty to file an incident report regarding the 15 use of force by the end of the officer’s shift unless the officer is disabled. 16 (2) THE INCIDENT REPORT S HALL INCLUDE : 17 (I) THE TYPE OF ENCOUNTE R; 18 (II) THE TYPE OF FORCE US ED; 19 (III) THE LOCATION AT WHIC H FORCE WAS USED ; 20 (IV) THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER’S JUSTIFICATION FOR 21 USE OF FORCE; 22 (V) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORCE W AS 23 USED WAS ARRESTED ; 24 (VI) WHAT CHARGES THE IND IVIDUAL AGAINST WHOM FORCE 25 WAS USED WAS ARRESTE D FOR, IF ANY; 26 (VII) WHETHER THE INDIVIDU AL AGAINST WHOM FORC E WAS 27 USED REQUESTED MEDIC AL CARE; 28 4 SENATE BILL 752 (VIII) WHETHER THE LAW ENFO RCEMENT OFFICER REQUESTED 1 MEDICAL CARE ; AND 2 (IX) THE DEMOGRAPHIC INFO RMATION ABOUT ANY LA W 3 ENFORCEMENT OFFICER INVOLVED IN AND INDI VIDUALS SUBJECT TO T HE USE OF 4 FORCE, INCLUDING: 5 1. RACE 6 2. ETHNICITY; 7 3. GENDER; 8 4. AGE; AND 9 5. DISABILITY. 10 (b) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, AND ANNUALLY THEREAF TER, EACH 11 LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMEN T AGENCY SHALL PUBLI SH ON ITS PUBLIC WEB SITE THE 12 AGGREGATE DATA OF PO LICE OFFICERS ’ USE OF FORCE REPORTE D UNDER 13 SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 14 (2) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023, AND EVERY 3 MONTHS 15 THEREAFTER , EACH LOCAL LAW ENFOR CEMENT AGENCY SHALL PUBLISH ON ITS 16 PUBLIC WEBSITE THE T OTAL NUMBER OF USE O F FORCE INCIDENTS RE PORTED 17 UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR THE PRECEDING 3 MONTHS IN WHICH 18 THE LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY D ETERMINED THAT : 19 (I) THE USE OF FORCE WAS CONSISTENT WITH ITS POLICIES 20 AND APPLICABLE LAWS ; AND 21 (II) THE USE OF FORCE WAS NOT CONSISTENT WITH ITS 22 POLICIES AND APPLICA BLE LAWS. 23 [(1)] (3) On or before March 1 each year, each law enforcement agency 24 shall submit to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission the number of 25 use of force complaints made against its police officers during the previous calendar year, 26 aggregated by numbers of complaints administratively charged, not charged, unfounded, 27 and exonerated. 28 [(2)] (4) On or before July 15 each year, the Maryland Police Training and 29 Standards Commission shall post on its website and submit to the General Assembly, in 30 accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, a compendium of the 31 SENATE BILL 752 5 information submitted by law enforcement agencies under paragraph [(1)] (3) of this 1 subsection. 2 [(3)] (5) If a law enforcement agency has not submitted the report 3 required under paragraph [(1)] (3) of this subsection by July 1 for the previous calendar 4 year, the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services may not make 5 any grant funds available to that law enforcement agency. 6 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 7 effect October 1, 2022. It shall remain effective until the taking effect of Section 2 of this 8 Act. If Section 2 of this Act takes effect, Section 1 of this Act, with no further action required 9 by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 10 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall take 11 effect July 1, 2022 the effective date of Chapter 59 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 12 2021. If the effective date of Chapter 59 is amended, Section 2 of this Act shall take effect 13 on the taking effect of Chapter 59. 14 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, subject to the provisions of 15 Sections 3 and 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 16