Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB782 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/21/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0782*  
  
SENATE BILL 782 
C8   	2lr2569 
SB 896/21 – FIN & B&T   	CF HB 1424 
By: Senators Hester and Rosapepe 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Finance and Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 8, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic 3 
Transition; and generally relating to the COVID–19 economic crisis.  4 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 
That: 6 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition. 7 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 8 
 
 (1) four members of the Senate of Maryland, including members from the 9 
Budget and Taxation Committee, the Finance Committee, and the Education, Health, and 10 
Environmental Affairs Committee, appointed by the President of the Senate; 11 
 
 (2) four members of the House of Delegates, including members from the 12 
Appropriations Committee, the Committee on Ways and Means, the Economic Matters 13 
Committee, the Health and Government Operations Committee, and the Environment and 14 
Transportation Committee, appointed by the Speaker of the House; 15 
 
 (3) five members of the business sector, including representatives from the 16 
health care industry, cybersecurity industry, restaurant industry, childcare industry, and 17 
a multi–industry organization appointed by the Governor; 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 782  
 
 
 (4) five members of the labor sector, including representatives from the 1 
health care industry, cybersecurity industry, restaurant industry, childcare industry, and 2 
multi–industry labor organization, designated by the President of the Maryland State and 3 
District of Columbia AFL–CIO;  4 
 
 (4) (5) one member of the State nonprofit sector appointed by the Governor; 5 
 
 (5) (6) the Secretary of Commerce, or the Secretary’s designee; 6 
 
 (6) (7) the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary’s designee; 7 
 
 (7) (8) the Secretary of Transportation, or the Secretary’s designee; and 8 
 
 (8) (9) the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the 9 
Secretary’s designee. 10 
 
 (c) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House shall each appoint 11 
one of their members as cochair of the Workgroup. 12 
 
 (d) The Department of Legislative Services shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 13 
 
 (e) The Workgroup: 14 
 
 (1) may retain the services of the University of Maryland; and 15 
 
 (2) shall be appropriated $500,000 for that purpose. 16 
 
 (f) A member of the Workgroup: 17 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 18 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 19 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 20 
 
 (g) The Workgroup shall make recommendations regarding how the State may 21 
adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting 22 
from crises in sectors including: 23 
 
 (1) telehealth; 24 
 
 (2) telework; 25 
 
 (3) online education, from kindergarten to graduate programs; 26 
 
 (4) childcare; 27 
 
 (5) job creation acceleration; 28   	SENATE BILL 782 	3 
 
 
 
 (6) unemployment compensation; 1 
 
 (7) underemployment; 2 
 
 (8) small businesses and entrepreneurship; 3 
 
 (9) tax system modernization; 4 
 
 (10) changes in real estate such as office space, retail, residential, rental and 5 
ownership, and community economic centers; 6 
 
 (11) supply chain management; 7 
 
 (12) small businesses that are not associated with a chain store, commonly 8 
referred to as “main street businesses”; 9 
 
 (13) rebuilding the public health system; and 10 
 
 (14) other impacts on public services. 11 
 
 (h) On or before December 1, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an interim report 12 
of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 13 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 14 
 
 (i) On or before December 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report of 15 
its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 16 
State Government Article, the General Assembly. 17 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 18 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 19 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 20 
of no further force and effect. 21 
 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.