Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB799 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/16/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0799*  
  
SENATE BILL 799 
F2   	2lr0639 
SB 538/21 – B&T   	CF HB 1102 
By: Senator Guzzone Senators Guzzone, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, 
Griffith, Jackson, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 4, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers – Funding 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Governor, beginning in a certain fiscal year for certain 3 
fiscal years, to include in the annual State budget for the Maryland Higher 4 
Education Commission an appropriation of a certain amount to fund 5 
State–mandated community college tuition and residency waivers; and generally 6 
relating to community college funding for State–mandated tuition and residency 7 
waivers. 8 
 
BY adding to 9 
 Article – Education 10 
Section 16–322 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Education 16 
 
16–322. 17 
  2 	SENATE BILL 799  
 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION , “QUALIFYING STUDENT ” MEANS A COMMUNITY 1 
COLLEGE STUDENT WHO RECEIVES A TUITION O R RESIDENCY WAIVER A S ONE OF 2 
THE FOLLOWING : 3 
 
 (1) A FOSTER CARE RECIPIEN T OR AN UNACCOMPANIE D HOMELESS 4 
YOUTH UNDER § 15–106.1 OF THIS ARTICLE; 5 
 
 (2) A UNITED STATES ARMED FORC ES ACTIVE DUTY MEMBE R, THE 6 
SPOUSE OR CHILD OF A N ARMED FORCES ACTIV E DUTY MEMBER , A UNITED STATES 7 
ARMED FORCES VETERAN WHO HAS BEEN HONORAB LY DISCHARGED , OR A MEMBER 8 
OF THE NATIONAL GUARD UNDER § 15–106.4 OF THIS ARTICLE; 9 
 
 (3) THE SON OR DAUGHTER O F A STATE OR LOCAL PUBLIC SAFETY 10 
EMPLOYEE UNDER § 15–106.7 OF THIS ARTICLE; 11 
 
 (4) A SENIOR CITIZEN UNDER § 16–106(B) OF THIS TITLE; 12 
 
 (5) AN INDIVIDUAL WITH A DISABILITY UNDER § 16–106(C) OF THIS 13 
TITLE; 14 
 
 (6) A STUDENT ENROLLED IN AN EDUCATION PROGRAM LEADING TO 15 
LICENSURE IN NURSING UNDER § 16–310(A)(4) OF THIS SUBTITLE;  16 
 
 (7) A PUBLIC SCHOOL TEACHE R UNDER § 16–310(A)(6) OF THIS 17 
SUBTITLE; OR 18 
 
 (8) A STUDENT ENROLLED IN AN INSTRUCTIONAL PRO GRAM THAT 19 
THE COMMISSION DESIGNATES AS A HEALTH MANPOWER SHORTAGE PRO GRAM 20 
UNDER § 16–310(D) OF THIS SUBTITLE. 21 
 
 (B) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024 AND EACH FISCAL YEAR THEREAFTER EACH OF 22 
FISCAL YEARS 2024 THROUGH 2026, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE 23 
ANNUAL BUDGET BILL F OR THE COMMISSION AN APPROPR IATION OF $10,000,000 24 
TO FUND STATE–MANDATED TUITION AND RESIDENCY WAIVERS FO R COMMUNITY 25 
COLLEGES. 26 
 
 (C) THE COMMISSION SHALL DIST RIBUTE THE APPROPRIA TION REQUIRED 27 
UNDER SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION TO E ACH BOARD OF TRUSTEE S BASED ON 28 
THE NUMBER OF ENROLL ED QUALIFYING STUDEN TS AT EACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE 29 
IN PROPORTION TO THE TOTAL NUMBER OF ENRO LLED QUALIFYING STUD ENTS, AS 30 
DETERMINED BY THE COMMISSION. 31 
 
 (D) THE COMMISSION SHALL ADOP T ANY REGULATIONS OR GUIDELINES 32 
NECESSARY TO IMPLEME NT THIS SECTION. 33   	SENATE BILL 799 	3 
 
 
 
 (E) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2023, AND EACH DECEMBER 1 THROUGH 1 
DECEMBER 1, 2026, THE COMMISSION SHALL REPO RT TO THE GENERAL 2 
ASSEMBLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, 3 
ON THE NUMBER OF STU DENTS RECEIVING A TU ITION OR RESIDENCY W AIVER FOR 4 
EACH CATEGORY LISTED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION FOR EACH 5 
COMMUNITY COLLEGE AN D THE AMOUNT OF FUND S PROVIDED TO EACH 6 
COMMUNITY COLLEGE UN DER THIS SECTION .  7 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 8 
1, 2022. 9 
 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.