Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB8 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/28/2021

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0008*  
  
SENATE BILL 8 
D4, O4, N2   	2lr1178 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senators Kelley, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and West 
Requested: November 1, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitorin g of Guardians of 2 
Vulnerable Minors 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring 4 
of Guardians of Vulnerable Minors to study and make recommendations related to 5 
the monitoring of guardians of vulnerable minors; and generally relating to the Task 6 
Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable 7 
Minors. 8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That: 10 
 
 (a) In this section, “minor” means a person under the age of 18 years who the 11 
juvenile court has granted guardianship of under Subtitle 3 of the Family Law Article. 12 
 
 (b) There is a Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of 13 
Guardians of Vulnerable Minors. 14 
 
 (c) The Task Force consists of the following members: 15 
 
 (1) two members of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 16 
the Senate; 17 
 
 (2) two members of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of 18 
the House; 19 
 
 (3) the Secretary of Human Services, or the Secretary’s designee; 20 
 
 (4) the Attorney General, or the Attorney General’s designee; 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 8  
 
 
 (5) three members of the public, appointed by the Governor; and 1 
 
 (6) one representative from each of the following organizations, designated 2 
by the organization: 3 
 
 (i) the Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) Program; 4 
 
 (ii) the Estate and Trust Law Section of the Maryland State Bar 5 
Association; 6 
 
 (iii) the Family and Juvenile Law Section of the Maryland State Bar 7 
Association; and 8 
 
 (iv) the Maryland Bankers Association. 9 
 
 (d) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Delegates shall 10 
jointly designate a member who is a Senator and a member who is a Delegate to serve as 11 
cochairs of the Task Force. 12 
 
 (e) The Department of Legislative Services shall provide staff for the Task Force. 13 
 
 (f) A member of the Task Force: 14 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Task Force; but 15 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 16 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 17 
 
 (g) The Task Force shall: 18 
 
 (1) study the processes by which the State and local governments currently 19 
monitor guardians of vulnerable minors for: 20 
 
 (i) mismanagement of the assets and finances of vulnerable minors; 21 
 
 (ii) neglect of vulnerable minors; and 22 
 
 (iii) abuse of vulnerable minors; and 23 
 
 (2) make recommendations on whether there is a need for enhance d 24 
monitoring of the guardians of vulnerable minors, including any necessary regulatory 25 
changes or legislation. 26 
 
 (h) On or before October 1, 2023, the Task Force shall report its findings and 27 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 28 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 29 
   	SENATE BILL 8 	3 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 1 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 7 months and, at the end of 2 
December 31, 2023, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 3 
be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 4