Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB80 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/03/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0080*  
  
SENATE BILL 80 
R4, R5   	2lr0497 
SB 312/21 – JPR 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 193 
By: Senator Eckardt 
Requested: September 17, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 3, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Motor Vehicle Registration – Exceptions for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and 2 
Taylors Island 3 
 
FOR the purpose of creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for 4 
golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island, 5 
subject to certain requirements and conditions; authorizing the County Council of 6 
Dorchester County to designate county highways on which a person may operate a 7 
golf cart on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island; and 8 
generally relating to exceptions to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf 9 
carts. 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 11 
 Article – Transportation 12 
 Section 13–402(a)(1) 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 16 
 Article – Transportation 17 
 Section 13–402(c)(12) 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 20 
 
BY adding to 21  2 	SENATE BILL 80  
 
 
 Article – Transportation 1 
 Section 21–104.6 2 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 3 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 4 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 6 
 
Article – Transportation 7 
 
13–402. 8 
 
 (a) (1) Except as otherwise provided in this section or elsewhere in the 9 
Maryland Vehicle Law, each motor vehicle, trailer, semitrailer, and pole trailer driven on 10 
a highway shall be registered under this subtitle. 11 
 
 (c) Registration under this subtitle is not required for: 12 
 
 (12) A golf cart that is operated on a highway in accordance with [§§  13 
21–104.2 through 21–104.4] § 21–104.2, § 21–104.3, § 21–104.4, OR § 21–104.6 of this 14 
article; 15 
 
21–104.6. 16 
 
 (A) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION , A PERSON WHO 17 
OPERATES A GOLF CART ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, 18 
MIDDLE HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND, WITHOUT REGISTRATION AS 19 
AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–402(C)(12) OF THIS ARTICLE: 20 
 
 (1) MAY OPERATE THE GOLF CART ONLY : 21 
 
 (I) ON A COUNTY HIGHWAY ON WHICH THE MAXIMUM POSTED 22 
SPEED LIMIT DOES NOT EXCEED 30 MILES PER HOUR ; 23 
 
 (II) BETWEEN DAWN AND DUSK ; AND 24 
 
 (III) IF THE GOLF CART IS E QUIPPED WITH LIGHTIN G DEVICES 25 
AS REQUIRED BY THE ADMINISTRATION ; 26 
 
 (2) SHALL KEEP THE GOLF C ART AS FAR TO THE RI GHT OF THE 27 
ROADWAY AS FEASIBLE ; AND 28 
 
 (3) SHALL POSSESS A VALID DRIVER’S LICENSE. 29 
 
 (B) THE COUNTY COUNCIL OF DORCHESTER COUNTY MAY DESIGNATE BY 30   	SENATE BILL 80 	3 
 
 
RESOLUTION THE COUNTY HIGHWAYS ON UPPER HOOPERS ISLAND, MIDDLE 1 
HOOPERS ISLAND, OR TAYLORS ISLAND ON WHICH A PERSON MA Y OPERATE A GOLF 2 
CART. 3 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 4 
October 1, 2022. 5 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.