Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB831 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/13/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
         Italics indicate opposite chamber/conference committee amendments. 
          *sb0831*  
  
SENATE BILL 831 
F1   	(2lr3076) 
ENROLLED BILL 
— Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs/Ways and 
Means and Appropriations — 
Introduced by Senators Zucker and King 
 
Read and Examined by Proofreaders: 
 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
_______________________________________________ 
Proofreader. 
 
Sealed with the Great Seal and presented to the Governor, for his app roval this 
  
_______ day of _______________ at ________________________ o’clock, ________M. 
  
______________________________________________ 
President.  
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Education Support Professionals – Workgroup and Bonus Bonus and Report 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support 3 
Professionals; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an 4 
appropriation sufficient to provide a certain bonus to certain public school employees 5 
in a certain fiscal year; requiring the State Department of Education to collect 6 
certain data from each county board of education for a certain school year and to 7 
report the data on or before a certain date; and generally relating to the study of the 8 
wages of, and the payment of a bonus to, education support professionals. 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That: 11 
  2 	SENATE BILL 831  
 
 
 (a) In this section, “education support professionals” means noncertificated public 1 
school employees designated as part of a bargaining unit under Title 6, Subtitle 5 of the 2 
Education Article.  3 
 
 (a) (b) There is a Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support Professionals. 4 
 
 (b) (c) The purpose of the Workgroup is to determine what percentage of education 5 
support professionals in the State earn a living wage and to study increasing the wages of 6 
education support professionals to attract and retain skilled workers. 7 
 
 (c) (d) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 8 
 
 (1) two members of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 9 
the Senate; 10 
 
 (2) two members of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of 11 
the House; 12 
 
 (3) one member of the Maryland Association of Boards of Education, 13 
appointed by the Executive Director of the Association; 14 
 
 (4) the President of the Maryland State Education Association, or the 15 
President’s designee; 16 
 
 (5) the President of the Service Employees International Union Local 500, 17 
or the President’s designee; 18 
 
 (6) the President of the American Federation of State, County and 19 
Municipal Employees Local 2250, or the President’s designee; 20 
 
 (7) the President of the American Federation of Teachers–Maryland, or the 21 
President’s designee; and  22 
 
 (8) the Executive Director of the American Federation of State, County and 23 
Municipal Employees Council 67, or the Executive Director’s designee. 24 
 
 (d) (e) The Workgroup shall elect the chair of the Workgroup by a majority vote at 25 
the first meeting.  26 
 
 (e) (f) The Maryland State Department of Education shall provide staff for the 27 
Workgroup.  28 
 
 (f) (g) A member of the Workgroup: 29 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but  30 
   	SENATE BILL 831 	3 
 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 1 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 2 
 
 (g) (h) In determining what percentage of education support professionals earn a 3 
living wage in the State and to study increasing the wages of education support 4 
professionals to attract and retain skilled workers, the Workgroup shall consider: 5 
 
 (1) the role of local education systems and the State in hiring education 6 
support professionals; 7 
 
 (2) the number of education support professionals employed by the State 8 
or a local school system, or as a contractor; 9 
 
 (3) any cost–sharing between the State and the local school systems with 10 
regard to the wages and salaries of education support professionals; 11 
 
 (4) the total number of part–time and full–time education support 12 
professionals in the State; 13 
 
 (5) the number of hours required to work, according to the policies of each 14 
jurisdiction, to be considered a full–time employee; 15 
 
 (6) a complete list of education support professional classifications by 16 
jurisdiction; 17 
 
 (7) the average hourly wage of education support professionals in the State 18 
and by jurisdiction; 19 
 
 (8) an analysis of the wage scale for education support professionals; 20 
 
 (9) information on increased wages or bonuses by jurisdiction within the 21 
last 5 years; 22 
 
 (10) the amount of vacancies in the State and by jurisdiction for education 23 
support professional jobs; and 24 
 
 (11) information on the future of education support professional jobs in the 25 
State. 26 
 
 (h) (i) The Maryland State Department of Education and each county board of 27 
education shall provide all information requested from the Workgroup.  28 
 
 (j) (1) On or before November 30, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an 29 
interim report of its findings and recommendations to, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 30 
State Government Article, the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the Senate 31 
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, the House Ap propriations 32 
Committee, and the House Committee on Ways and Means. 33  4 	SENATE BILL 831  
 
 
 
 (2) On or before August 31, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 1 
of its findings and recommendations, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 2 
Article, to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the Senate Education, Health, and 3 
Environmental Affairs Committee, the House Appropriations Committee, and the House 4 
Committee on Ways and Means. 5 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 6 
 
 (a) In this section, “noncertificated education support professionals” means 7 
noncertificated public school employees designated as part of a bargaining unit under Title 8 
6, Subtitle 5 of the Education Article.  9 
 
 (a) (b) If the fiscal year 2023 budget includes an appropriation sufficient to provide a 10 
$500 bonus to each noncertificated education support professional in fiscal year 2023, the 11 
The Governor shall include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 an appropriation 12 
sufficient to provide a $500 bonus to equal to the number of noncertificated education 13 
support professionals, reported collected in accordance with subsection (d) (c) of this section, 14 
multiplied by $500 for, in order to provide a $500 bonus to each noncertificated education 15 
support professional in fiscal year 2024. 16 
 
 (b) (c) If the fiscal year 2023 budget does not include an appropriation sufficient to 17 
provide a $500 bonus to each noncertificated education support professional in fiscal year 18 
2023, the Governor shall include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 an 19 
appropriation sufficient to provide a $1,000 bonus to equal to the number of noncertificated 20 
education support professionals, reported in accordance with subsection (d) of this section, 21 
multiplied by $1,000 for each noncertificated education support professional in fiscal year 22 
2024. 23 
 
 (d) (c) The Maryland State Department of Education shall:  24 
 
 (1) collect data from each county board of education regarding, including 25 
Baltimore City, on the number of noncertificated education support professionals the 26 
county board employed during the 2021–2022 school year; and  27 
 
 (2) on or before September 15, 2022, submit a report to the Governor, the 28 
Department of Budget and Management, and the General Assembly, in accordance with § 29 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, on the total number of noncertificated education 30 
support professionals employed by county boards of education during the 2021–2022 school 31 
year.  32 
 
 SECTION 3. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACT ED, That this Act shall take effect 33 
July 1, 2022. Section 1 of this this Act shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 4 34 
months and, at the end of October 31, 2023, Section 1 of this Act, with no further action 35 
required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 36