EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0836* SENATE BILL 836 P2 2lr2611 SB 924/21 – EHE By: Senator Jennings Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation Committee Report: Favorable with amendments Senate action: Adopted Read second time: March 18, 2022 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Procurement – Information Technology – Cloud–Based Virtual Desktop 2 Infrastructure 3 FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Information Technology to issue a request 4 for proposals for or make a certain determination on develop a plan for the 5 implementation of a certain model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based virtual 6 desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 7 support and management systems; and generally relating to the procurement of 8 cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services. 9 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MA RYLAND, 10 That: 11 (a) In this section, “Device as a Service” means a service model that supports 12 enterprise hardware, delivers end–to–end life cycle services for end users, allows the State 13 to subscribe to end–user information technology devices including personal computers, 14 smartphones, tablets, and other mobile devices, and standard operating software while 15 outsourcing the device management, device backups, asset tracking, security, and 16 end–of–life disposal to an external service provider. 17 (b) By July 1, 2023, the Department of Information Technology shall issue a 18 request for proposals or make a determination to participate in an intergovernmental 19 cooperative purchasing agreement with another state develop a plan for the 20 implementation of a Device as a Service model and ongoing maintenance of cloud–based 21 2 SENATE BILL 836 virtual desktop infrastructure to be used by each unit of State government as desktop 1 support and management systems. 2 (c) The Department In developing the plan required under subsection (b) of this 3 section, the Department shall: 4 (1) may evaluate options to contract for Device as a Service virtual desktop 5 infrastructure services consistent with Division II of the State Finance and Procurement 6 Article; and 7 (2) shall: 8 (i) review information technology contracts for fu ll–service 9 end–to–end enterprise device management and desktop support entered into by other 10 states; and 11 (ii) (3) consider participating options to participate in an 12 intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement with another state for the 13 implementation and ongoing maintenance of Device as a Service cloud–based virtual 14 desktop infrastructure. 15 (d) The factors used in evaluating a proposal or making a determination 16 developing the plan under this section shall include: 17 (1) cost per device; 18 (2) the quality of the Device as a Service model and cloud–based virtual 19 desktop infrastructure services; 20 (3) the technical ability and experience of the offeror; and 21 (4) the guaranteed savings to the State of using end–to–end life cycle 22 device management or cloud–based virtual desktop infrastructure services compared to the 23 use of any preceding desktop support and management systems. 24 (e) (1) On or before August 1, 2023, the Department shall submit a report of 25 the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 26 Article. 27 (2) On or before December 15, 2023, the Department shall submit a report 28 on the implementation of the plan to the General Assembly, in accordance with § 2–1257 29 of the State Government Article, that includes estimated timelines for major 30 implementation milestones. 31 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32 October 1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 33 SENATE BILL 836 3 30, 2024, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 1 abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates.