Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB86 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/08/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0086*  
  
SENATE BILL 86 
M1, P2   	2lr1017 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 2lr3154 
By: Senator Hester 
Requested: October 28, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 8, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring certain leases executed by the Department of Natural 3 
Resources to include a provision relating to the access of trail heads by certain users; 4 
requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to submit a certain annual report to 5 
the Department of General Services; and generally relating to leases executed by the 6 
Department of Natural Resources.  7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 8 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 9 
Section 10–305(e) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 15 
 
10–305. 16 
 
 (e) (1) Whenever any unit of the State government leases any State–owned 17 
property under its jurisdiction and control to any State employee, agent, or servant, or to 18  2 	SENATE BILL 86  
 
 
any other individual in State service, for the purpose of permitting the individual to 1 
maintain a residence on or in the property, the lease shall be: 2 
 
 (i) executed by the unit; and 3 
 
 (ii) approved by the Secretary of General Services. 4 
 
 (2) The lease is not valid unless the Secretary of General Services approves 5 
it. 6 
 
 (3) Whenever any unit of the State government leases any State–owned 7 
property under its jurisdiction and control to any lessee, the lease shall include a provision 8 
which prohibits the lessee from assigning or subleasing that property without the prior 9 
approval of the Board of Public Works. 10 
 
 (4) (I) Whenever the State Highway Admin istration leases any  11 
State–owned property under its jurisdiction and control to any person, the Administrator 12 
of the State Highway Administration may execute the lease if: 13 
 
 [(i)] 1. the lease is entered into on a 30–day renewable basis; and 14 
 
 [(ii)] 2. the duration of the tenancy does not exceed 1 year. 15 
 
 [(5)] (II) At least twice each year, the Administrator of the State Highway 16 
Administration shall submit a report of the leases executed under the authority granted in 17 
SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS paragraph [(4) of this subsection] to the Board of Public 18 
Works. 19 
 
 (5) (I) WHENEVER THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES 20 
LEASES ANY STATE–OWNED PROPERTY UNDER ITS JURISDICTI ON AND CONTROL TO 21 
ANY LESSEE, THE LEASE SHALL INCL UDE A PROVISION THAT REQ UIRES THE LESSEE 22 
TO: 23 
 
 1. MAINTAIN A BORDER AR OUND THE PROPERTY 24 
SUFFICIENT TO ALLOW UNOBSTRUCTED ACCESS TO TRAIL HEADS BY TR AIL USERS 25 
AND FIRST RESPONDERS ; AND 26 
 
 2. ENSURE THAT THE BORDER REQUIRED UNDER ITEM 1 27 
OF THIS SUBPARAGRAPH REMAINS FREE OF OBST RUCTIONS AT ALL TIME S.  28 
 
 (II) AT LEAST ONCE EACH YE AR, THE SECRETARY OF NATURAL 29 
RESOURCES SHALL SUBMI T A REPORT OF ALL LE ASES EXECUTED BY THE 30 
DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES TO THE DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL 31 
SERVICES.  32 
   	SENATE BILL 86 	3 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 
October 1, 2022. 2 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.