Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB89 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/28/2021

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0089*  
  
SENATE BILL 89 
F2   	2lr1142 
  	(PRE–FILED)   
By: Senator Ellis 
Requested: November 1, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
University System of Maryland – Regional Higher Education Center – Charles 2 
County 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland 4 
to adopt and implement a plan to establish a regional higher education center in 5 
Charles County on or before certain dates; and generally relating to regional higher 6 
education centers.  7 
 
BY adding to 8 
 Article – Education 9 
Section 12–124 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Education 15 
 
12–124. 16 
 
 (A) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2023, THE BOARD OF REGENTS SHALL 17 
ADOPT A PLAN TO ESTABLISH A REGIONAL HIGHER ED UCATION CENTER LOCAT ED 18 
IN CHARLES COUNTY. 19 
 
 (2) THE PURPOSE OF THE RE GIONAL HIGHER EDUCAT ION CENTER IS 20 
TO PROVIDE STUDENTS IN CHARLES COUNTY WITH ACCESS TO ESTABLISHED, 21 
CUTTING–EDGE, AND HIGH–DEMAND ACADEMIC PROG RAMS OF DEGREE –GRANTING 22 
INSTITUTIONS.  23  2 	SENATE BILL 89  
 
 
 
 (B) (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2028, THE BOARD OF REGENTS SHALL 1 
IMPLEMENT THE PLAN A DOPTED UNDER SUBSECT ION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 2 
 
 (2) FUNDING FOR THE REGIO NAL HIGHER EDUCATION CENTER IN 3 
CHARLES COUNTY SHALL BE AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET .  4 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 5 
1, 2022. 6