Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB90 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/16/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0090*  
  
SENATE BILL 90 
M3   	2lr0612 
SB 446/21 – EHE 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 595 
By: Senator West 
Requested: September 30, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 13, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of the Environment – Supplemental Environmental Projects 2 
Database 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of the Environment to create and maintain 4 
a database of supplemental environmental projects that the Department may 5 
consider for implementation as part of a settlement of an enforcement action; 6 
requiring the Department to prioritize the selection of a supplemental 7 
environmental project located in the same geographic area as the alleged violation 8 
and to ensure that the scope and cost of a chosen project meet certain criteria; and 9 
generally relating to a supplemental environmental projects database. 10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Environment 12 
Section 1–306 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2013 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
 
Article – Environment 18 
 
1–306. 19 
  2 	SENATE BILL 90  
 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “SUPPLEMENTAL ENVIRON MENTAL PROJECT ” MEANS 1 
AN ENVIRONMENTALLY B ENEFICIAL PROJECT OR ACTIVITY THAT IS NOT REQUIRED 2 
BY LAW BUT THAT AN ALLEGED VIOLATOR AGR EES TO UNDERTAKE AS PART OF A 3 
SETTLEMENT OR ENFORC EMENT ACTION . 4 
 
 (B) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE 5 
DEPARTMENT SHALL CREA TE AND MAINTAIN A DA TABASE OF SUPPLEMENT AL 6 
ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC TS THAT THE DEPARTMENT MAY CO NSIDER FOR 7 
IMPLEMENTATION AS PA RT OF A SETTLEMENT O F AN ENFORCEMENT ACT ION. 8 
 
 (2) IN CREATING AND MAINT	AINING THE DATABASE , THE 9 
DEPARTMENT SHALL SOLI CIT INPUT FROM COMMU NITIES IN THE STATE THAT ARE 10 
OVERBURDENED , UNDERSERVED , OR OTHERWISE DISADVA	NTAGED BY 11 
ENVIRONMENTAL STRESS ORS. 12 
 
 (C) (1) THE DEPARTMENT MAY , WITH REASONABLE JUST IFICATION, 13 
CONSIDER A SUPPLEMEN TAL ENVIRONMENTAL PR OJECT THAT IS NOT IN CLUDED IN 14 
THE DATABASE REQUIRE D IN SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION AS P ART OF A 15 
SETTLEMENT OF AN ENF ORCEMENT AC TION. 16 
 
 (2) THE DEPARTMENT MAY NOT CH	OOSE A SUPPLEMENTAL 17 
ENVIRONMENTAL PROJEC T OFFERED BY THE VIO LATOR UNLESS THE DEPARTMENT : 18 
 
 (I) APPROVES THE PROJECT; AND 19 
 
 (II) MAINTAINS DOCUMENTATI ON OF THE APPROVAL . 20 
 
 (D) BEFORE A VIOLATOR UND ERTAKES A SUPPLEMENTAL ENVIRON MENTAL 21 
PROJECT, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 22 
 
 (1) GIVE PRIORITY CONSIDE RATION TO THE SELECTION OF A 23 
PROJECT LOCATED IN T HE SAME GEOGRAPHIC A REA IMPACTED BY THE ALLEGED 24 
VIOLATION; AND 25 
 
 (2) ENSURE THAT THE SCOPE AND C OST OF THE CHOSEN PR OJECT IS 26 
REASONABLY RELATED T O THE NEXUS OF THE VIOLATION OR THE ADVERSE IMPAC T 27 
OF THE VIOLATION AND THAT THE COST IS SUFFICIE NT TO ALLOW THE 28 
DEPARTMENT AND THE AL LEGED VIOLATOR TO RE ACH A SETTLEMENT . 29 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 30 
October 1, 2022. 31