Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB91 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/03/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0091*  
  
SENATE BILL 91 
C2, E4   	2lr0408 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 2lr1400 
By: Senator Jackson 
Requested: August 26, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Business Regulation – Innkeepers – Maintenance of Guest Records and 2 
Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring innkeeper s to establish and maintain a certain  4 
record–keeping system for guest transactions and receipts; requiring the Governor’s 5 
Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services and the Maryland 6 
Department of Labor to approve certain training programs regarding human 7 
trafficking; requiring innkeepers to take certain actions to provide employees with 8 
training on the prevention, identification, and reporting of human trafficking; and 9 
generally relating to innkeepers and human trafficking. 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 11 
 Article – Business Regulation 12 
 Section 15–201  13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 15 
 
BY adding to 16 
 Article – Business Regulation 17 
 Section 15–209 and 15–210 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 20 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 21 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 22 
 
Article – Business Regulation 23 
 
15–201. 24 
  2 	SENATE BILL 91  
 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 1 
 
 (b) “Innkeeper” means the owner, operator, manager, or keeper of a lodging 2 
establishment, or the agent of an owner, operator, manager, or keeper of a lodging 3 
establishment. 4 
 
 (c) “Lodging establishment” means an inn, hotel, motel, or other establishment 5 
that has at least four rooms available for a fee to transient guests for lodging or sleeping 6 
purposes. 7 
 
15–209. 8 
 
 (A) AN INNKEEPER SHALL ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A COMPUTERI ZED 9 
RECORD–KEEPING SYSTEM OF AL L GUEST TRANSACTIONS AND RECEIPTS. 10 
 
 (B) A RECORD MAINTAINED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS SECTION SHALL BE 11 
RETAINED BY THE INNK EEPER FOR NOT LESS T HAN 6 MONTHS AFTER THE DATE OF 12 
THE CREATION OF THE RECORD. 13 
 
15–210. 14 
 
 (A) (1) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 15 
VICTIM SERVICES AND THE DEPARTMENT SHALL APPR OVE EDUCATIONAL 16 
TRAINING PROGRAM S FOR THE ACCURATE AND PROMPT IDENTIFICATIO N AND 17 
REPORTING OF SUSPECT ED HUMAN TRAFFICKING . 18 
 
 (2) A TRAINING PROGRAM APPROVED UNDER THIS SUBSECTION 19 
MUST INCLUDE A VIDEO PRES ENTATION THAT : 20 
 
 (I) DEFINES: 21 
 
 1. EXPLOITATION OF A CH ILD; AND 22 
 
 2. HUMAN TRAFFICKING ; AND 23 
 
 (II) OFFERS GUIDANCE TO E MPLOYEES OF INNKEEPE RS ON: 24 
 
 1. RECOGNIZING POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF HUMAN 25 
TRAFFICKING; 26 
 
 2. THE DIFFERENCES BETW EEN LABOR AND SEX 27 
TRAFFICKING THAT ARE SPECIFIC TO THE HOTE L INDUSTRY; 28 
 
 3. ACTIVITIES COMMONLY ASSOCIATED WITH HUMA N 29   	SENATE BILL 91 	3 
 
 
TRAFFICKING; AND 1 
 
 4. THE ROLE OF EMPLOYEE S IN REPORTING AND 2 
RESPONDING TO HUMAN TRAFFICKING. 3 
 
 (B) (1) AN INNKEEPER SHALL PROVIDE A NEW EMPLOYEE OF THE 4 
LODGING ESTABLISHM ENT WITH THE ANNUAL TRAINING DESCRIBED IN 5 
SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION WITHIN 45 DAYS AFTER THE DATE THE E MPLOYEE 6 
IS HIRED. 7 
 
 (2) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 8 
PARAGRAPH , ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, AND EACH OCTOBER 1 9 
THEREAFTER , AN INNKEEPER SHALL C ERTIFY TO THE DEPARTMENT THAT ALL 10 
EMPLOYEES OF THE LOD GING ESTABLISHMENT HAVE RECEIVED THE AN NUAL 11 
TRAINING PRESCRIBED BY THIS SECTION. 12 
 
 (II) THE REQUIREMENT UNDER THIS PARAGRAPH DOES NOT 13 
APPLY TO AN EMPLOYEE FO R WHOM FEWER THAN 45 DAYS HAVE ELAPSED SINCE 14 
THE DATE THE EMPLOYE E WAS HIRED. 15 
 
 (C) AN INNKEEPER SHALL : 16 
 
 (1) ESTABLISH A PROCEDUR E FOR REPORTING POTENTIAL 17 
INSTANCES OF HUMAN T RAFFICKING BY: 18 
 
 (I) AN EMPLOYEE TO THE I NNKEEPER; AND 19 
 
 (II) THE INNKEEPER TO THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME 20 
PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES; 21 
 
 (2) DEVELOP AND IMPLEMENT A HUMAN TR AFFICKING PREVENTION 22 
POLICY FOR THE INNKEEPER’S EMPLOYEES THAT INCLUDES HOW TO: 23 
 
 (I) RECOGNIZE POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING; 24 
 
 (II) RESPOND TO AN INDIVIDUAL WHO MAY BE OR IS A VICTIM OF 25 
HUMAN TRAFFICKING ; AND 26 
 
 (III) CONNECT AN INDIVIDUA L WHO MAY BE OR IS A VICTIM OF 27 
HUMAN TRAFFICKING WI TH ANY AVAILABLE RES OURCES; AND 28 
 
 (3) POST PROMINENTLY THE SIGN DEVELOPED BY THE DEPARTMENT 29 
UNDER § 15–207 OF THIS SUBTITLE IN A LOCATION CONSPI CUOUS TO THE 30  4 	SENATE BILL 91  
 
 
INNKEEPER’S EMPLOYEES. 1 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 2 
October 1, 2022. 3