Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB911 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/20/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0911*  
  
SENATE BILL 911 
C8   	2lr1703 
      
By: Senator Corderman 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Finance, February 21, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 7, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events 2 
Facility – Alterations 3 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the entity with which the Maryland Stadium Authority must 4 
enter into a written operating agreement before issuing bonds to finance the 5 
Hagerstown Multi –Use Sports and Events Facility from the  6 
Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation to The Hagerstown  7 
Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.; and generally relating to the 8 
Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility.  9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 10 
 Article – Economic Development 11 
Section 10–646.2(a) 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Article – Economic Development 16 
Section 10–646.2(e), (f), and (g) 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 19 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 20 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 21  2 	SENATE BILL 911  
 
 
 
Article – Economic Development 1 
 
10–646.2. 2 
 
 (a) Except as authorized by § 10–639 of this subtitle, to finance site acquisition, 3 
design, and construction of any segment of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events 4 
Facility, the Authority shall comply with this section. 5 
 
 (e) The Authority may not issue bonds to finance the Hagerstown Multi–Use 6 
Sports and Events Facility until the Authority and [the Hagerstown–Washington County 7 
Industrial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS 8 
FACILITY, INC., secure a written operating agreement. 9 
 
 (f) The Authority shall secure a written agreement to transfer ownership of the 10 
Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility from the Authority to [the  11 
Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation ] THE HAGERSTOWN 12 
MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., as approved by the Board of Public 13 
Works: 14 
 
 (1) in which [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial Foundation] 15 
THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., agrees to: 16 
 
 (i) own, market, promote, and operate or contract for the marketing, 17 
promotion, and operation of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in a 18 
manner that maximizes the Facility’s economic return; and 19 
 
 (ii) to maintain and repair or contract for the maintenance and 20 
repair of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility so as to keep the 21 
Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; 22 
 
 (2) that includes provisions: 23 
 
 (i) protecting the investments of the Authority and [the 24 
Hagerstown–Washington County Indu strial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN 25 
MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., in the Hagerstown Multi–Use 26 
Sports and Events Facility; 27 
 
 (ii) requiring [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial 28 
Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., 29 
to contribute to a capital improvement reserve fund an amount sufficient to keep the 30 
Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in first–class operating condition; 31 
 
 (iii) requiring [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial 32 
Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., 33 
to be solely responsible for all expenditures relating to the operation of the Hagerstown  34   	SENATE BILL 911 	3 
 
 
Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility that may be incurred, including operating deficits; 1 
and 2 
 
 (iv) allowing [the Hagerstown–Washington County Industrial 3 
Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS FACILITY, INC., 4 
to keep all operating profits resulting from the operation of the Hagerstown Multi–Use 5 
Sports and Events Facility each year; and 6 
 
 (3) to be solely responsible for all expenditures relating to the operation, 7 
maintenance, and repair of the Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility that may 8 
be incurred, including the amount by which expenditures exceed revenues. 9 
 
 (g) On or before December 31 each year, [the Hagerstown–Washington County 10 
Industrial Foundation] THE HAGERSTOWN MULTI–USE SPORTS AND EVENTS 11 
FACILITY, INC., shall report to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House 12 
Appropriations Committee, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, 13 
on the Facility’s assessment of the maintenance and repair needed to keep the Hagerstown 14 
Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility in operating order. 15 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 16 
October 1, 2022. 17 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.