Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB932 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/18/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LA W. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0932*  
  
SENATE BILL 932 
E4   	2lr3120 
    	CF HB 1439 
By: Senator Watson 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs, February 21, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of 2 
Bowie 3 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the City of Bowie to participate in the Maryland Intrastate 4 
Emergency Management Assistance Compact; and generally relating to the 5 
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 7 
 Article – Public Safety 8 
Section 14–801(a) and 14–803(1) and (2)  9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 
 Article – Public Safety 13 
 Section 14–801(e) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 
 
Article – Public Safety 19 
  2 	SENATE BILL 932  
 
 
14–801. 1 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 2 
 
 (e) “Jurisdictions” means the 23 counties within Maryland, Baltimore City, the 3 
City of Annapolis, THE CITY OF BOWIE, the City of Laurel, and Ocean City. 4 
 
14–803. 5 
 
 (1) Article 1. Purpose. 6 
 
 (a) (1) The purpose of this Compact is to provide for emergency 7 
management mutual assistance between the jurisdictions entering into this Compact. 8 
 
 (2) This Compact also shall provide for mutual cooperation in 9 
emergency management–related exercises, testing, or other training activities. 10 
 
 (2) Article 2. Requests for Assistance. 11 
 
 (b) (1) The senior elected official of each jurisdiction shall designate 12 
authorized representatives. An authorized representative of a party jurisdiction may 13 
request assistance from another party jurisdiction by contacting an authorized 14 
representative of that jurisdiction. 15 
 
 (2) The provisions of this Compact shall apply only to requests for 16 
assistance made by and to authorized representatives. 17 
 
 (3) Requests may be verbal or in writing. 18 
 
 (4) If verbal, the request shall be confirmed in writing at the earliest 19 
possible date, but no later than 10 calendar days following the verbal request. 20 
 
 (5) Written requests shall provide the following information: 21 
 
 (i) The functional areas for which assistance is needed, 22 
including fire services, law enforcement, emergency medical services, transportation, 23 
communications, public works and engineering, building inspection, planning and 24 
information assistance, mass care, resource support, health and medical services, and 25 
search and rescue; 26 
 
 (ii) The mission, capability, size, and amount of the requested 27 
aid; and 28 
 
 (iii) The logistics, location, and time for staging the aid from a 29 
responding party jurisdiction. 30 
   	SENATE BILL 932 	3 
 
 
 (6) There shall be frequent consultations between the Maryland 1 
Department of Emergency Management and appropriate representatives of the party 2 
jurisdictions with the unhindered exchange of information and plans generally relating to 3 
emergency management. 4 
 
 (7) An authorized representative of the requesting party jurisdiction 5 
will advise the Maryland Department of Emergency Management of verbal requests and 6 
provide copies of written requests. 7 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take ef fect 8 
October 1, 2022. 9 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.