Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB933 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/15/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0933*  
  
SENATE BILL 933 
F1   	2lr3197 
    	CF HB 633 
By: Senator Hershey 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the membership and qualifications of members of the 3 
Accountability and Implementation Board; requiring the Accountability and 4 
Implementation Board Nominating Committee to submit a certain slate of nominees 5 
to the Governor on or before a certain date; and generally relating to the membership 6 
of the Accountability and Implementation Board.  7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 8 
 Article – Education 9 
 Section 5–402(a) and (d)(1)(ii) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 12 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 
 Article – Education 14 
Section 5–402(d)(1)(i) 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 17 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 18 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 19 
 
Article – Education 20 
 
5–402. 21 
 
 (a) Beginning on July 1, 2020, and continuing until June 30, 2032, there is an 22 
Accountability and Implementation Board. 23 
  2 	SENATE BILL 933  
 
 
 (d) (1) (i) 1. The Board is composed of [seven] 11 members appointed 1 
by the Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate, chosen from a slate prepared 2 
by the Nominating Committee established under § 5–403 of this subtitle. 3 
 
 2. OF THE 11 MEMBERS OF THE BOARD: 4 
 
 A. ONE MEMBER SHALL BE A RESIDENT OF WESTERN 5 
MARYLAND, WHICH IS THE REGION THAT CONSISTS OF ALLEGANY, CARROLL, 6 
FREDERICK, GARRETT, AND WASHINGTON COUNTIES ; 7 
 
 B. ONE MEMBER SHALL BE A RESIDENT OF SOUTHERN 8 
MARYLAND, WHICH IS THE REGION THAT CONSISTS OF CALVERT, CHARLES, AND ST. 9 
MARY’S COUNTIES;  10 
 
 C. ONE MEMBER SHALL BE A RESIDENT OF THE 11 
EASTERN SHORE, WHICH IS THE REGION THAT CONSISTS OF CAROLINE, CECIL, 12 
DORCHESTER , KENT, QUEEN ANNE’S, SOMERSET, TALBOT, WICOMICO, AND 13 
WORCESTER COUNTIES ; AND 14 
 
 D. THERE SHALL BE ONE ME MBER FROM EACH OF TH E 15 
FIVE COUNTIES WITH T HE LARGEST STUDENT P OPULATIONS IN THE STATE, WHICH 16 
ARE ANNE ARUNDEL, BALTIMORE, MONTGOMERY , AND PRINCE GEORGE’S 17 
COUNTIES AND BALTIMORE CITY.  18 
 
 (ii) When appointing members of the Board, the Governor shall 19 
select from the slate of nominees nominated in accordance with § 5–403(c) of this subtitle. 20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, on or b efore August 1, 2022, 21 
the Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee shall, in accordance 22 
with § 5–403 of the Education Article, submit a slate of nominees to the Governor for the 23 
following initial four members: 24 
 
 (1) one member who is a resident of Western Maryland; 25 
 
 (2) one member who is a resident of Southern Maryland; 26 
 
 (3) one member who is a resident of the Eastern Shore; and 27 
 
 (4) one member who is a resident of Prince George’s County. 28 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, Th at this Act shall take effect July 29 
1, 2022. 30