Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB958 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/21/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0958*  
  
SENATE BILL 958 
P6   	2lr3195 
    	CF HB 1445 
By: Senator Carozza 
Introduced and read first time: February 14, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 28, 2022 
Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, March 2, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 10, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System – Crisfield Police Department 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring membership in the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension 3 
System for certain local law enforcement officers of the Crisfield Police Department 4 
under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to 5 
eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of 6 
the Crisfield Police Department’s participation in the Law Enforcement Officers’ 7 
Pension System; providing that an individual who receives certain service credit is 8 
not a member of and has no rights to a benefit in the Employees’ Pension System; 9 
providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; providing for 10 
the transfer and crediting of certain assets on the effective date of participation; and 11 
generally relating to the Crisfield Police Department’s participation in the Law 12 
Enforcement Officers’ Pension System. 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 14 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 15 
Section 31–2A–05(c) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 
 
BY adding to 19 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 20 
 Section 31–2A–06 21  2 	SENATE BILL 958  
 
 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 1 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 2 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 3 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 4 
 
Article – State Personnel and Pensions 5 
 
31–2A–05. 6 
 
 (c) (1) On the effective date: 7 
 
 (i) the assets to the credit of the local plan or State system that 8 
relate to the law enforcement officers, firefighters, or paramedics who elect to become 9 
members shall be transferred to the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System; and 10 
 
 (ii) the trustee or other administrative head of the local plan or State 11 
system shall certify the proportion of the funds of the local plan or State system that 12 
represents the accumulated contributions of the members as of that date. 13 
 
 (2) The accumulated contributions shall be credited to the respective 14 
annuity savings accounts of the members in the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension 15 
System. 16 
 
 (3) The balance of the funds transferred to the Law Enforcement Officers’ 17 
Pension System shall be offset against the special accrued liability to be funded by the 18 
participating governmental unit as provided by § 21–306.1(d) of this article. 19 
 
31–2A–06. 20 
 
 (A) THIS SECTION APPLIES TO AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS A LOCAL LAW 21 
ENFORCEMENT OFFICER OF THE CRISFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT BEFORE THE 22 
EFFECTIVE DATE , AND WHO REMAINS A LO CAL LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER OF THE 23 
CRISFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT THROUGH THE EFFECTIV E DATE. 24 
 
 (B) NOTWITHSTANDING ANY O THER PROVISION OF LA W, IF THE CRISFIELD 25 
POLICE DEPARTMENT BECOMES A PARTICIPAT ING GOVERNME NTAL UNIT IN THE 26 
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM, MEMBERSHIP IN THE LAW 27 
ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM IS MANDATORY F OR AN INDIVIDUAL 28 
DESCRIBED UNDER SUBS ECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 29 
 
 (C) IF THE CRISFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT COMMENCES PARTICIP ATION 30 
IN THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH 31 
SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, AN INDIVIDUAL DESCRI BED UNDER SUBSECTION 32 
(A) OF THIS SECTION IS E NTITLED TO ELIGIBILI TY SERVICE AND CREDI TABLE 33   	SENATE BILL 958 	3 
 
 
SERVICE IN THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM FOR 1 
EMPLOYMENT WITH THE CRISFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT BEFORE THE EFFECTIVE 2 
DATE. 3 
 
 (D) ON JOINING THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM 4 
AND RECEIVING SERVIC E CREDIT AS PROVIDED UNDER SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS 5 
SECTION, AN INDIVIDUAL DESCRIBED UNDER SUBS ECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION 6 
SHALL: 7 
 
 (1) NO LONGER BE A MEMBE R OF THE EMPLOYEES’ PENSION 8 
SYSTEM; AND  9 
 
 (2) HAVE NO FURTHER RIGH TS TO ANY BENEFIT IN THE EMPLOYEES’ 10 
PENSION SYSTEM. 11 
 
 (E) THE TRANSFER OF CREDI TABLE SERVICE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL 12 
DESCRIBED IN SUBSECT ION (A) OF THIS SECTION WHO IS A MEMBER OF THE 13 
EMPLOYEES’ PENSION SYSTEM THROUGH THE EF FECTIVE DATE , AND WHO 14 
TRANSFERS TO THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM UNDER THIS 15 
SECTION, IS NOT GOVERNED BY TITLE 37 OF THIS ARTICLE. 16 
 
 (F) IF THE CRISFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT BECOMES A PARTICIPAT ING 17 
GOVERNMENTAL UNIT IN THE LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS’ PENSION SYSTEM, § 18 
31–2A–05(C) OF THIS SUBTITLE SHA LL GOVERN THE TRANSF ER AND CREDITING OF 19 
ASSETS ON THE EFFECT IVE DATE. 20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 21 
1, 2022. 22 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.