Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB974 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/30/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0974*  
  
SENATE BILL 974 
P2, N1, M1   	2lr3023 
      
By: Senator Jennings 
Introduced and read first time: February 15, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, February 25, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 18, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Natural Resources’ Real Property – Exchange With Private Real 2 
Property – Requirement 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring authorizing the Department of Natural Resources State to 4 
exchange real property owned by the State for the use and benefit of the Department 5 
of Natural Resources with private real property under certain circumstances; and 6 
generally relating to the exchange of real property owned by the State for the use 7 
and benefit of the Department of Natural Resources.  8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with without amendments, 9 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 10 
Section 10–305(a) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 15 
 Section 10–305(b)(1) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 18 
 
BY adding to 19 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 20 
 Section 10–305(j) 21  2 	SENATE BILL 974  
 
 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 1 
 (2021 Replacement Volume)  2 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 3 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 4 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 5 
 
10–305. 6 
 
 (a) (1) Subject to subsections (b) and (c) of this section, any real or personal 7 
property of the State or a unit of the State government may be sold, leased, transferred, 8 
exchanged, granted, or otherwise disposed of: 9 
 
 [(1)] (I) to any person, to the United States or any of its units, or to any 10 
unit of the State government, for a consideration the Board decides is adequate; or 11 
 
 [(2)] (II) to any county or municipal corporation in the State subject to any 12 
conditions the Board imposes. 13 
 
 (2) IF A PROPERTY OWNER R EQUESTS TO EXCHANGE PRIVATE REAL 14 
PROPERTY WITH REAL P ROPERTY OWNED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 15 
RESOURCES, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES SHALL EXCHA NGE ITS 16 
REAL PROPERTY IF : 17 
 
 (I) THE PRIVATE REAL PRO PERTY IS EQUAL TO OR LARGER 18 
THAN THE SIZE OF THE REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 19 
RESOURCES; 20 
 
 (II) THE PRIVATE REAL PRO PERTY IS ADJACENT TO REAL 21 
PROPERTY OWNED BY TH E DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES THAT IS 22 
CONTIGUOUS WITH THE REAL PROPERTY THE PR OPERTY OWNER IS REQU ESTING 23 
THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES EXCHANGE ;  24 
 
 (III) THE APPRAISED VALUE OF THE PRIVATE REAL PROPERTY 25 
IS: 26 
 
 1. EQUAL TO OR LESS THA N $100,000; AND 27 
 
 2. EQUAL TO OR GREATER THAN THE APPRAISED VAL UE 28 
OF THE REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES; 29 
AND 30 
 
 (IV) THE APPRAISED VALUE OF THE REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY 31 
THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES IS EQUAL TO OR LESS THAN $100,000.  32   	SENATE BILL 974 	3 
 
 
 
 (b) (1) (i) Except as provided under subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph, 1 
this subsection applies to the sale, transfer, grant, or exchange of: 2 
 
 1. real property identified under § 5–310(c)(1) of this article; 3 
and 4 
 
 2. State–owned real or personal property, funded in 5 
accordance with an appropriation act of the General Assembly, that has an appraised value 6 
over $100,000. 7 
 
 (ii) This subsection does not apply to the following dispositions of 8 
property identified in subparagraph (i) of this paragraph: 9 
 
 1. leasing the property; [or] 10 
 
 2. the sale, transfer, grant, or exchange of a corrective or 11 
access easement on the property; OR 12 
 
 3. AN EXCHANGE UNDER SU BSECTION (J) OF THIS 13 
SECTION. 14 
 
 (J) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , IF AN OWNER 15 
OF REAL PROPERTY REQUESTS TO EXCHANGE THE OWNER’S REAL PROPERTY WITH 16 
REAL PROPERTY OWNED BY THE STATE FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE 17 
DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, THE STATE MAY EXCHANGE IT S REAL 18 
PROPERTY FOR THE OWN ER’S REAL PROPERTY IF : 19 
 
 (I) THE REAL PROPERTY OW NED BY THE STATE DOES NOT 20 
EXCEED 2 ACRES IN SIZE; AND  21 
 
 (II) THE OWNER REQUESTING THE EXCHANGE PAYS AL L COSTS 22 
ASSOCIATED WITH THE EXCHANGE OF THE REAL PROPERTY, INCLUDING BOUNDARY 23 
RELOCATION , SURVEYING, ENGINEERING , LEGAL FEES, AND RECORDATION COSTS . 24 
 
 (2) (I) THE BOARD MAY NOT APPROVE AN EXCHANGE UNDER TH IS 25 
SUBSECTION UNLESS : 26 
 
 1. THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES 27 
SUBMITS TO THE LEGISLATIVE POLICY COMMITTEE: 28 
 
 A. A DESCRIPTION OF THE PROPERTY TO BE 29 
EXCHANGED ; AND 30 
 
 B. THE JUSTIFICATION FOR TH E EXCHANGE; AND 31  4 	SENATE BILL 974  
 
 
 
 2. THE LEGISLATIVE POLICY COMMITTEE REVIEWS THE 1 
INFORMATION SUBMITTE D BY THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES UNDER 2 
THIS SUBPARAGRAPH AN D: 3 
 
 A. APPROVES THE PROPOSE D EXCHANGE AND REFER S 4 
THE PROPERTY BACK TO THE BOARD FOR FINAL DISPO SITION; OR 5 
 
 B. REFERS THE PROPOSED EXCHANGE TO THE FULL 6 
GENERAL ASSEMBLY AND NOTIFIES THE BOARD OF THE REFERRAL . 7 
 
 (II) IF THE LEGISLATIVE POLICY COMMITTEE FAILS TO TA KE 8 
ANY ACTION UNDER SUB PARAGRAPH (I)2 OF THIS PARAGRAPH WI THIN 45 DAYS 9 
AFTER RECEIVING THE INFORMATION SUBMITTE D UNDER SUBPARAGRAPH (I)1 OF 10 
THIS PARAGRAPH , THE PROPOSED EXCHANG E SHALL BE DEEMED : 11 
 
 1. APPROVED BY THE COMMITTEE; AND 12 
 
 2. REFERRED TO THE BOARD FOR FINAL DISPO SITION. 13 
 
 (III) 1. IF THE LEGISLATIVE POLICY COMMITTEE REFERS 14 
THE PROPOSED EXCHANG E OF REAL PROPERTY T O THE FULL GENERAL ASSEMBLY, 15 
THE PROPOSED EXCHANG E MAY NOT BE APPROVE D BY THE BOARD UNLESS IT IS 16 
APPROVED BY THE PASS AGE OF LEGISLATION D URING THE NEXT LEGIS LATIVE 17 
SESSION OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY. 18 
 
 2. IN ANY LEGISLATION PA SSED IN ACCORDANCE W ITH 19 
THIS SUBPARAGRAPH , THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY MAY APPROVE THE PROPOSED 20 
EXCHANGE WITH OR WIT HOUT CONDITIONS . 21 
 
 (3) AN EXCHANGE UNDER THI S SUBSECTION IS NOT SUBJECT TO THE 22 
NOTICE REQUIREMENT U NDER § 5–310(A) OF THIS ARTICLE.  23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 24 
October 1, 2022.  25