Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB997 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/21/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0997*  
  
SENATE BILL 997 
P6   	2lr3289 
    	CF HB 1476 
By: Senator Eckardt 
Introduced and read first time: February 23, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Judicial Proceedings, February 28, 2022 
Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, March 2, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 10, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Talbot County 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring membership in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System 3 
for certain local detention center officers of Talbot County in the event Talbot County 4 
becomes a participating governmental unit in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement 5 
System; providing that certain local detention center officers who join the 6 
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System and receive certain service credit shall no 7 
longer be members of the Employees’ Pension System; and generally relating to 8 
Talbot County’s participation in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System. 9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 11 
Section 31–2B–08 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – State Personnel and Pensions 17 
 
31–2B–08. 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 997  
 
 
 (A) THIS SECTION APPLIES TO AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS A LOCAL DETENTION 1 
CENTER OFFICER OF TALBOT COUNTY BEFORE THE EFFECTIVE DATE AND WHO 2 
REMAINS A LOCAL DETE NTION CENTER OFFICER OF TALBOT COUNTY THROUGH 3 
THE EFFECTIVE DATE . 4 
 
 (B) NOTWITHSTANDING ANY O THER PROVISION OF LA W, IF TALBOT 5 
COUNTY BECOMES A PART ICIPATING GOVERNMENT AL UNIT IN THE CORRECTIONAL 6 
OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMBERSHIP IN THE CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ 7 
RETIREMENT SYSTEM IS MANDATORY F OR AN INDIVIDUAL DES CRIBED UNDER 8 
SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 9 
 
 (C) IF TALBOT COUNTY COMMENCES PART	ICIPATION IN THE 10 
CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH 11 
SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, AN INDIVIDUAL DESCRI BED UNDER SUBSECTION 12 
(A) OF THIS SECTION IS E NTITLED TO ELIGIBILI TY SERVICE AND CREDI TABLE 13 
SERVICE IN THE CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM FOR 14 
EMPLOYMENT WITH TALBOT COUNTY BEFO RE THE EFFECTIVE DAT E. 15 
 
 (D) ON JOINING THE CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM 16 
AND RECEIVING SERVIC E CREDIT AS PROVIDED UNDER SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS 17 
SECTION, AN INDIVIDUAL DESCRI BED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION 18 
SHALL: 19 
 
 (1) NO LONGER BE A ME MBER OF THE EMPLOYEES’ PENSION 20 
SYSTEM; AND 21 
 
 (2) HAVE NO FURTHER RIGH TS TO ANY BENEFIT IN THE EMPLOYEES’ 22 
PENSION SYSTEM. 23 
 
 (E) THE TRANSFER OF CREDI TABLE SERVICE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL 24 
DESCRIBED IN SUBSECT ION (A) OF THIS SECTION WHO IS A MEMBER OF THE 25 
EMPLOYEE S’ PENSION SYSTEM THROUGH THE EF FECTIVE DATE , AND WHO 26 
TRANSFERS TO THE CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM UNDER THIS 27 
SECTION, IS NOT GOVERNED BY TITLE 37 OF THIS ARTICLE. 28 
 
 (F) IF TALBOT COUNTY BECOMES A PART ICIPATING GOVERNMENT AL UNIT 29 
IN THE CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS’ RETIREMENT SYSTEM, § 31–2B–05(C) OF THIS 30 
SUBTITLE SHALL GOVER N THE TRANSFER AND C REDITING OF ASSETS O N THE 31 
EFFECTIVE DATE . 32 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 33 
1, 2022. 34