Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SJ4 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/18/2022

                     LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor 	J.R. 3 
 
– 1 – 
Joint Resolution 3 
(Senate Joint Resolution 4	) 
 
A Senate Joint Resolution concerning 
 
Judicial Compensation Commission – Recommendations 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the compensation of the members of the Judiciary in this 
State in accordance with Section 1–708 of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings 
Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland. 
 
 WHEREAS, Section 1–708(b)(2) of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings Article of the 
Annotated Code of Maryland establishes a seven	–member Judicial Compensation 
Commission appointed by the Governor with two members appointed on nomination of the 
President of the Senate, two members appointed on nomination of the Speaker of the House 
of Delegates, one member appointed on nomination of the Maryland State Bar Association, 
and two members appointed at large. The Judicial Compensation Commission is 
constituted as follows: appointments made on the nomination of the President of the 
Senate: Meghan Casey and Carlos Williams; appointments made on the nomination of the 
Speaker of the House of Delegates: Victoria Fretwell and John Wasilisin; appointment 
made on the nomination of the Maryland State Bar Association: Edward Gilliss; and 
appointments at large: John Suit II and Alice Pinderhughes. The Commission members 
elected Edward Gilliss to serve as the chair of the Commission. The Commission is charged 
with reviewing the salaries and pensions of the judges of the Judiciary of Maryland and 
making written recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or after 
September 1, 2011, September 1, 2013, and every 4 years thereafter; and 
 
 WHEREAS, Section 1–708(d) of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings Article of the 
Annotated Code of Maryland provides as follows: the General Assembly may amend this 
Joint Resolution to decrease any of the Commission’s salary recommendations, but no 
reduction may diminish the salary of a judge during the judge’s continuance in office. The 
General Assembly may not amend this Joint Resolution to 	increase these recommended 
salaries. Should the General Assembly not adopt or amend this Joint Resolution within 50 
days after its introduction, the salaries recommended herein shall apply during fiscal years 
2023 through 2026. Should the General Assembly reject any or all of the salaries herein 
recommended, the salaries of the judges so affected shall remain unchanged during fiscal 
years 2023 through 2026 unless modified under other provisions of the law; and 
 
 WHEREAS, The Judicial Compensation Commission held two meetings in 2021 and 
considered many aspects and facets of judicial compensation. The Commission, by a vote of 
five or more of its members as required by § 1–708(b)(7) of the Courts and Judicial 
Proceedings Article, has recommended an increase in judicial salaries for fiscal years 2023 
through 2026; now, therefore, be it 
 
 RESOLVED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That after 
considering the recommendations of the Judicial Compensation Commission,
 beginning  J.R. 3 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
July 1, 2022, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
and be it further 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2023, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
and be it further 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2024, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Position Current Salary Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals   
Chief Judge 	215,433 225,433 
Associate Judge 196,433 206,433 
Court of Special   
Appeals   
Chief Judge 	186,633 196,633 
Associate Judge 183,633 193,633 
Circuit Courts   
Judge 	174,433 184,433 
District Court   
Chief Judge 	183,633 193,633 
Associate Judge 161,333 171,333; 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	235,433 
Associate Judge 216,433 
Court of Special  
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	206,633 
Associate Judge 203,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	194,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	203,633 
Associate Judge 181,333; 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	245,433 
Associate Judge 226,433 
Court of Special    LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor 	J.R. 3 
 
– 3 – 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
and be it further 
 
 RESOLVED, That beginning July 1, 2025, judicial salaries shall be as follows: 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
and be it further 
 
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be forwarded by the Department of 
Legislative Services to the Honorable Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr., Governor of Maryland; the 
Honorable William C. Ferguson, IV, President of the Senate of Maryland; and the 
Honorable Adrienne A. Jones, Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
 
Enacted under § 1–708 of the Courts Article , March 13, 2022. 
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	216,633 
Associate Judge 213,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	204,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	213,633 
Associate Judge 191,333; 
Position Proposed Salary 
Court of Appeals  
Chief Judge 	255,433 
Associate Judge 236,433 
Court of Special  
Appeals  
Chief Judge 	226,633 
Associate Judge 223,633 
Circuit Courts  
Judge 	214,433 
District Court  
Chief Judge 	223,633 
Associate Judge 201,333;