Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB214 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDE D TO EXISTING LAW . 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0214*  
  
HOUSE BILL 214 
J1   	3lr0363 
    	CF 3lr0368 
By: Delegates Kelly, Pena–Melnyk, Alston, Bagnall, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, 
S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Taveras, White, and Woods 
Introduced and read first time: January 20, 2023 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Commission on Public Health – Establishment 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission on Public Health to make 3 
recommendations to improve the delivery of foundational public health services in 4 
the State; requiring the Commission to conduct a certain assessment on or before a 5 
certain date; and generally relating to the Commission on Public Health.  6 
 
BY adding to 7 
 Article – Health – General 8 
Section 13–4801 through 13–4807 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 48. 9 
Commission on Public Health” 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Health – General 15 
 
SUBTITLE 48. COMMISSION ON PUBLIC HEALTH. 16 
 
13–4801. 17 
 
 (A) IN THIS SUBTITLE THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 18 
INDICATED. 19 
 
 (B) “COMMISSION” MEANS THE COMMISSION ON PUBLIC HEALTH. 20 
 
 (C) “FOUNDATIONAL PUBLIC H EALTH SERVICES ” INCLUDES: 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 214  
 
 
 
 (1) THE FOLLOWING FOUNDATIONAL AREAS : 1 
 
 (I) COMMUNICABLE DISEASE CONTROL; 2 
 
 (II) CHRONIC DISEASE AND I NJURY PREVENTION ; 3 
 
 (III) ENVIRONMENTAL PUBLIC HEALTH; 4 
 
 (IV) MATERNAL, CHILD, AND FAMILY HEALTH ; AND  5 
 
 (V) ACCESS TO AND LINKAGE WITH CLINICAL CARE ; AND 6 
 
 (2) THE FOLLOWING FOUNDAT IONAL CAPABILITIES : 7 
 
 (I) ASSESSMENT AND SURVEILLANCE ; 8 
 
 (II) COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP DEVELOPMENT ; 9 
 
 (III) EQUITY; 10 
 
 (IV) ORGANIZATIONAL COMPET ENCIES; 11 
 
 (V) POLICY DEVELOPMENT AN D SUPPORT; 12 
 
 (VI) ACCOUNTABILITY AND PE RFORMANCE MANAGEMENT ; 13 
 
 (VII) EMERGENCY PREPAREDNES S AND RESPONSE ; AND  14 
 
 (VIII) COMMUNICATIONS . 15 
 
13–4802. 16 
 
 THERE IS A COMMISSION ON PUBLIC HEALTH. 17 
 
13–4803. 18 
 
 (A) THE COMMISSION CONSISTS O F THE FOLLOWING MEMB ERS: 19 
 
 (1) THE DEPUTY SECRETARY FOR PUBLIC HEALTH, OR THE DEPUTY 20 
SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE; 21 
   	HOUSE BILL 214 	3 
 
 
 (2) THE DEPUTY SECRETARY FOR BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, OR THE 1 
DEPUTY SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE; 2 
 
 (3) THE DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF MINORITY HEALTH AND 3 
HEALTH DISPARITIES, OR THE DIRECTOR’S DESIGNEE; 4 
 
 (4) THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE MARYLAND HEALTH CARE 5 
COMMISSION, OR THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR’S DESIGNEE; 6 
 
 (5) THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE HEALTH SERVICES COST 7 
REVIEW COMMISSION, OR THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR’S DESIGNEE; AND 8 
 
 (6) THE FOLLOWING MEMBERS , APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR: 9 
 
 (I) TWO LOCAL HEALTH OFFICER S; 10 
 
 (II) TWO REPRESENTATIVES F ROM STATE ACADEMIC 11 
INSTITUTIONS WITH EX PERTISE IN PUBLIC HE ALTH SYSTEMS ; 12 
 
 (III) A FACULTY MEMBER FROM A PUBLIC HEALTH PROG RAM AT 13 
A HISTORICALLY BLACK COLLEGE OR UNIVERSITY; 14 
 
 (IV) A STATE RESIDENT W ITH EXPERTISE IN PUB LIC HEALTH 15 
INFORMATION TECHNOLO GY; 16 
 
 (V) A STATE RESIDENT WITH E XPERTISE IN THE PUBLIC 17 
HEALTH WORKFORCE ; 18 
 
 (VI) A STATE RESIDENT WITH E XPERTISE IN HEALTH E QUITY; 19 
 
 (VII) A STATE RESIDENT WITH E XPERIENCE AS A SAFET Y NET 20 
PROVIDER; 21 
 
 (VIII) A STATE BUSINESS LEADER WITH DEMONSTRATED 22 
EXPERTISE IN IMPROVING POPULAT ION HEALTH IN ALL JURISDICTIONS IN THE 23 
STATE; 24 
 
 (IX) A CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFI CER OF A HOSPITAL LOCATED IN 25 
THE STATE; 26 
 
 (X) A CONSUMER HEALTH ADVO CATE IN THE STATE; AND 27 
 
 (XI) A HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONAL LI CENSED IN THE STATE. 28  4 	HOUSE BILL 214  
 
 
 
 (B) THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMISSION APPOINTED UNDER SUBSECTION 1 
(A)(6)(II) OF THIS SECTION SHALL COCHAIR THE COMMISSION. 2 
 
 (C) A MEMBER OF THE COMMISSION: 3 
 
 (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMPE NSATION AS A MEMBER OF THE 4 
COMMISSION; BUT 5 
 
 (2) IS ENTITLED TO REIMBU RSEMENT FOR EXPENSES UNDER THE 6 
STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 7 
 
13–4804. 8 
 
 THE ACADEMIC INSTITUTION S REPRESENTED BY THE COCHAIRS OF THE 9 
COMMISSION SHALL PROV IDE STAFF SUPPORT FOR THE COMMISSION. 10 
 
13–4805. 11 
 
 THE PURPOSE OF THE COMMISSION IS TO MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS TO 12 
IMPROVE THE DELIVERY OF FOUNDATIONAL PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICES IN T HE 13 
STATE. 14 
 
13–4806. 15 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2024, THE COMMISSION SHALL ASSESS THE 16 
CAPABILITY OF THE DEPARTMENT AND LOCAL HEALTH DEPARTMENTS I N THE 17 
STATE TO PROVIDE FOUN DATIONAL PUBLIC HEAL TH SERVICES TO ALL R ESIDENTS 18 
OF THE STATE. 19 
 
 (B) (1) IN CONDUCTING THE ASS	ESSMENT REQUIRED UND	ER 20 
SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION SHALL: 21 
 
 (I) CONSIDER THE FOLLOWIN G FACTORS: 22 
 
 1. THE STATE’S RESPONSE TO COVID–19; 23 
 
 2. THE STATE’S RESPONSE TO OVERDOSE DEATHS;  24 
 
 3. RACIAL AND ETHNIC DIS PARITIES IN MATERNAL 25 
MORTALITY AND BIRTH OUTCOMES IN THE STATE; AND  26 
   	HOUSE BILL 214 	5 
 
 
 4. SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , 1 
ANY OTHER FACTORS CON SIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE COMMISSION; AND 2 
 
 (II) HOLD AT LEAST THREE P UBLIC MEETINGS IN DI FFERENT 3 
AREAS OF THE STATE THAT INCLUDE AN OPPO RTUNITY FOR PUBLIC C OMMENT. 4 
 
 (2) THE COMMISSION MAY NOT CONSIDER MORE THAN T HREE 5 
ADDITIONAL FACTORS U NDER PARAGRAPH (1)(I)4 OF THIS SUBSECTION . 6 
 
 (3) IN CONDUCTING THE ASS	ESSMENT REQUIRED UND	ER 7 
SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION MAY : 8 
 
 (I) REQUEST AND OBTAIN DA TA FROM THE DEPARTMENT , 9 
LOCAL HEALTH DEPARTMENTS , AND THE STATE–DESIGNATED HEALTH 10 
INFORMATION EXCHANGE ; 11 
 
 (II) REQUEST INTERVIEWS WI TH STATE AND LOCAL HEALT H 12 
OFFICIALS; AND  13 
 
 (III) FORM WORKGROUPS . 14 
 
 (C) (1) BASED ON THE ASSESSME NT CONDUCTED UNDER S UBSECTION (A) 15 
OF THIS SECTION , THE COMMISSION SHALL MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR 16 
REFORM IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS : 17 
 
 (I) ORGANIZATION OF STATE AND LOCAL PUBLI C HEALTH 18 
DEPARTMENTS ; 19 
 
 (II) INFORMATION TECHNOLOG Y; 20 
 
 (III) WORKFORCE, INCLUDING HUMAN RESO URCES; 21 
 
 (IV) PROCUREMENT ; 22 
 
 (V) FUNDING; AND 23 
 
 (VI) ANY OTHER AREA CONSIDERE D APPROPRIATE BY THE 24 
COMMISSION. 25 
 
 (2) THE RECOMMENDATIONS M ADE UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS 26 
SUBSECTION SHALL I NCLUDE WHETHER FUNDING OR LEGISLATI ON IS REQUIRED TO 27 
IMPLEMENT THE RECOMMENDATION . 28 
  6 	HOUSE BILL 214  
 
 
 (3) THE COMMISSION SHALL JUST IFY EACH RECOMMENDATION 1 
MADE UNDER PAR AGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION B ASED ON HOW THE 2 
RECOMMENDATION CONTR IBUTES TO THE PROVIS ION OF FOUNDATIONAL PUBLIC 3 
HEALTH SERVICES. 4 
 
 (4) (I) THE COMMISSION SHALL MAKE A DRAFT OF ITS 5 
RECOMMENDATIONS AVAI LABLE FOR PUBLIC COM MENT FOR 30 DAYS. 6 
 
 (II) THE FINAL REPORT OF THE COMMISSION SHALL INCL UDE A 7 
RESPONSE TO ANY PUBL	IC COMMENT RECEIVED 	ON THE DRAFT 8 
RECOMMENDATIONS . 9 
 
 (5) (I) THE COMMISSION SHALL USE BEST EFFORTS TO REAC H 10 
CONSENSUS ON ITS RECOMMENDATIO NS. 11 
 
 (II) IF THE COMMISSION CANNOT REA CH CONSENSUS ON ITS 12 
RECOMMENDATIONS , THE COMMISSION SHALL INCL UDE THE OPPORTUNITY FOR 13 
DISSENTING COMMENTS IN THE COMMISSION’S FINAL REPORT. 14 
 
13–4807. 15 
 
 ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2025, THE COMMISSION SHALL SUBMIT A REPORT 16 
OF ITS FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE GOVERNOR AND , IN 17 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE SENATE 18 
BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE, THE SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE, THE 19 
HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE, AND THE HOUSE HEALTH AND 20 
GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE. 21 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 22 
October 1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and, at the end of September 23 
30, 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 24 
abrogated and of no further force and effect.  25