Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB283 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/25/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0283*  
  
HOUSE BILL 283 
J1   	3lr1095 
SB 682/22 – FIN   	CF 3lr1096 
By: Delegates Kaiser, Cullison, Acevero, Allen, Amprey, Atterbeary, Bagnall, 
B. Barnes, Barve, Boyce, Cardin, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Ebersole, 
Edelson, Embry, Fair, Feldmark, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser –Hidalgo, 
Grossman, Guzzone, Hill, D. Jones, Kaufman, Kelly, Kerr, Lehman, 
R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Mireku –North, Moon, Palakovich Carr, 
Pasteur, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Ruth, Shetty, Simpson, Smith, 
Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Taveras, Terrasa, Valderrama, Vogel, Watson, 
Wells, Wilkins, and Ziegler 
Introduced and read first time: January 25, 2023 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment 2 
(Trans Health Equity Act) 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning on a certain date, the Maryland Medical 4 
Assistance Program to provide medically necessary gender–affirming treatment in a 5 
nondiscriminatory manner; requiring that the gender–affirming treatment be 6 
assessed according to nondiscriminatory criteria that are consistent with current 7 
clinical standards; prohibiting the Program from issuing an adverse benefit 8 
determination related to gender–affirming treatment unless a health care provider 9 
with experience prescribing or delivering gender–affirming treatment has reviewed 10 
and confirmed the appropriateness of the determination; and generally relating to 11 
gender–affirming treatment and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.  12 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 13 
 Article – Health – General 14 
Section 15–103(a)(1) 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 17 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 18 
 Article – Health – General 19 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xx) and (xxi) 20 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 21 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 22  2 	HOUSE BILL 283  
 
 
 
BY adding to 1 
 Article – Health – General 2 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxii) and 15–151 3 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 4 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASS EMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 7 
 
Article – Health – General 8 
 
15–103. 9 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 10 
Program. 11 
 
 (2) The Program: 12 
 
 (xx) Beginning on July 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to federal 13 
approval and limitations of the State budget, community violence prevention services in 14 
accordance with 15–141.3 of this subtitle; [and] 15 
 
 (xxi) Beginning on January 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to the 16 
limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for self–measured 17 
blood pressure monitoring for all Program recipients diagnosed with uncontrolled high 18 
blood pressure, including: 19 
 
 1. The provision of validated home blood pressure monitors; 20 
and 21 
 
 2. Reimbursement of health care provider and other staff 22 
time used for patient training, transmission of blood pressure data, interpretation of blood 23 
pressure readings and reporting, and the delivery of co –interventions, including 24 
educational materials or classes, behavioral change management, and medication 25 
management; AND 26 
 
 (XXII) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2024, SHALL PROVIDE 27 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–151 OF THIS 28 
SUBTITLE. 29 
 
15–151. 30 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE FOL LOWING WORDS HAVE TH E MEANINGS 31 
INDICATED. 32 
   	HOUSE BILL 283 	3 
 
 
 (2) (I) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MEANS ANY 1 
MEDICALLY NECESSARY TREATMENT CONSISTENT WITH CURRENT CLINICA L 2 
STANDARDS OF CARE PR ESCRIBED BY A LICENS ED HEALTH CARE PROVI DER FOR 3 
THE TREATMENT OF A CONDITION RELAT ED TO THE INDIVIDUAL ’S GENDER 4 
IDENTITY.  5 
 
 (II) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” INCLUDES:  6 
 
 1. HORMONE THERAPY , HORMONE BLOCKERS , AND 7 
PUBERTY BLOCKERS ; 8 
 
 2. HAIR ALTERATION FOR T HE PURPOSES OF ALTER ING 9 
SECONDARY SEX CHARAC TERISTICS AND SURGICAL SITE PREPARATION ; 10 
 
 3. ALTERATIONS TO VOICE , VOICE THERAPY , AND VOICE 11 
LESSONS; 12 
 
 4. ALTERATIONS TO ABDOME N, CHEST, TRUNK, AND 13 
BUTTOCKS; 14 
 
 5. ALTERATIONS TO THE FACE AND NECK ; 15 
 
 6. ALTERATIONS TO THE GENITALS AND GONADS; 16 
 
 7. LASER TREATMENT FOR S	CARS FROM 17 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ; 18 
 
 8. STANDARD FERTILITY PR ESERVATION PROCEDURE S, 19 
AS SET FORTH IN § 15–810.1 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE; 20 
 
 9. REVISIONS TO PREVIOUS TREATMENTS AND 21 
REVERSAL OF TREATMEN TS; 22 
 
 10. COMBINATIONS OF GENDER –AFFIRMING 23 
PROCEDURES ; AND 24 
 
 11. OTHER TREATMENTS AS P RESCRIBED TO SUPPRES S 25 
THE DEVELOPMENT OF E NDOGENOUS SECONDARY SEX CHARACTERISTICS , ALIGN 26 
THE INDIVIDUAL ’S APPEARANCE OR PHYS ICAL BODY WITH GENDE R IDENTITY, AND 27 
ALLEVIATE SYMPTOMS O F CLINICALLY SIGNIFICANT DISTR ESS RESULTING FROM 28 
GENDER DYSPHORIA . 29 
 
 (III) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MAY INCLUDE 30 
TREATMENT DESCRIBED IN THE CURRENT CLINI CAL STANDARDS OF CAR E FOR 31  4 	HOUSE BILL 283  
 
 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT PUBLISHED BY THE WORLD PROFESSIONAL 1 
ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH.  2 
 
 (3) “GENDER IDENTITY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 20–101 OF 3 
THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. 4 
 
 (B) IT IS THE INTENT OF T HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY THAT THE PROGRAM 5 
PROVIDE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO ALL PROGRAM RECIPIENTS FO R 6 
WHOM GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IS MEDICALLY NECESSA RY, INCLUDING 7 
TRANSGENDER , NONBINARY, INTERSEX, TWO–SPIRIT, AND OTHER GENDER DIV ERSE 8 
INDIVIDUALS.  9 
 
 (C) (1) THE PROGRAM SHALL PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR MEDICAL LY 10 
NECESSARY GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN A NONDISCRI MINATORY MANNER . 11 
 
 (2) THE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT SHALL BE ASSESSED 12 
ACCORDING TO NONDISC RIMINATORY CRITERIA THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH 13 
CURRENT CLINICAL STA NDARDS OF CARE . 14 
 
 (3) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R 15 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WHEN THAT TREATMENT IS: 16 
 
 (I) PRESCRIBED TO A PROGRAM RECIPIENT BEC AUSE OF, 17 
RELATED TO, OR CONSISTENT WITH T HE RECIPIENT’S GENDER IDENTITY ;  18 
 
 (II) MEDICALLY NECESSARY ; AND  19 
 
 (III) PRESCRIBED IN ACCORDA NCE WITH CURRENT CLI NICAL 20 
STANDARDS OF CARE . 21 
 
 (4) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R 22 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT BASED ON THE PROGRAM RECIPIENT ’S GENDER 23 
IDENTITY.  24 
 
 (5) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT EXCLU	DE GENDER –AFFIRMING 25 
TREATMENT , INCLUDING REVISIONS TO PRIOR GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT , 26 
ON THE BASIS THAT THE TREAT MENT IS A COSMETIC S ERVICE. 27 
 
 (6) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ESTAB LISH A CATEGORICAL E XCLUSION 28 
FOR A PARTICULAR GEN DER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT .  29 
 
 (7) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ISSUE AN ADVERSE BENEFIT 30 
DETERMINATION DENYIN G OR LIMITING ACCESS TO GEND ER–AFFIRMING 31 
TREATMENT UNLESS A H EALTH CARE PROVIDER WITH EXPERIENCE PRES CRIBING 32   	HOUSE BILL 283 	5 
 
 
OR DELIVERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT HAS REVIEWED AND CON FIRMED 1 
THE APPROPRIATENESS OF THE ADVERSE BENEF IT DETERMINATION . 2 
 
 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2024, 3 
EACH MANAGED CARE OR GANIZATION SHALL SUB MIT TO THE DEPARTMENT A 4 
REPORT THAT INCLUDES :  5 
 
 (I) THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH HEALTH CARE 6 
PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WITH WHICH THE MANAG ED 7 
CARE ORGANIZATION HA S AN ACTIVE CONTRACT; AND 8 
 
 (II) THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT PROVIDED 9 
BY EACH HEALTH CARE PROVIDER. 10 
 
 (2) (I) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 11 
2025, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COMP ILE AN ANNUAL REPORT ON GEOGRAPHIC 12 
ACCESS TO GENDER –AFFIRMING TRE ATMENT ACROSS THE STATE.  13 
 
 (II) THE REPORT SHALL INCL UDE:  14 
 
 1. THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH HEALTH CARE 15 
PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO PROGRAM RECIPIENTS ;  16 
 
 2. THE MANAGED CARE ORGA NIZATIONS THAT HAVE 17 
ACTIVE CONTRACTS WIT H EACH HEALTH CARE P ROVIDER; AND  18 
 
 3. THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT 19 
PROVIDED BY EACH HEA LTH CARE PROVIDER .  20 
 
 (III) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PUBL ISH THE REPORT IN A 21 
CONSPICUOUS MANNER ON THE DEPARTMENT ’S WEBSITE. 22 
 
 (3) THE DEPARTMENT AND EACH M ANAGED CARE ORGANIZA TION 23 
SHALL INCLUDE THE NA ME, LOCATION, AND TYPES OF SERVICE S FOR EACH 24 
PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN THEIR PROVIDER 25 
DIRECTORIES. 26 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTH ER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 27 
October 1, 2023.  28