Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB283 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/09/2023

                     	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 253 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 253 
(House Bill 283) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment 
(Trans Health Equity Act) 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning on a certain date, the Maryland Medical 
Assistance Program to provide medically necessary gender–affirming treatment in a 
nondiscriminatory manner; requiring that the gender–affirming treatment be 
assessed according to nondiscriminatory criteria that are consistent with current 
clinical standards; prohibiting the Program from issuing an adverse benefit 
determination related to gender–affirming treatment unless a health care provider 
with experience prescribing or delivering gender–affirming treatment has reviewed 
and confirmed the appropriateness of the determination; and generally relating to 
gender–affirming treatment and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.  
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 
 Article – Health – General 
Section 15–103(a)(1) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Health – General 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xx) and (xxi) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Health – General 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxii) and 15–151 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBL Y OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Health – General 
 
15–103. 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 
Program. 
  Ch. 253 	2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 (2) The Program: 
 
 (xx) Beginning on July 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to federal 
approval and limitations of the State budget, community violence prevention services in 
accordance with 15–141.3 of this subtitle; [and] 
 
 (xxi) Beginning on January 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to the 
limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for self–measured 
blood pressure monitoring for all Program recipients diagnosed with uncontrolled high 
blood pressure, including: 
 
 1. The provision of validated home blood pressure monitors; 
and 
 
 2. Reimbursement of health care provider and other staff 
time used for patient training, transmission of blood pressure data, interpretation of blood 
pressure readings and reporting, and the delivery of co –interventions, including 
educational materials or classes, behavioral change management, and medication 
management; AND 
 
 (XXII) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2024, SHALL PROVIDE 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–151 OF THIS 
SUBTITLE. 
 
15–151. 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE FOL LOWING WORDS HAVE TH E MEANINGS 
INDICATED. 
 
 (2) (I) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MEANS ANY 
MEDICALLY NECESSARY TREATMENT CONSISTENT WITH CURRENT CLINICA L 
STANDARDS OF CARE PR ESCRIBED BY A LICENS ED HEALTH CARE PROVI DER FOR 
THE TREATMENT OF A CONDITION RELAT ED TO THE INDIVIDUAL ’S GENDER 
IDENTITY.  
 
 (II) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” INCLUDES:  
 
 1. HORMONE THERAPY , HORMONE BLOCKERS , AND 
PUBERTY BLOCKERS ; 
 
 2. HAIR ALTERATION FOR T HE PURPOSES OF ALTER ING 
SECONDARY SEX CHARAC TERISTICS AND SURGICAL SITE PREPARATION ; 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 253 
 
– 3 – 
 3. ALTERATIONS TO VOICE , VOICE THERAPY , AND VOICE 
LESSONS; 
 
 4. ALTERATIONS TO ABDOME N, CHEST, TRUNK, AND 
BUTTOCKS; 
 
 5. ALTERATIONS TO THE FACE AND NECK ; 
 
 6. ALTERATIONS TO THE GENITALS AND GONADS; 
 
 7. LASER TREATMENT FOR S	CARS FROM 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ; 
 
 8. STANDARD FERTILITY PR ESERVATION PROCEDURE S, 
AS SET FORTH IN § 15–810.1 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE; 
 
 9. REVISIONS TO PREVIOUS TREATMENTS AND 
REVERSAL OF TREATMEN TS; 
 
 10. COMBINATIONS OF GENDER –AFFIRMING 
PROCEDURES ; AND 
 
 11. OTHER TREATMENTS AS P RESCRIBED TO SUPPRES S 
THE DEVELOPMENT OF E NDOGENOUS SECONDARY SEX CHARACTERISTICS , ALIGN 
THE INDIVIDUAL ’S APPEARANCE OR PHYS ICAL BODY WITH GENDE R IDENTITY, AND 
ALLEVIATE SYMPTOMS O F CLINICALLY SIGNIFICANT DISTR ESS RESULTING FROM 
GENDER DYSPHORIA . 
 
 (III) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MAY INCLUDE 
TREATMENT DESCRIBED IN THE CURRENT CLINI CAL STANDARDS OF CAR E FOR 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT PUBLISHED BY THE WORLD PROFESSIONAL 
ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH.  
 
 (3) “GENDER IDENTITY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 20–101 OF 
THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. 
 
 (B) IT IS THE INTENT OF T HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY THAT THE PROGRAM 
PROVIDE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO ALL PROGRAM RECIPIENTS FO R 
WHOM GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT IS M EDICALLY NECESSARY , INCLUDING 
TRANSGENDER , NONBINARY, INTERSEX, TWO–SPIRIT, AND OTHER GENDER DIV ERSE 
INDIVIDUALS.  
 
 (C) (1) THE PROGRAM SHALL PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR MEDICAL LY 
NECESSARY GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN A NONDISCRIMINATO RY MANNER.  Ch. 253 	2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (2) THE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT SHALL BE ASSESSED 
ACCORDING TO NONDISC RIMINATORY CRITERIA THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH 
CURRENT CLINICAL STA NDARDS OF CARE . 
 
 (3) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WHEN THAT TR EATMENT IS: 
 
 (I) PRESCRIBED TO A PROGRAM RECIPIENT BEC AUSE OF, 
RELATED TO, OR CONSISTENT WITH T HE RECIPIENT’S GENDER IDENTITY ;  
 
 (II) MEDICALLY NECESSARY ; AND  
 
 (III) PRESCRIBED IN ACCORDA NCE WITH CURRENT CLI NICAL 
STANDARDS OF CARE . 
 
 (4) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT BASED ON THE PROGRAM RECIPIENT ’S GENDER 
IDENTITY.  
 
 (5) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT EXCLU	DE GENDER –AFFIRMING 
TREATMENT , INCLUDING REVISIONS TO PRIOR GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT , 
ON THE BASIS TH AT THE TREATMENT IS A COSMETIC SERVICE . 
 
 (6) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ESTAB LISH A CATEGORICAL E XCLUSION 
FOR A PARTICULAR GEN DER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT .  
 
 (7) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ISSUE AN ADVERSE BENEFIT 
DETERMINATION DENYIN G OR LIMITING ACCESS TO GENDER–AFFIRMING 
TREATMENT UNLESS A H EALTH CARE PROVIDER WITH EXPERIENCE PRES CRIBING 
OR DELIVERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT HAS REVIEWED AND CON FIRMED 
THE APPROPRIATENESS OF THE ADVERSE BENEF IT DETERMINATION . 
 
 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2024, 
EACH MANAGED CARE OR GANIZATION SHALL SUB MIT TO THE DEPARTMENT A 
REPORT THAT INCLUDES , FOR EACH HEALTH CARE PROVIDER OFFERING 
GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WITH WHICH THE MANAG ED CARE ORGANIZATION 
HAS AN ACTIVE CONTRA CT AND WHO THAT CONSENTS TO THE INCLUSION :  
 
 (I) THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH THE HEALTH CARE 
PROVIDER OFFERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT WITH WHICH THE MANAG ED 
CARE ORGANIZATION HA S AN ACTIVE CONTRACT ; AND 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 253 
 
– 5 – 
 (II) THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT PROVIDED 
BY EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER ; AND 
 
 (III) WHETHER THE HEALTH CA RE PROVIDER CONSENTS TO 
BEING PUBLICLY LISTE D AS PART OF THE DEPARTMENT ’S ANNUAL REPORT 
REQUIRED UNDER PARAG RAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION . 
 
 (2) (I) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 
2025, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COMP ILE AN ANNUAL REPORT ON GEOGRAPHIC 
ACCESS TO GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT ACROSS THE STATE.  
 
 (II) THE REPORT SHALL INCL UDE, FOR EACH HEALTH CARE 
PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO PROGRAM RECIPIENTS 
AND WHOSE C ONSENT TO THE INCLUS ION IS INDICATED IN A REPORT SUBMITTED 
UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION :  
 
 1. THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH THE HEALTH 
CARE PROVIDER OFFERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO PROGRAM 
RECIPIENTS;  
 
 2. THE MANAGED CARE ORGA NIZATIONS THAT HAVE 
ACTIVE CONTRACTS WIT H EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER ; AND  
 
 3. THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT 
PROVIDED BY EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER .  
 
 (III) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PUBL ISH THE REPORT IN A 
CONSPICUOU S MANNER ON THE DEPARTMENT ’S WEBSITE. 
 
 (3) THE DEPARTMENT AND EACH M ANAGED CARE ORGANIZA TION 
SHALL INCLUDE THE NA ME, LOCATION, AND TYPES OF SERVICE S FOR EACH 
PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN THEIR PROVIDER 
DIRECTORIES. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2023.  
 
Approved by the Governor, May 3, 2023.