Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB340 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/28/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0340*  
  
HOUSE BILL 340 
J1   	3lr1174 
    	CF SB 890 
By: Delegate Cullison 
Introduced and read first time: January 25, 2023 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 25, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Department of Health – 2–1–1 Maryland – Oversight 2 
 
FOR the purpose of defining the term “Health and Human Services Referral System” for 3 
the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the System to mean a certain 4 
coordinated system for health and human resources that is accessible to State 5 
residents, rather than a certain telephone service; altering the definition of “2–1–1 6 
Maryland” to clarify that it is the entity that administers the 2–1–1 system in the 7 
State; repealing the requirement that the Maryland Department of Health evaluate 8 
the performance of certain call centers and make certain recommendations regarding 9 
the quality of service provided by call centers; specifying that a certain agency that 10 
establishes a public information telephone line or hotline is required to consult with 11 
2–1–1 Maryland on certain matters only when appropriate in the agency’s discretion; 12 
and generally relating to 2–1–1 Maryland. 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Health – General 15 
Section 24–1201 through 24–1204 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED B Y THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
 
Article – Health – General 21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 340  
 
 
24–1201. 1 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 2 
 
 (b) “Health and Human Services Referral System” means [telephone service that 3 
automatically connects an individual dialing the digits 2–1–1 to an established information 4 
and referral answering point] A COORDINATED SYSTEM FOR HEALTH AND HUMAN 5 
SERVICE RESOURCES AC CESSIBLE TO ALL STATE RESIDENTS THROUGH 2–1–1 AND 6 
OTHER DESIGNATED TEC HNOLOGY SYSTEMS . 7 
 
 (c) “2–1–1” means the abbreviated dialing code assigned by the Federal 8 
Communications Commission for consumer access to community information and referral 9 
services. 10 
 
 (d) “2–1–1 Maryland” means the Maryland Informati on Network, 2–1–1 11 
Maryland, a 501(c)(3) corporation in the State THAT ADMINISTERS THE 2–1–1 SYSTEM. 12 
 
 (e) “2–1–1 Maryland call center” means a nonprofit agency or organization 13 
designated by 2–1–1 Maryland to provide 2–1–1 services. 14 
 
24–1202. 15 
 
 (a) The General Assembly: 16 
 
 (1) Recognizes the importance of a statewide information and referral 17 
system for health and human services; 18 
 
 (2) Recognizes that an integrated [telephone] TECHNOLOGY system 19 
would provide ACCESS TO a single source for information and referral to health and human 20 
services, community preparedness, and [crisis information] BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CA RE 21 
COORDINATION and could be accessed toll free from anywhere in Maryland, 24 hours a 22 
day, 365 days a year; 23 
 
 (3) Acknowledges that the three–digit number, 2–1–1, is a nationally 24 
recognized and applied telephone number which may be used for information and referral 25 
and eliminates delays caused by lack of familiarity with health and human services 26 
numbers and by understandable confusion in circumstances of crisis; and 27 
 
 (4) Recognizes a demonstrated need for an easy to remember, easy to use 28 
telephone number that will enable individuals in need to be directed to available 29 
community resources. 30 
 
 (b) The purpose of this subtitle is to establish the three–digit number, 2–1–1, as 31 
the primary information and referral telephone number for health and human services in 32 
the State. 33 
   	HOUSE BILL 340 	3 
 
 
24–1203. 1 
 
 (a) Except as provided in subsection (c) of this section, an agency or organization 2 
shall be approved by 2–1–1 Maryland as a 2–1–1 Maryland call center in order to provide 3 
2–1–1 services in the State. 4 
 
 (b) When approving a 2–1–1 service provider, 2–1–1 Maryland shall consider: 5 
 
 (1) The ability of the proposed 2–1–1 service provider to meet the national 6 
2–1–1 standards recommended by: 7 
 
 (i) The Alliance of Information and Referral Systems and adopted 8 
by the National 2–1–1 Collaborative; or 9 
 
 (ii) An equivalent entity; 10 
 
 (2) The financial stability of the proposed 2–1–1 service provider; 11 
 
 (3) Any community support for the proposed 2–1–1 service provider; 12 
 
 (4) Any experience that the proposed 2–1–1 service provider has with other 13 
information and referral services; 14 
 
 (5) The degree to which the county in which the proposed call center is to 15 
be located has dedicated substantial resources to the establishment of a single telephone 16 
source for non–emergency inquiries regarding county services; and 17 
 
 (6) Any other criteria that 2–1–1 Maryland considers appropriate. 18 
 
 (c) If [a unit] AN AGENCY of the State that provides health and human services 19 
establishes a public information telephone line or hotline, the [unit] AGENCY shall, WHEN 20 
APPROPRIATE IN THE A GENCY’S DISCRETION, consult with 2–1–1 Maryland about 21 
using the 2–1–1 system to provide public access to information. 22 
 
24–1204. 23 
 
 (a) The Department shall, in consultation with 2–1–1 Maryland, as appropriate: 24 
 
 (1) Maintain public information available from State agencies, programs, 25 
and departments that provide health and human services; 26 
 
 (2) Support projects and activities that further the development of 2–1–1 27 
Maryland; 28 
 
 (3) Examine and make recommendations to maximize the use of 29 
information technology in making 2–1–1 services available throughout the State; 30 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 340  
 
 
 [(4) Evaluate the performance of each 2–1–1 Maryland call center; 1 
 
 (5) Make recommendations to 2–1–1 Maryland regarding the quality of 2 
service provided by call centers or the performance of call centers when issues related to 3 
service quality and performance are presented to the Department;] 4 
 
 [(6)] (4) Make recommendations regarding corrective action to be taken 5 
by a call center, as appropriate; and 6 
 
 [(7)] (5) Make recommendations to 2 –1–1 Maryland regarding the 7 
establishment of an opt–in mental health services phone call program that: 8 
 
 (i) Requires a call center to call individuals who have opted in to the 9 
mental health services phone call program on a periodic basis, as determined by 2–1–1 10 
Maryland; and 11 
 
 (ii) Attempts to connect individuals to a provider of mental health 12 
services if the individual requests to speak to a mental health provider during a call with 13 
2–1–1 Maryland. 14 
 
 (b) The Governor may include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to the 15 
Department in an amount sufficient to carry out subsection [(a)(7)] (A)(5) of this section. 16 
 
 (c) On or before December 31, 2005, and every year thereafter, the Department, 17 
in consultation with 2–1–1 Maryland, shall report to the Governor and, subject to § 2–1257 18 
of the State Government Article, to the General Assembly on the activities performed under 19 
subsection (a) of this section. 20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 21 
October 1, 2023. 22 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.