Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB72 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0072*  
  
HOUSE BILL 72 
C2   	3lr0307 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 254 
By: Delegate Watson 
Requested: July 25, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Economic Matters 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 26, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Business Regulation – Charitable Contribution – Definition Organizations 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the definition of “charitable contribution” to exclude donations 3 
of property made with a certain intent and an authorization for or a discount on the 4 
use of certain services or materials, equipment, or facilities for purposes of provisions 5 
of law regulating charitable organizations and charitable representatives; 6 
authorizing the Maryland Secretary of State to accept certain documentation in place 7 
of an audit or review in connection with a charitable organization’s registration 8 
statement; and generally relating to charitable contributions organizations. 9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 10 
 Article – Business Regulation 11 
Section 6–101(a) 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Article – Business Regulation 16 
Section 6–101(c) and 6–402 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 19 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 20 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 72  
 
 
 
Article – Business Regulation 1 
 
6–101. 2 
 
 (a) In this title the following words have the meanings indicated. 3 
 
 (c) (1) “Charitable contribution” means a contribution made on a 4 
representation that it will be used for a charitable purpose. 5 
 
 (2) “Charitable contribution” includes the payment, transfer, or 6 
enforceable pledge of financial help, including money, credit, property, or services. 7 
 
 (3) “Charitable contribution” does not include: 8 
 
 (i) an unsolicited gift; 9 
 
 (ii) a government grant or government money; 10 
 
 (iii) membership assessments, dues, or fines; 11 
 
 (iv) a payment for property sold or services rendered by a charitable 12 
organization, unless the property is sold or the services are rendered in connection with a 13 
charitable solicitation; [and] 14 
 
 (v) a public safety contribution as defined in subsection (j) of this 15 
section; AND 16 
 
 (VI) A DONATION OF PROPER TY THAT IS INTENDED TO BE 17 
REDISTRIBUTED WITHOU T CHARGE FOR A BENEV	OLENT, EDUCATIONAL , 18 
ELEEMOSYNARY , HUMANE, PATRIOTIC, PHILANTHROPIC , OR RELIGIOUS PURPOSE ; 19 
AND 20 
 
 (VII) AN AUTHORIZATION FOR OR A DISCOUNT ON THE USE OF 21 
SERVICES OR MATERIAL S, EQUIPMENT, OR FACILITIES , INCLUDING THOSE 22 
RELATING TO: 23 
 
 1. ADVERTISING; AND 24 
 
 2. BROADCAST AIRTIME , INCLUDING PUBLIC SERVICE 25 
ANNOUNCEMENTS . 26 
 
6–402. 27 
 
 (a) A registration statement shall be on the form that the Secretary of State 28 
provides. 29   	HOUSE BILL 72 	3 
 
 
 
 (b) Except as provided in subsection (c) of this section, the registration statement 1 
shall contain or be accompanied by: 2 
 
 (1) the name and address of the charitable organization and of any affiliate, 3 
branch, or chapter in the State; 4 
 
 (2) the name and address of: 5 
 
 (i) each officer, including each principal salaried executive staff 6 
officer, and each other person with final responsibility for the custody and final distribution 7 
of the charitable contributions made to the charitable organization; or 8 
 
 (ii) each person who has custody of the financial records of the 9 
charitable organization if the charitable organization does not have a local office in the 10 
State; 11 
 
 (3) a statement of: 12 
 
 (i) the purposes for which the charitable organization was 13 
organized; 14 
 
 (ii) the purposes for which charitable contributions will be used; and 15 
 
 (iii) whether the charitable organization intends to solicit directly or 16 
to have a professional solicitor or fund–raising counsel solicit charitable contributions on 17 
its behalf; 18 
 
 (4) a copy of the articles of incorporation or other governing instrument of 19 
the charitable organization; 20 
 
 (5) a copy of a letter from the Internal Revenue Service, or other evidence, 21 
showing the tax–exempt status of the charitable organization; 22 
 
 (6) (i) a copy of federal Form 990 that the charitable organization 23 
submits to the Internal Revenue Service; or 24 
 
 (ii) information that the charitable organization states on a form 25 
that the Secretary of State provides; 26 
 
 (7) (i) an audit by an independent certified public accountant if the 27 
gross income from charitable contributions in the most recently completed fiscal year is at 28 
least $750,000; or 29 
 
 (ii) a review by an independent certified public accountant if the 30 
gross income from charitable contributions in the most recently completed fiscal year is at 31 
least $300,000 but less than $750,000; 32  4 	HOUSE BILL 72  
 
 
 
 (8) an affidavit signed by the chairman, president, or other principal officer 1 
attesting to the truth of the registration statement and each supporting document; 2 
 
 (9) (i) a certification that all taxes due from the applicant to the State 3 
or to Baltimore City or a county of the State for the preceding fiscal year have been paid, 4 
and all taxes the applicant was required to collect and pay over to the State or to Baltimore 5 
City or a county of the State for the preceding fiscal year have been collected and paid over; 6 
or 7 
 
 (ii) a certification that the taxes due from the applicant to the State 8 
or to Baltimore City or a county are under dispute and the dispute has not been finally 9 
resolved; and 10 
 
 (10) any other information that the Secretary of State requires by 11 
regulation. 12 
 
 (c) The Secretary of State may accept other documentation in place of any item 13 
required under subsection (b) of this section, INCLUDING, IN PLACE OF THE AUDI T OR 14 
REVIEW REQUIRED BY S UBSECTION (B)(7) OF THIS SECTION , SUPPORTING 15 
DOCUMENTS INDICATING , AND AN AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING , THAT: 16 
 
 (1) THE CHARITABLE ORGAN IZATION: 17 
 
 (I) RECEIVES DONATIONS O F PROPERTY , INCLUDING 18 
HOUSEHOLD GOODS , FURNITURE, APPLIANCES, AND CLOTHING , THAT ARE 19 
INTENDED TO BE REDIS TRIBUTED TO INDIVIDU ALS RESIDING IN THE STATE 20 
WITHOUT CHARG E; 21 
 
 (II) DOES NOT EMPLOY A PR OFESSIONAL SOLICITOR OR  22 
FUND–RAISING COUNSEL ; 23 
 
 (III) USED GENERALLY ACCEPTED ACCOUNTING PRINCIPLES 24 
TO DETERMINE THE VAL UE OF PROPERTY RECEI VED AS CHARITABLE 25 
CONTRIBUTIONS DURING THE IMMEDIATELY PREC EDING FISCAL YEAR ; 26 
 
 (IV) HAS CASH RECEIPTS FR OM CHARITABLE CONTRI BUTIONS 27 
AMOUNTING TO 20% OR LESS OF THE CHARI TABLE ORGANIZATION ’S GROSS INCOME 28 
DURING THE IMMEDIATE LY PRECEDING FISCAL YEAR THAT ARE USED F OR 29 
PROGRAM SERVICES OR MANAGEMENT AND GENER AL EXPENSES OF THE 30 
CHARITABL E ORGANIZATION , AS SET FORTH UNDER COMAR 01.02.04.04.A AND C; 31 
 
 (V) IS CURRENT AND UP TO DATE IN ALL REGISTRA TION AND 32 
REPORTING REQUIREMEN TS UNDER THIS TITLE ; 33 
   	HOUSE BILL 72 	5 
 
 
 (VI) IS IN GOOD STANDING WITH THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF 1 
ASSESSMENTS AND TAXATION, IF APPLICABLE; AND 2 
 
 (VII) HAS TAX–EXEMPT STATUS UNDER § 501(C)(3) OF THE 3 
INTERNAL REVENUE CODE; 4 
 
 (2) THE CHARITABLE CONTR IBUTIONS OF PROPERTY ARE: 5 
 
 (I) DIRECTLY RELATED TO THE PURPOSES FOR WHI CH THE 6 
CHARITABLE ORGANIZAT ION WAS ORGANIZED ; AND 7 
 
 (II) WILL BE USED IN CONDUCTING T HE CHARITABLE 8 
ORGANIZATION ’S PROGRAMS; AND 9 
 
 (3) THE GOVERNING BODY O F THE CHARITABLE ORG ANIZATION: 10 
 
 (I) IS COMPOSED OF AT LE AST THREE INDEPENDEN T AND 11 
UNRELATED DIRECTORS ; AND 12 
 
 (II) COMPLETED AN ONBOARD ING AND TRAINING PRO GRAM 13 
DURING THE IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING FISCAL YEA R, PROVIDED INTERNALLY OR 14 
EXTERNALLY , THAT COVERED : 15 
 
 1. THE CHARITABLE ORGAN IZATION’S MISSION; 16 
 
 2. THE POLICIES, PROCEDURES , AND OPERATIONS OF 17 
THE CHARITABLE ORGAN IZATION; AND 18 
 
 3. THE DUTIES AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF DIRECTORS 19 
AND OFFICERS AS FIDU CIARIES OF THE CHARI TABLE CONTRIBUTIONS THAT THE 20 
CHARITABLE ORGANIZAT ION COLLECTS AND SPE NDS. 21 
 
 (d) The Secretary of State may require an audit or review if the amount of gross 22 
income is less than $750,000.  23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 24 
October 1, 2023.  25